Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:20-cv-01112
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2020
Terminated:Nov 03, 2022
Case in other court:Williamson County Circuit Court, 20-00536
Last checked: Monday Jun 28, 2021 4:29 AM CDT
Counter Defendant
Intermed Resources TN, LLC
Represented By
Tracey Alan Kinslow
Kinslow Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Green Earth Technologies, LLC
Represented By
T. Hart Benton, III
Mcdowell, Knight, Roedder & Sledge, LLC
contact info
Frederick G. Helmsing, Jr.
Mcdowell, Knight, Roedder & Sledge, LLC
contact info
Sarah Jane Lindsay
Mcdowell, Knight, Roedder & Sledge, LLC
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Doug Mallonee
Represented By
T. Hart Benton, III
Mcdowell, Knight, Roedder & Sledge, LLC
contact info
Frederick G. Helmsing, Jr.
Mcdowell, Knight, Roedder & Sledge, LLC
contact info
Sarah Jane Lindsay
Mcdowell, Knight, Roedder & Sledge, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Green Earth Technologies, LLC
Represented By
T. Hart Benton, III
Mcdowell, Knight, Roedder & Sledge, LLC
contact info
Frederick G. Helmsing, Jr.
Mcdowell, Knight, Roedder & Sledge, LLC
contact info
Sarah Jane Lindsay
Mcdowell, Knight, Roedder & Sledge, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Doug Mallonee
Represented By
T. Hart Benton, III
Mcdowell, Knight, Roedder & Sledge, LLC
contact info
Frederick G. Helmsing, Jr.
Mcdowell, Knight, Roedder & Sledge, LLC
contact info
Sarah Jane Lindsay
Mcdowell, Knight, Roedder & Sledge, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Intermed Resources TN, LLC
Represented By
Tracey Alan Kinslow
Kinslow Law Group, PLLC
contact info

GPO Apr 22 2021
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF THE COURT: The defendants' Motion to Stay 15 is DENIED. Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 5/12/2021 at 2:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/22/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
GPO Sep 27 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF THE COURT: Mallonee's Motion for Summary Judgment 40 and Green Earth's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 43 are hereby GRANTED. Mallonee is GRANTED summary judgment as to all claims against him, and Green Earth is GRANTED summary judgment as to Counts II, III, and IV and punitive damages related to Count I. InterMed's claim for breach of contract against Green Earth and Green Earth's counterclaims are the only claims that remain pending. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/27/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, November 03, 2022
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 11/03 12:25 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per54 . No order to enter. (kc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
54 54 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 11/02 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Green Earth Technologies, LLC(Helmsing, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order)
53 53 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 11/02 1:25 PM
ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: The Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant having given notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice, it is hereby ORDERED, DECREED, and ADJUDGED that the causes of action against Defendants, Green Earth Tehcnologies, LLC and Doug Mallonee, are dismissed without prejudice with costs taxed to the Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/2/2022. (kc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
52 52 misc Proposed Order of Dismissal Mon 10/31 4:11 PM
PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL filed by Intermed Resources TN, LLC. (Preston, G.)
Related: [-]
51 51 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 10/31 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Intermed Resources TN, LLC (Preston, G.)
Related: [-]