Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Case #: 3:05-cr-00176
Case Filed:May 03, 2005
Terminated:Jan 23, 2009
Defendant
"Q"
Defendant
50
Defendant
Alberto Rosembert
Defendant
Antoinette Carter
Defendant
Christina Hood
Defendant
Duwanne Patterson
Defendant
Eric Weatherspoon
Defendant
Fifty
Defendant
Ivan Hall
Defendant
Jessica Spaide
Defendant
Jolene View
Defendant
Kevin Weatherspoon
Defendant
LA
Defendant
Laquane Scott
Defendant
Miami
Defendant
Q
Defendant
Sharon Spaide
Defendant
Slice
Defendant
Smirk
Defendant
Umberto Cunningham
Defendant
Uncle
Defendant
Wilson Rosembert
Interested Party
U.S. Probation - Scranton Office
Plaintiff
USA

GPO May 04 2006
MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying 206 Motion to Suppress as to Ivan Hall (3). Signed by Judge James M. Munley on 5/4/06. (sm, )
GPO Oct 12 2006
MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying 242Dft Eric Weatherspoon's Motion to Suppress as to Eric Weatherspoon (12). Signed by Judge James M. Munley on 10/12/06. (sm, )
GPO Feb 02 2007
MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying 424 Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty as to Ivan Hall (3). Signed by Judge James M. Munley on 2/2/07. (sm, )
GPO May 04 2009
MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying 526 Motion to Vacate (2255) as to Ivan Hall (3). Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 5/4/09. (sm, ) Civil Case 3:08-cv-00307-JMM closed.


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.