New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vincent L Briccetti
Case #: 7:20-cv-09821
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331ed Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2020
Terminated:Feb 16, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday May 19, 2021 5:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Glaudin Blanchard
Defendant
East Ramapo Central School District
Represented By
Christopher Herbert Feldman
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
Darius Patrick Chafizadeh
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Finkelstein Memorial Library
Represented By
Erin Callahan
Whiteman Osterman & Hanna L.L.P.
contact info
Robert Thomas Schofield, IV
Whiteman Osterman & Hanna L.L.P.
contact info
Evan Michael Piercey
Whiteman Osterman & Hanna
contact info
Plaintiff
Keon Lee Nash
Represented By
Mark Shirian
Mark David Shirian PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Troy Nash Jr.
Represented By
Mark Shirian
Mark David Shirian PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Sunday, February 14, 2021
30 30 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Sun 02/14 11:33 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Glaudin Blanchard, East Ramapo Central School District, Finkelstein Memorial Library. Document filed by Kenneth Troy Nash Jr., Keon Lee Nash. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Shirian, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
29 29 order Memo Endorsement 1 - Terminate Deadlines Tue 02/09 12:50 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:28 Letter filed by Keon Lee Nash, Kenneth Troy Nash Jr. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. All deadlines stayed through 2/22/2021. By that date plaintiff shall file either a notice of dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), or a stipulation of dismissal signed by all parties who have appeared pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 2/9/2021) (mml)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 08, 2021
28 28 misc Letter Mon 02/08 8:41 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Mark Shirian dated February 8, 2021 re: Response to Order dated February 1, 2021 and request for 14-day stay. Document filed by Keon Lee Nash, Kenneth Troy Nash Jr...(Shirian, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
27 27 1 pgs order Order Mon 02/01 3:01 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, by no later than February 8, 2021, plaintiffs must notify the Court by letter whether plaintiffs (i) intend to file an amended complaint in response to the motions to dismiss, or (ii) will rely on the complaint that is the subject of the motions to dismiss. If plaintiffs elect not to file an amended complaint, the motions will proceed in the regular course, and the Court is unlikely to grant plaintiffs a further opportunity to amend to address the purported deficiencies made apparent by the fully briefed arguments in defendants' motions. See Loreley Fin. (Jersey) No. 3 Ltd. v. Wells Fargo Sec., LLC, 797 F.3d 160, 190 (2d Cir. 2015) (leaving "unaltered the grounds on which denial of leave to amend has long been held proper, such as undue delay, bad faith, dilatory motive, and futility"); accord F5 Capital v. Pappas, 856 F.3d 61, 8990 (2d Cir. 2017). The time to file opposing and reply papers shall be governed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Civil Rules, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. If plaintiffs elect to file an amended complaint, plaintiffs must file the amended complaint by no later than 14 days after notifying the Court of their intent to do so. Within 21 days of such amendment, defendants may either: (i) file an answer to the amended complaint; or (ii) file a motion to dismiss the amended complaint; or (iii) notify the Court by letter that defendants are relying on the initially filed motions to dismiss. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 2/1/2021) (mml)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 28, 2021
26 26 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 01/28 7:23 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:24 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint against Defendant Finkelstein Mem. Lib. . . Document filed by Finkelstein Memorial Library..(Schofield, Robert)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 01/28 7:22 PM
DECLARATION of Robert Schofield in Support re:24 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint against Defendant Finkelstein Mem. Lib. .. Document filed by Finkelstein Memorial Library..(Schofield, Robert)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Dismiss Thu 01/28 7:21 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint against Defendant Finkelstein Mem. Lib. . Document filed by Finkelstein Memorial Library..(Schofield, Robert)
Related: [-]
23 23 16 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 01/28 6:24 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:20 MOTION to Dismiss Causes of Action Against East Ramapo Central School District . . Document filed by East Ramapo Central School District..(Feldman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Thu 01/28 6:22 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Kathi Kivi in Support re:20 MOTION to Dismiss Causes of Action Against East Ramapo Central School District .. Document filed by East Ramapo Central School District..(Feldman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Thu 01/28 6:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Jessica Theodore in Support re:20 MOTION to Dismiss Causes of Action Against East Ramapo Central School District .. Document filed by East Ramapo Central School District..(Feldman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Sandra Wilson's Personnel File,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - East Ramapo Central School District's Harassment Policy,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Summons and Complaint
20 20 motion Dismiss Thu 01/28 6:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Causes of Action Against East Ramapo Central School District . Document filed by East Ramapo Central School District..(Feldman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/26 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan Michael Piercey on behalf of Finkelstein Memorial Library..(Piercey, Evan)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/26 2:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erin Callahan on behalf of Finkelstein Memorial Library..(Callahan, Erin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Wed 12/30 5:28 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Judge Vernon S. Broderick is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 12/30 5:28 PM
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (laq)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
17 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Mark Shirian dated December 29, 2020 re: Response to Defendant's Request for Reassignment of Matter to White Plains Courthouse. Document filed by Keon Lee Nash, Kenneth Troy Nash Jr...(Shirian, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2020
16 16 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by counsel for the above captioned parties that the date for the defendant, Finkelstein Memorial Library, to answer or otherwise move in the above captioned matter is adjourned from December 29, 2020 up to and including January 28, 2021. SO ORDERED., Finkelstein Memorial Library answer due 1/28/2021. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/28/2020) (ama)
Related: [-]
15 15 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by counsel for the above captioned parties that the date for the defendant, East Ramapo Central School District to answer or otherwise move in the above captioned matter is adjourned from December 29, 2020 up to and including January 28, 2021. SO ORDERED., East Ramapo Central School District answer due 1/28/2021. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/28/2020) (ama)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 24, 2020
14 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Robert T. Schofield dated 12/24/2020 re: Joining Defendant East Ramapo CSD's request to reassign case to White Plains. Document filed by Finkelstein Memorial Library..(Schofield, Robert)
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Thomas Schofield, IV on behalf of Finkelstein Memorial Library..(Schofield, Robert)
Related: [-]
12 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Finkelstein Memorial Library..(Schofield, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
11 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by East Ramapo Central School District..(Feldman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2020
10 10 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that Plaintiff and the remaining defendants file any responses to the School District's letter, in a letter not to exceed three (3) pages, by December 29, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/18/2020) (rro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
9 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Christopher H. Feldman dated December 17, 2020 re: Reassignment of Matter to White Plains Courthouse. Document filed by East Ramapo Central School District..(Feldman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Darius Patrick Chafizadeh on behalf of East Ramapo Central School District..(Chafizadeh, Darius)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Herbert Feldman on behalf of East Ramapo Central School District..(Feldman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2020
6 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Finkelstein Memorial Library served on 12/8/2020, answer due 12/29/2020. Service was accepted by Laura Wolvern. Document filed by Kenneth Troy Nash Jr.; Keon Lee Nash..(Shirian, Mark)
Related: [-]
5 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. East Ramapo Central School District served on 12/8/2020, answer due 12/29/2020. Service was accepted by Denise Burgos. Document filed by Kenneth Troy Nash Jr.; Keon Lee Nash..(Shirian, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2020
4 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to East Ramapo Central School District, Finkelstein Memorial Library..(dnh)
Related: [-]
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(dnh)
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (dnh)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2020
3 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Shirian, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Finkelstein Memorial Library, East Ramapo Central School District, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Keon Lee Nash, Kenneth Troy Nash Jr...(Shirian, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Glaudin Blanchard, East Ramapo Central School District, Finkelstein Memorial Library. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22690555)Document filed by Kenneth Troy Nash Jr., Keon Lee Nash..(Shirian, Mark)
Related: [-]