Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Susan Paradise Baxter
Case #: 1:20-cv-00373
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2020
Terminated:Jun 22, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jun 28, 2021 4:57 AM EDT
Defendant
OIL CITY AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By
Robert D. Zaruta
Knox Mclaughlin Gornall & Sennett, P.C.
contact info
Mediator
KENNETH J. BENSON
P. O. Box 101824
Pittsburgh, PA 15237
Represented By
Kenneth J. Benson
Justus Adr Services
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN KLUCK
Represented By
Neal A. Sanders
Law Offices Of Neal A. Sanders
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
29 29 1 pgs order Order Wed 06/22 9:57 AM
ORDER: AND NOW, this 22nd day of June, 2022, for the reasons set forth in this Court's Memorandum Opinion issued on this date, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion for summary judgment20 is GRANTED, and judgment is hereby entered in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff on all claims in this case. The Clerk is directed to mark this case closed. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 06/22/2022. (fcf)
Related: [-]
28 28 6 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Wed 06/22 9:52 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by OIL CITY AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 06/22/2022. (fcf)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
27 27 2 pgs misc Appendix Fri 01/21 9:55 AM
Appendix to23 Response to Motion by JOHN KLUCK. (Sanders, Neal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 14 pgs Exh. 1 John Kluck Depo Excerpts,
Att: 2 14 pgs Exh. 2 Dr. Lynda Weller Depo Excerpts,
Att: 3 9 pgs Exh. 3 Christy Basham Depo Excerpts,
Att: 4 7 pgs Exh. 4 Chad Gardner Depo Excerpts,
Att: 5 12 pgs Exh. 5 Tim LaVan Depo Excerpts,
Att: 6 2 pgs Exh. 6 Stacia Fennick Depo Excerpts,
Att: 7 2 pgs Exh. 7 Craig Kasunic Depo Excerpts
26 26 5 pgs misc Concise Statement of Material Facts Fri 01/21 9:43 AM
CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS - ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS PURSUANT TO LR 56.1C1(c) re25 Response by JOHN KLUCK. (Sanders, Neal)
Related: [-]
25 25 9 pgs respoth Response (other - do not select for response to motion) Fri 01/21 9:36 AM
RESPONSE to22 Concise Statement of Material Facts, filed by JOHN KLUCK. (Sanders, Neal)
Related: [-]
24 24 11 pgs respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/21 9:24 AM
BRIEF in Opposition re20 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by JOHN KLUCK. (Sanders, Neal)
Related: [-]
23 23 2 pgs respm Response to Motion Fri 01/21 9:22 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re20 MOTION for Summary Judgment - OPPOSITION filed by JOHN KLUCK. (Sanders, Neal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 13, 2021
misc QC - Document should have been filed as 2 separate documents Mon 12/13 8:31 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re20 Motion for Summary Judgment. ERROR: Concise Statement of Material Facts should have been filed as a separate document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed22 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re20 Motion for Summary Judgment. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
22 22 10 pgs misc Concise Statement of Material Facts Mon 12/13 8:29 AM
CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re20 Motion for Summary Judgment, by OIL CITY AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT. (jv)
Related: [-]
21 21 19 pgs respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 12/10 6:17 PM
BRIEF in Support re20 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by OIL CITY AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Zaruta, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 10 pgs Revised Concise Statement of Material Facts
20 20 3 pgs motion Summary Judgment Fri 12/10 6:11 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by OIL CITY AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Zaruta, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Appendix Appendix of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 21 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 5 5 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Concise Statement of Material Facts
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
minutes Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 10/27 3:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference held on 10/27/2021. Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/10/2021; Response to Motion due by 1/21/2022. (Court Reporter: Janis Ferguson) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
19 19 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 10/05 11:36 AM
TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER. Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 10/14/2021 is CANCELLED and RESCHEDULED for 10/27/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Parties are directed to contact the Court at 888-363-4749 and use access code 7686665. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/5/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 10/05 11:16 AM
TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 10/13/2021 at 11:30 AM is CANCELLED and RESCHEDULED for 10/14/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Parties are directed to contact the Court at 888-363-4749 and use access code 7686665. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/5/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 09, 2021
17 17 adr Report of Mediation Fri 07/09 10:12 AM
REPORT of Mediation: Case has not been resolved. KENNETH J. BENSON terminated. Attorney Kenneth J. Benson terminated. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed [LINK:here] or at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. Mediation session was held on 7/7/2021. (Benson, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
16 16 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 06/14 4:26 PM
ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint, by OIL CITY AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Zaruta, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 05/25 10:13 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against OIL CITY AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT, filed by JOHN KLUCK. (Sanders, Neal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exh. 1 - EEOC Right to Sue Notice,
Att: 2 Exh. 2A - PHRC,
Att: 3 Exh. 2B - PHRC,
Att: 4 Affidavit
Monday, May 24, 2021
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 05/24 3:56 PM
ORDER: AND NOW, this 24th day of May 2021, based upon Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, said Motion is granted. Plaintiff shall file his First Amended Complaint with the Court on or before June 4, 2021. Defendant shall file its responsive pleading to the First Amended Complaint on or before June 18, 2021. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/24/2021. (esa)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Leave to File Mon 05/24 10:38 AM
MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by JOHN KLUCK. (Sanders, Neal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 15, 2021
12 12 adr Notice of Mediation Thu 04/15 10:43 AM
Notice of Mediation by KENNETH J. BENSON. Mediation Date July 7, 2021 at 10 am (Benson, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
11 11 order Case Management Order Wed 04/14 12:35 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 4/30/2021; Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2021; Joinder of Parties due by 5/31/2021; Discovery due by 9/30/2021; Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 10/13/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Parties are directed to contact the Court at 888-363-4749 and use access code 7686665. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 4/14/2021. (esa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 25, 2021
10 10 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Thu 03/25 10:30 AM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by JOHN KLUCK. (Sanders, Neal)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 03/25 10:29 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sanders, Neal)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 08, 2021
8 8 order Initial Local Rule 16.1 Scheduling Order Mon 03/08 11:11 AM
INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 3/29/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/5/2021. Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Parties are directed to contact the Court at 888-363-4749 and use access code 7686665. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 3/8/2021. (esa)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/08 11:04 AM
ORDER: All counsel of record in this case must read the attached article on mediation prior to the Initial Case Management Conference, and share the same with their client(s). The attached article is being disseminated with permission of the author and The Pennsylvania Lawyer. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 3/8/2021. (esa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mediation Article
6 6 2 pgs order Order Implementing Fed Rule of Evidence 502(d) Mon 03/08 10:59 AM
ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Pursuant to LCvR 16.1.D. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 3/8/2021. (esa)
Related: [-]
5 5 6 pgs order Order Mon 03/08 10:57 AM
STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 3/8/2021. (esa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 04, 2021
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/04 3:59 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by OIL CITY AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Zaruta, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2021
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/07 10:40 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN KLUCK. OIL CITY AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT waiver sent on 1/7/2021, answer due 3/8/2021. (Sanders, Neal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 12/30 4:19 PM
Summons Issued as to OIL CITY AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT (jv)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Wed 12/30 4:17 PM
COMPLAINT against OIL CITY AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6201040), filed by JOHN KLUCK. (jv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Exhibit