New York Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Seibel
Case #: 7:20-cv-11107
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Dec 31, 2020
Last checked: Thursday Dec 31, 2020 3:10 PM EST
Defendant
Victoria Chernyak
Defendant
Jane Does (1-10)
Defendant
Samira Naber
Defendant
Victoria's Secret Stores, Inc.
Represented By
Russell Louis Porter
Porzio Bromberg & Newman
contact info
Defendant
XYZ Corp., Inc. (1-10)
Plaintiff
Kirsi Cruz


Docket last updated: 01/15/2021 11:59 PM EST
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 01/05 8:49 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Russell Louis Porter. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Rockland. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 01/05 8:52 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 01/05 8:54 AM
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 01/05 8:54 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
4 4 notice Notice of Removal Mon 01/04 11:27 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Rockland. Case Number: 031084/2020..Document filed by Victoria's Secret Stores, Inc...(Porter, Russell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 to Notice of Removal,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 to Notice of Removal
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Mon 01/04 11:07 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Russell Louis Porter to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; All parties must be listed in caption, et al is not accepted. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 1/11/2021. (sj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 31, 2020
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 12/31 2:25 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent IB US Retail Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate L Brands, Inc., Other Affiliate Intimate Brands Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate Retail Store Operations, Inc., Other Affiliate Intimate Brands Inc. for Victoria's Secret Stores, Inc.. Document filed by Victoria's Secret Stores, Inc...(Porter, Russell)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 12/31 2:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Porter, Russell)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 12/31 2:21 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Rockland. Case Number: 031084/2020. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23292744).Document filed by Victoria's Secret Stores, Inc...(Porter, Russell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 15 pgs Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 to Notice of Removal,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 to Notice of Removal