Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 5:21-mc-05555
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2021

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago
Friday, December 31, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 12/31 8:30 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Hannah Motsenbocker - 24109829. ($20, receipt number 0539-12489777) (E-mail certificate(s) to hmotsenbocker@gmail.com.). (Motsenbocker, Hannah)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 12/31 10:20 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Leslie Eugene Fourton - 24077856. ($20, receipt number 0539-12490155) (E-mail certificate(s) to lesliefourtonesq@gmail.com.). (Fourton, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 30, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 12/30 10:12 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jordan R Curry - 24116242. ($20, receipt number 0539-12488399) (E-mail certificate(s) to lgarrett@munsch.com.). (Curry, Jordan) Processed on 12/30/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 12/29 9:49 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Addison Fontein - 24109876. ($20, receipt number 0539-12485713). (Fontein, Addison) Processed on 12/29/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 12/29 1:04 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jonathan Whitlock Wharton - 24075764. ($20, receipt number 0539-12486719) (E-mail certificate(s) to jonwhartonlaw@gmail.com.). (Wharton, Jonathan) Processed on 12/29/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 12/29 2:46 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jessica Halley Glitz - 24076095. ($20, receipt number 0539-12487123) (E-mail certificate(s) to jglitz@tbtorts.com.). (Glitz, Jessica) Processed on 12/29/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 12/28 10:23 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Frank J Wright - 22028800. ($20, receipt number 0539-12483866) (E-mail certificate(s) to imelda@fjwight.law.). (Wright, Frank) Processed on 12/28/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 12/28 3:30 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Parker A Burns - 24091843. ($20, receipt number 0539-12484933) (E-mail certificate(s) to darcher@bellnunnally.com.). (Burns, Parker) Processed on 12/28/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 27, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 12/27 1:28 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Nelda Louise Altland - 24031606. ($20, receipt number 0539-12482233) (E-mail certificate(s) to cdespault@thewillislawgroup.com.). (Altland, Nelda) Processed on 12/27/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 12/27 4:53 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Victoria Lynn Rhodes - 24125379. ($20, receipt number 0539-12483108) (E-mail certificate(s) to vlr@robbinstravis.com.). (Rhodes, Victoria)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 12/27 4:54 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for John Charles Josefsberg - 24033599. ($20, receipt number 0539-12483110) (E-mail certificate(s) to gott@hotellawyers.com.). (Josefsberg, John)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 26, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Sun 12/26 5:59 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Basil Emad Adham - 24081742. ($20, receipt number 0539-12480515) (E-mail certificate(s) to lchrisman@johnsonlawgroup.com.). (Adham, Basil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 23, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 12/23 10:54 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Landon W Mignardi - 24121012. ($20, receipt number 0539-12478528) (E-mail certificate(s) to thomas.gruffydd@hklaw.com.). (Mignardi, Landon) Processed on 12/23/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 12/23 1:41 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Ivan Escobar Gomez - 24125767. ($20, receipt number 0539-12479191) (E-mail certificate(s) to ivan.escobar77@gmail.com.). (Escobar Gomez, Ivan) Processed on 12/23/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 12/22 3:52 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Edwin M Buffmire - 24078383, 24102146. ($40, receipt number 0539-12477144) (E-mail certificate(s) to mhale@jw.com.). (Buffmire, Edwin) Processed on 12/22/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 12/22 4:11 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Chase Johnson Cooper - 24087342. ($20, receipt number 0539-12477286) (E-mail certificate(s) to asager@winston.com.). (Cooper, Chase) Processed on 12/22/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 12/22 4:34 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Colin R Batchelor - 24043545. ($20, receipt number 0539-12477404) (E-mail certificate(s) to colin.batchelor@tb-llp.com.). (Batchelor, Colin) Processed on 12/22/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 12/22 4:42 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for K Adam Rothey - 24051274. ($20, receipt number 0539-12477440) (E-mail certificate(s) to arothey@thompsonhorton.com.). (Rothey, K) Processed on 12/22/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 12/21 9:00 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Bruce John Zabarauskas - 24095654. ($20, receipt number 0539-12471657) (E-mail certificate(s) to bruce.zabarauskas@hklaw.com.). (Zabarauskas, Bruce) Processed on 12/21/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 12/21 10:10 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for C Alan Carrillo - 24109693. ($20, receipt number 0539-12472165) (E-mail certificate(s) to carrilloa@akingump.com.). (Carrillo, C) Processed on 12/21/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 12/21 10:44 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Brandon Sample - 5573VT. ($20, receipt number 0539-12472347). (Sample, Brandon) Processed on 12/21/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 12/21 11:22 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Graham P Carney - 24116167. ($20, receipt number 0539-12472528) (E-mail certificate(s) to pgriffin@velaw.com.). (Carney, Graham) Processed on 12/21/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 12/21 1:00 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Ervin Aaron Cartwright, III - 24096804. ($20, receipt number 0539-12472990) (E-mail certificate(s) to Aaron@EACLawyer.com.). (Cartwright, Ervin) Processed on 12/21/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 12/20 10:10 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Joseph J Mammone, Jr - 24102131. ($20, receipt number 0539-12468114) (E-mail certificate(s) to rstanbery@reedsmith.com.). (Mammone, Joseph) Processed on 12/20/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 12/20 12:21 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for J Michael Young - 00786465. ($20, receipt number 0539-12469030) (E-mail certificate(s) to myoung@somlaw.net.). (Young, J) Processed on 12/20/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 12/20 1:28 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Thad Bartholow - 24062602. ($20, receipt number 0539-12469322) (E-mail certificate(s) to mahlet@kblawtx.com.). (Bartholow, Thad) Processed on 12/20/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 17, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 12/17 7:13 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Matthew C Acosta - 24062577. ($20, receipt number 0539-12464006) (E-mail certificate(s) to lmarczak@pcrfirm.com.). (Acosta, Matthew) Processed on 12/17/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 12/17 11:52 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Robert Martin Dungan - 24099021. ($20, receipt number 0539-12465250) (E-mail certificate(s) to katherine.lopez@akerman.com.). (Dungan, Robert) Processed on 12/17/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 12/17 1:10 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Sarah Elizabeth Spires - 24083860. ($20, receipt number 0539-12465478) (E-mail certificate(s) to sharbour@skiermontderby.com.). (Spires, Sarah) Processed on 12/17/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 12/17 6:28 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Andrea S. Turner - 24100977. ($20, receipt number 0539-12467018) (E-mail certificate(s) to mgoens@burkebog.com.). (Turner, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 12/16 7:11 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Taly Haffar - 24038935. ($20, receipt number 0539-12460673) (E-mail certificate(s) to taly@haffarlaw.com.). (Haffar, Taly)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 12/16 11:18 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Kevin W Vice - 00785150, 24099281. ($40, receipt number 0539-12461628) (E-mail certificate(s) to rpienaar@vicehenleylaw.com.). (Vice, Kevin) Processed on 12/16/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 12/16 11:24 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Scott P Hazen - 09311500. ($20, receipt number 0539-12461672) (E-mail certificate(s) to shazen@cowlesthompson.com.). (Hazen, Scott) Processed on 12/16/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 12/16 3:00 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Rachel Hatten Adams - 24101883. ($20, receipt number 0539-12462801) (E-mail certificate(s) to katie.harvey@witheritelaw.com.). (Hatten Adams, Rachel) Processed on 12/16/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 12/16 3:59 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Elizabeth Ellis Hampton - 24125264. ($20, receipt number 0539-12463259). (Hampton, Elizabeth) Processed and mailed to the address on file on 12/16/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 12/15 5:01 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Dakota James Wrinkle - 24118592. ($20, receipt number 0539-12460236) (E-mail certificate(s) to dakota@jonespropertylaw.com.). (Wrinkle, Dakota)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 12/13 9:04 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Charles W Branham, III - 24012323. ($20, receipt number 0539-12449985) (E-mail certificate(s) to tgilliland@dobslegal.com.). (Branham, Charles) Processed on 12/13/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 12/13 10:15 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for David C Miller - 24110114, Samuel T. Acker - 24100111. ($40, receipt number 0539-12450427) (E-mail certificate(s) to jmoss@bradley.com.). (Miller, David) Processed on 12/13/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 12/13 12:02 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Michael L Slack - 18476800. ($20, receipt number 0539-12451186) (E-mail certificate(s) to lstrickland@slackdavis.com.). (Slack, Michael) Processed on 12/13/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 12/13 12:02 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Sarah Shawn Williamson - 24110536. ($20, receipt number 0539-12451190) (E-mail certificate(s) to swilliamson@winstead.com.). (Williamson, Sarah) Processed on 12/13/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 12/13 1:19 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Kaitlyn Marie McClaine - 24126196. ($20, receipt number 0539-12451539) (E-mail certificate(s) to KMcClaine@CanterburyLaw.Com.). (McClaine, Kaitlyn) Processed on 12/13/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 12/13 1:52 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Sarah Shawn Williamson - 24110536. ($20, receipt number 0539-12451722) (E-mail certificate(s) to nnelson@winstead.com.). (Williamson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 12/13 2:21 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Hailee Brina Zeichner Yip - 24105287. ($20, receipt number 0539-12451957) (E-mail certificate(s) to hailee.yip@westwebblaw.com.). (Yip, Hailee) Processed on 12/13/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 12/13 4:12 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jonathan Derek Quick - 24072471. Emailed Certificate of dquick@slackdavis.com. ($20, receipt number 0539-12452750). (Quick, Jonathan) Processed on 12/13/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 12/10 9:00 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Alyssa Marie Peterson - 24123836. ($20, receipt number 0539-12446197) (E-mail certificate(s) to apeterson@littler.com.). (Peterson, Alyssa) Processed on 12/10/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 12/10 10:24 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jibril Ahman Greene - 24093774. ($20, receipt number 0539-12446648) (E-mail certificate(s) to sirish@qslwm.com.). (Greene, Jibril)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 09, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 12/09 10:22 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Kelsey Nicole Linendoll - 24120975. ($20, receipt number 0539-12443173). (Linendoll, Kelsey) Processed on 12/9/2021 (krr). Processed on 12/9/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 12/09 1:15 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Brandy M Wingate Voss - 24037046. ($20, receipt number 0539-12444024) (E-mail certificate(s) to brandy@brandyvosslaw.com.). (Wingate Voss, Brandy) Processed on 12/9/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 12/09 1:26 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Claire Elizabeth Carroll - 24092224. ($20, receipt number 0539-12444068) (E-mail certificate(s) to ccarroll@munsch.com.). (Carroll, Claire) Processed on 12/9/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 12/09 4:03 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Elizabeth K Stepp - 00788467. ($20, receipt number 0539-12445205). (Stepp, Elizabeth) Processed and emailed on 12/9/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 12/09 4:25 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for John H Allen, III - 00788798. ($20, receipt number 0539-12445414) (E-mail certificate(s) to bwiginton@allennolte.com.). (Allen, John) Processed on 12/9/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 12/08 9:28 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Megan Payne Pharis - 24117991. ($20, receipt number 0539-12438913) (E-mail certificate(s) to megan.pharis@qpwblaw.com.). (Pharis, Megan) Processed on 12/8/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 12/08 10:45 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Fred Albert Leibrock - 24063145. ($20, receipt number 0539-12439434) (E-mail certificate(s) to faleibrock@phillipsmurrah.com.). (Leibrock, Fred)Processed on 12/8/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 12/08 2:04 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Derek L Fadner - 24100081. ($20, receipt number 0539-12440560). (Fadner, Derek) Processed and emailed on 12/8/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 12/08 6:02 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Lynette S Byrd - 24047126. ($20, receipt number 0539-12442124) (E-mail certificate(s) to lsb@federal-lawyer.com.). (Byrd, Lynette)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 12/07 9:51 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Ryan Bangert - 24045446. ($20, receipt number 0539-12435514). (Bangert, Ryan) Processed and emailed on 12/7/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 12/07 10:58 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Myles A Parker - 24054570. ($20, receipt number 0539-12435917) (E-mail certificate(s) to bdyess@cwplaw.com.). (Parker, Myles) Processed on 12/7/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 12/07 1:02 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Brian E. Singleterry - 24098433. Emailed Certificate to brian.singleterry@haynesboone.com. ($20, receipt number 0539-12436721). (Singleterry, Brian) Modified text on 12/7/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 12/07 3:00 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Joy Elizabeth Winkler - 24125463. ($20, receipt number 0539-12437369) (E-mail certificate(s) to vsedon@krcl.com.). (Winkler, Joy) Processed on 12/7/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 12/07 3:32 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Rostyslaw J Smyk - 6255495IL. ($20, receipt number 0539-12437594). (Smyk, Rostyslaw) Processed on 12/7/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 06, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 12/06 11:17 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Angela Laughlin Brown - 24034533. ($20, receipt number 0539-12432447) (E-mail certificate(s) to ldeberg@grayreed.com.). (Brown, Angela) Processed on 12/6/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 12/06 12:43 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for John Wilson Miller, II - 24125326. ($20, receipt number 0539-12432912) (E-mail certificate(s) to wilson.miller@haynesboone.com.). (Miller, John) Processed on 12/6/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 12/06 2:24 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Kiprian E Mendrygal - 24041472. ($20, receipt number 0539-12433424). (Mendrygal, Kiprian) Processed on 12/6/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 12/06 2:44 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Reese Emerson Wade - 24100024. ($20, receipt number 0539-12433523) (E-mail certificate(s) to dhouser@grsm.com.). (Wade, Reese) Processed on 12/6/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 03, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 12/03 10:36 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Kasi Gray Schuelke - 24098915. ($20, receipt number 0539-12428944) (E-mail certificate(s) to stephanie.macdonald@phelps.com.). (Schuelke, Kasi) Processed on 12/3/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 02, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 12/02 11:20 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jennifer Henry - 24013790. ($20, receipt number 0539-12425734). (Henry, Jennifer) Processed on 12/2/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 12/02 11:21 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for D. Hunter Polvi - 24083674. ($20, receipt number 0539-12425742) (E-mail certificate(s) to polvih@passmanjones.com.). (Polvi, D.) Processed on 12/2/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 12/02 11:24 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Aaron L Wiley - 21467980. ($20, receipt number 0539-12425704). (Wiley, Aaron) Processed on 12/2/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 12/02 3:15 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for David Warren Henderson - 24032292. ($20, receipt number 0539-12427301) (E-mail certificate(s) to acabello@equalrights.law.). (Henderson, David) Processed on 12/2/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 12/01 10:28 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Timberly Jamal Davis - 24040772. ($20, receipt number 0539-12421704). (Davis, Timberly) Processed and emailed on 12/1/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 12/01 11:31 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Alen A Samuel - 24108245. ($20, receipt number 0539-12421984) (E-mail certificate(s) to lmarczak@pcrfirm.com.). (Samuel, Alen) Processed on 12/1/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/30 9:59 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Dennis M Lynch - 90001506. ($20, receipt number 0539-12418033) (E-mail certificate(s) to candace.gullatt@figdav.com.). (Lynch, Dennis) Processed on 11/30/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/30 11:16 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Debbie Elena Green - 24059852. ($20, receipt number 0539-12418381) (E-mail certificate(s) to mpounds@mwe.com.). (Green, Debbie) Processed on 11/30/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/30 2:45 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jarrett L Hale - 24046005. ($20, receipt number 0539-12419713) (E-mail certificate(s) to astowe@huntonak.com.). (Hale, Jarrett) Processed on 11/30/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/30 3:52 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Michael Scott Gardner - 24002122. ($20, receipt number 0539-12420197) (E-mail certificate(s) to admin@gardnerhaas.com.). (Gardner, Michael)Processed on 11/30/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/30 8:34 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Daley Rachel Epstein - 24113645. ($20, receipt number 0539-12420860). (Epstein, Daley)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/29 10:36 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Michael William Doell - 73131. ($20, receipt number 0539-12414362) (E-mail certificate(s) to hannah.wilbur@BJCIPLaw.com.). (Doell, Michael) Processed on 11/29/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/29 1:23 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Matthew Paul Mattis - 225047. ($20, receipt number 0539-12415202) (E-mail certificate(s) to matthew.mattis@usdoj.gov.). (Mattis, Matthew) Not processed; e-mailed refund instructions on 11/29/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/29 1:45 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for S Benjamin Schindler - 24121820. ($20, receipt number 0539-12415320) (E-mail certificate(s) to s.benjamin.schindler@haynesboone.com.). (Schindler, S) Processed on 11/29/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/29 2:02 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Philip William Danaher - 24078395. ($20, receipt number 0539-12415411) (E-mail certificate(s) to philip@danaherlawfirm.com.). (Danaher, Philip) Processed on 11/29/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/29 2:10 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Angela Promberger - 24123189. ($20, receipt number 0539-12415453) (E-mail certificate(s) to kspillman@fhmbk.com.). (Promberger, Angela) Processed on 11/29/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 27, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Sat 11/27 7:27 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Richard M Hunt - 10288700. ($20, receipt number 0539-12413169). (Hunt, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/24 2:06 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Charles Brian Sherrard - 24090384. ($20, receipt number 0539-12411682). (Sherrard, Charles) Processed on 11/24/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/23 12:19 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Darren Ray Wolf - 24072430. ($20, receipt number 0539-12408189) (E-mail certificate(s) to darren@darrenwolf.com.). (Wolf, Darren) Processed on 11/23/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/23 1:20 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Laurel Curtis - 24109110. ($20, receipt number 0539-12408447). (Curtis, Laurel) Processed on 11/23/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/23 1:28 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jessica Jones Mannon - 24106247. ($20, receipt number 0539-12408477) (E-mail certificate(s) to lmonreal@akingump.com.). (Mannon, Jessica) Processed on 11/23/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/23 5:18 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Tara Suzette Kern - 24099283. ($20, receipt number 0539-12409771) (E-mail certificate(s) to yjacobus@dykema.com.). (Kern, Tara)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 22, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/22 12:22 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Nathan Isaiah Charles Cox - 24105751, 24061135, 24059444. ($60, receipt number 0539-12404213) (E-mail certificate(s) to jhaynie@carterarnett.com.). (Cox, Nathan) Processed on 11/22/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/22 2:03 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Hannah Elizabeth Walsh - 24125717. ($20, receipt number 0539-12404699) (E-mail certificate(s) to hwalsh@jw.com.). (Walsh, Hannah) Processed on 11/22/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/22 2:11 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Tailim Song - 00792845, 24093350. ($40, receipt number 0539-12404752) (E-mail certificate(s) to jwhiddon@tailimsong.com.). (Song, Tailim) Processed both on 11/22/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/22 2:59 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Matthew Markestad Johnson - 24108781. Emailed Certificate to mjohnson@jw.com. ($20, receipt number 0539-12405038). (Johnson, Matthew) Processed on 11/22/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/22 3:14 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Mary Ciera Wilson - 24120329. ($20, receipt number 0539-12405207) (E-mail certificate(s) to rpereyda@wshblaw.com.). (Wilson, Mary) Processed on 11/22/2021 (chmb)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/22 3:15 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Tony L Schaffer - 17720880. ($20, receipt number 0539-12405225) (E-mail certificate(s) to tschaffer@slftexaslaw.com.). (Schaffer, Tony) Processed on 11/22/2021 (chmb)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/22 5:40 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Christina Harrison Pittman - 24028840. ($20, receipt number 0539-12406137) (E-mail certificate(s) to cpittman@grsm.com.). (Pittman, Christina)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 19, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 11/19 4:55 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Kent S Hofmeister - 09791700. ($20, receipt number 0539-12401978) (E-mail certificate(s) to dlynch@bhlaw.net.). (Hofmeister, Kent)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 11/18 10:22 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Richard D Anigian - 01264700, 24060397. ($40, receipt number 0539-12395870). (Anigian, Richard)Processed and emailed on 11/18/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 11/18 12:58 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for James Royce Parish - 24071830. ($20, receipt number 0539-12396839) (E-mail certificate(s) to rpereyda@wshblaw.com.). (Parish, James) Processed on 11/18/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/17 12:28 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for David I Monteiro - 24079020. ($20, receipt number 0539-12392974). (Monteiro, David)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/17 3:44 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Whitney L White - 24075269. ($20, receipt number 0539-12394178) (E-mail certificate(s) to wwhite@sessions.legal.). (White, Whitney) Processed on 11/17/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/17 5:12 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Tanika J Solomon - 24057713. ($20, receipt number 0539-12394653) (E-mail certificate(s) to attorney@tjsololaw.com.). (Solomon, Tanika)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/16 8:53 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Christopher Richard Knapp - 24079811. ($20, receipt number 0539-12387533) (E-mail certificate(s) to joni.clemens@higginslaw.com.). (Knapp, Christopher) Emailed refund instructions on 11/16/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/16 10:19 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Charles Arnison Wallace - 24110501. ($20, receipt number 0539-12388115) (E-mail certificate(s) to cwallace@creedon.com.). (Wallace, Charles) Processed on 11/16/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/16 11:12 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Fatma E Marouf - 222732 (CA). ($20, receipt number 0539-12388456). (Marouf, Fatma) Processed on 11/16/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/16 1:19 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Aida Vianey Nieto Meraz - 24104052. ($20, receipt number 0539-12389228) (E-mail certificate(s) to Aida@doyleseelbach.com.). (Nieto Meraz, Aida) Processed on 11/16/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/16 2:03 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Hardin Russell Ramey - 16496500. ($20, receipt number 0539-12389524) (E-mail certificate(s) to mjohnson@rameylawfirm.com.). (Ramey, Hardin) Processed on 11/16/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/16 4:17 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Farooq A Tayab - 24063028. ($20, receipt number 0539-12390505) (E-mail certificate(s) to farooq.tayab@nortonrosefulbright.com.). (Tayab, Farooq) Processed on 11/16/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/16 4:48 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Bret Thomas Winterle - 24084249. ($20, receipt number 0539-12390803) (E-mail certificate(s) to mathews@fr.com.). (Winterle, Bret) Processed on 11/16/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/16 5:17 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Owen Colin Babcock - 24104585. ($20, receipt number 0539-12390915) (E-mail certificate(s) to obabcock@padfieldstout.com.). (Babcock, Owen)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/15 10:46 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Frank A Perez - 00789541. ($20, receipt number 0539-12384071) (E-mail certificate(s) to olgafrankperezlaw@outlook.com.). (Perez, Frank) Processed on 11/15/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/15 1:57 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Elizabeth Jane Sanford - 24100618. ($20, receipt number 0539-12385283) (E-mail certificate(s) to esanford@sanfordfirm.com.). (Sanford, Elizabeth) Processed on 11/15/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/15 2:05 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Melinda Arbuckle - 24080773. ($20, receipt number 0539-12385326). (Arbuckle, Melinda) Processed on 11/15/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/15 4:00 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Hunter Wayne Mattocks - 24120995. ($20, receipt number 0539-12386432) (E-mail certificate(s) to ccox@njdhs.com.). (Mattocks, Hunter) Processed on 11/15/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/15 5:15 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jonathan Andrew Lautin - 24092669. ($20, receipt number 0539-12386928) (E-mail certificate(s) to aperkins@qslwm.com.). (Lautin, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 11/12 8:47 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jared William Barton - 24121513. ($20, receipt number 0539-12379081) (E-mail certificate(s) to jbarton@bf-law.com.). (Barton, Jared) Processed on 11/12/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 11/12 12:32 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Zino Magbegor - 24103871. ($20, receipt number 0539-12380505). (Magbegor, Zino) Processed on 11/12/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 11/12 1:36 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Bruce W Akerly - 00953200. ($20, receipt number 0539-12380790) (E-mail certificate(s) to mditto@akerlylaw.com.). (Akerly, Bruce) Processed on 11/12/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 11, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 11/11 8:40 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Spencer M Mainka - 24116707. ($20, receipt number 0539-12378053) (E-mail certificate(s) to mchandler@phamharrison.com.). (Mainka, Spencer) Processed on 11/11/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 11/11 9:11 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Peter L Harlan - 09011300, 16878000. ($40, receipt number 0539-12378067) (E-mail certificate(s) to peterharlan@aol.com.). (Harlan, Peter) Processed on 11/11/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 11/11 4:59 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Crystal Rachelle Cravens - 24099016. ($20, receipt number 0539-12378648) (E-mail certificate(s) to crystalrcravens@gmail.com.). (Cravens, Crystal) Processed on 11/11/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 11/11 8:33 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Joanna Green Brown - 24055222. ($20, receipt number 0539-12378768) (E-mail certificate(s) to jgb@texasdisabilitycounsel.com.). (Brown, Joanna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/10 9:56 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Seth Ryan Lightfoot - 24093625. ($20, receipt number 0539-12374429) (E-mail certificate(s) to akatoramirez@martinbaughman.com.). (Lightfoot, Seth) Processed on 11/10/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/10 3:45 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Haley Mowdy Owen - 24121042. ($20, receipt number 0539-12376944). (Owen, Haley) Processed on 11/10/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/10 4:07 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Harrison Monfort Smith - 24103938. ($20, receipt number 0539-12377178) (E-mail certificate(s) to vportillo@sr-llp.com.). (Smith, Harrison) Processed on 11/10/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/10 5:10 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Iwana Rademaekers - 16452560. ($20, receipt number 0539-12377599) (E-mail certificate(s) to sandy@rademaekerslaw.com.). (Rademaekers, Iwana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/09 6:46 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Darin M Klemchuk - 24002418, Christian Cowart 24105748, Mandi Phillips 24036117. ($60, receipt number 0539-12370103) (E-mail certificate(s) to litigation@klemchuk.com.). (Klemchuk, Darin) Processed on 11/9/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/09 11:45 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Virginia Bell Flynn - 24101258. ($20, receipt number 0539-12371396). (Flynn, Virginia) Processed on 11/9/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/09 11:53 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jaclyn Annette Gallian - 24092845. ($20, receipt number 0539-12371467). (Gallian, Jaclyn) Processed on 11/9/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/09 3:48 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Kristopher Dennis Hill - 24066674. ($20, receipt number 0539-12372945) (E-mail certificate(s) to tstephenson@bellnunnally.com.). (Hill, Kristopher) Processed on 11/9/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/08 8:38 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Michael Allan Erdmann - 24055453. ($20, receipt number 0539-12364055) (E-mail certificate(s) to merdmann@jonesday.com.). (Erdmann, Michael) Processed on 11/8/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/08 11:17 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Patrick Vincent Plassio - 24102362. ($20, receipt number 0539-12366786) (E-mail certificate(s) to nalonso@omm.com.). (Plassio, Patrick) Processed on 11/8/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/08 12:05 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Angela Amanda Avent - 24107572. ($20, receipt number 0539-12367136) (E-mail certificate(s) to tharris@mayerllp.com.). (Avent, Angela) Processed on 11/8/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/08 12:10 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Hollye H Hawkins - 24041069. ($20, receipt number 0539-12367132) (E-mail certificate(s) to zreyes@bmwb-law.com.). (Hawkins, Hollye) Refund information sent to attorney due to attorney NOT admitted on 11/8/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/08 12:29 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Michael Lawrence Baum - 24006815. ($20, receipt number 0539-12367258) (E-mail certificate(s) to liz.paulson@wickphillips.com.). (Baum, Michael) Processed on 11/8/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/08 1:03 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Rachel L Wright - 24054255, 24104455. ($40, receipt number 0539-12367357) (E-mail certificate(s) to lbell@martinbaughman.com.). (Wright, Rachel) Processed on 11/8/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/08 4:27 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Braxton B Markle - 24126022. ($20, receipt number 0539-12369385) (E-mail certificate(s) to bmarkle@curtislaw.net.). (Markle, Braxton) Processed on 11/8/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/08 5:07 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Christina W Stephenson - 24049535. ($20, receipt number 0539-12369662) (E-mail certificate(s) to elisa.weaver@crowedunlevy.com.). (Stephenson, Christina)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/08 5:31 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Zachary Brian Tobolowsky - 24106512. ($20, receipt number 0539-12369764). (Tobolowsky, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 06, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Sat 11/06 10:51 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jamie Rae Drillette - 24105820. ($20, receipt number 0539-12363365) (E-mail certificate(s) to nstallbohm@lynnllp.com.). (Drillette, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 04, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 11/04 8:50 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Paul Wilfred Cervenka - 24061301. ($20, receipt number 0539-12356831). (Cervenka, Paul) Processed on 11/4/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 11/04 2:03 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Kristin Mary Burns - 24102934. ($20, receipt number 0539-12358569) (E-mail certificate(s) to eperez@godwinbowman.com.). (Burns, Kristin) Processed on 11/4/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 11/04 3:48 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Grant Peter Boston - 24081984. ($20, receipt number 0539-12359442) (E-mail certificate(s) to dpayne@hamiltonwingo.com.). (Boston, Grant) Processed on 11/4/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 03, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/03 9:43 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Victor R Rodriguez, II - 24063577. ($20, receipt number 0539-12353435). (Rodriguez, Victor) Processed on 11/3/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/03 9:53 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for John Charles Nohinek - 00794379. ($20, receipt number 0539-12353586). (Nohinek, John) Processed on 11/3/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/03 11:51 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Michael Quinn Roos - 24093806. ($20, receipt number 0539-12354343) (E-mail certificate(s) to rpereyda@wshblaw.com.). (Roos, Michael) Processed on 11/3/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/03 12:29 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Emma Louise Persson - 24110219, Gregory M. Wilkes - 24047105, Nicholas Jay Hendrix - 24087708. ($60, receipt number 0539-12354453). (Persson, Emma) Processed on 11/3/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/03 1:53 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Daniel Micah Mehler - 24085752. ($20, receipt number 0539-12354958) (E-mail certificate(s) to daniel@mehlercannabis.com.). (Mehler, Daniel) Processed on 11/3/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/03 2:56 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Marilyn D Garner - 07675550. ($20, receipt number 0539-12355365) (E-mail certificate(s) to laker@marilyndgarner.com.). (Garner, Marilyn) Processed on 11/3/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 11/03 4:50 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Anne-Alise Fritsche - 24090786. ($20, receipt number 0539-12356162) (E-mail certificate(s) to thooker@kesslercollins.com.). (Fritsche, Anne-Alise) Processed on 11/3/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/02 9:15 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Allison Marie Stewart - 24102538. ($20, receipt number 0539-12349403) (E-mail certificate(s) to mcphersonm@gtlaw.com.). (Stewart, Allison) Processed on 11/2/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/02 12:05 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Robert A Bragalone - 02855850. ($20, receipt number 0539-12350592) (E-mail certificate(s) to dhouser@grsm.com.). (Bragalone, Robert) Processed on 11/2/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/02 12:20 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Kristen L. Lawhorn - 24071187, 24071280. ($40, receipt number 0539-12350685) (E-mail certificate(s) to christinawilkins@holdenlitigation.com.). (Lawhorn, Kristen) Processed on 11/2/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/02 3:21 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Aimee Elizabeth Marcotte - 24097101. ($20, receipt number 0539-12351720). (Marcotte, Aimee) Processed and emailed on 11/2/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 11/02 4:58 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Michael Hendryx - 09461200. ($20, receipt number 0539-12352480) (E-mail certificate(s) to aellis@strongpipkin.com.). (Hendryx, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/01 9:51 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Thomas J Zavala - 24116265. ($20, receipt number 0539-12345403) (E-mail certificate(s) to tom.zavala@haynesboone.com.). (Zavala, Thomas) Processed on 11/1/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/01 4:18 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Megan M Adeyemo - 24099595. ($20, receipt number 0539-12348026). (Adeyemo, Megan) Processed on 11/1/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/01 4:20 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for William E Hymes - 24029624. ($20, receipt number 0539-12348049) (E-mail certificate(s) to wehymes@loncarlyonjenkins.com.). (Hymes, William) Processed on 11/1/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 11/01 4:38 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Sondra S Sylva - 24033017. ($20, receipt number 0539-12348232) (E-mail certificate(s) to angela.lansford@faegredrinker.com.). (Sylva, Sondra) Processed on 11/1/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 10/29 9:39 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jacob Nelson Runyon - 24083771, 24079953. ($40, receipt number 0539-12341584) (E-mail certificate(s) to jacob@clinesmithfirm.com.). (Runyon, Jacob) Processed both on 10/29/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 28, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/28 9:45 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Thomas E Myers, 24036575, 17906000. ($60, receipt number 0539-12337702) (E-mail certificate(s) to mlambert@belaw.com.). (Myers, Thomas) Processed on 10/28/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/28 11:16 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Brad A Allen - 00796115. ($20, receipt number 0539-12338466) (E-mail certificate(s) to anhleen@mdjwlaw.com.). (Allen, Brad) Processed on 10/28/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/28 11:35 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Dean James Roggia - 24070524. ($20, receipt number 0539-12338635) (E-mail certificate(s) to droggia@gmail.com.). (Roggia, Dean) Processed on 10/28/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/27 12:51 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jeffrey L Diamond - 05802500. ($20, receipt number 0539-12335164) (E-mail certificate(s) to service@jdiamondandassociates.com.). (Diamond, Jeffrey) Processed on 10/27/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/27 2:37 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jeffrey David Parks - 24076607. ($20, receipt number 0539-12335773) (E-mail certificate(s) to putnam@fsclaw.com.). (Parks, Jeffrey) Processed on 10/27/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/27 4:10 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Xintong Song - 24121141. ($20, receipt number 0539-12336410). (Song, Xintong) NOT Processed on 10/27/2021; Refund instructions sent. (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/27 5:40 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Scott Dickerson Lawrence - 24087896. ($20, receipt number 0539-12336835) (E-mail certificate(s) to brenda.ramirez@wickphillips.com.). (Lawrence, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/26 8:42 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Flannery Hoard Nardone - 24083183. ($20, receipt number 0539-12329753) (E-mail certificate(s) to fnardone@mhba.com.). (Nardone, Flannery) Processed on 10/26/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/26 10:08 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Andrew Dalton Gray - 24110756. ($20, receipt number 0539-12330265) (E-mail certificate(s) to agray@qslwm.com.). (Gray, Andrew) Processed on 10/26/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/26 10:30 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Donald A Waltz - 24018061. ($20, receipt number 0539-12330416) (E-mail certificate(s) to jspencer@krcl.com.). (Waltz, Donald) Processed on 10/26/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/26 12:22 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Richard Bodnar - 5301999NY. ($20, receipt number 0539-12331196) (E-mail certificate(s) to cdeleon@rksllp.com.). (Bodnar, Richard) Processed on 10/26/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/26 1:26 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Bret Thomas Winterle - 24084249. ($20, receipt number 0539-12331540) (E-mail certificate(s) to hart@fr.com.). (Winterle, Bret) Processed on 10/26/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/26 2:29 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Rhett J Hubbard - 24032315. ($20, receipt number 0539-12331951). (Hubbard, Rhett) Processed on 10/26/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/26 2:55 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Harvey G Joseph - 11027850. ($20, receipt number 0539-12332182) (E-mail certificate(s) to clgarza@dediego.com.). (Joseph, Harvey) Processed on 10/26/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/26 4:17 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Wendy D Dawer - 24036451. ($20, receipt number 0539-12332913) (E-mail certificate(s) to wdawer@jonesdavis.com.). (Dawer, Wendy) Processed on 10/26/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 25, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/25 9:39 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for G Luke Ashley - 01377500. ($20, receipt number 0539-12326577) (E-mail certificate(s) to g.luke.ashley@gmail.com.). (Ashley, G) Processed on 10/25/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/25 10:09 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Rodeen Talebi - 24103958. ($20, receipt number 0539-12326755) (E-mail certificate(s) to mathews@fr.com.). (Talebi, Rodeen) Processed on 10/25/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/25 11:18 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Michael Lee Martin - 24108956. Emailed Certificate to mmartin@bhlaw.net. ($20, receipt number 0539-12327054). (Martin, Michael) Processed on 10/25/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/25 4:00 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Colin David Moore - 24041513. ($20, receipt number 0539-12328729) (E-mail certificate(s) to dfelps@pulf.com.). (Moore, Colin) Processed on 10/25/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/25 4:35 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Stafford Powell Brantley - 24104774. ($20, receipt number 0539-12328953) (E-mail certificate(s) to samantha.tandy@wickphillips.com.). (Brantley, Stafford) Proccsesed on 10/25/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/25 6:51 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for John W Bowdich, II - 00796233. ($20, receipt number 0539-12329403) (E-mail certificate(s) to jbowdich@bowdichlaw.com.). (Bowdich, John)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/25 11:08 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Christian Celeste Nisttahuz - 24104399. ($20, receipt number 0539-12329578). (Nisttahuz, Christian)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 24, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Sun 10/24 1:11 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Steven Santayana - 24093104. ($20, receipt number 0539-12325978) (E-mail certificate(s) to stevesantayana@gmail.com.). (Santayana, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 10/22 9:34 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for James Ralph Aulbaugh, III - 24062594. ($20, receipt number 0539-12323175) (E-mail certificate(s) to jaulbaughlaw@gmail.com.). (Aulbaugh, James) Processed on 10/22/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 10/22 10:51 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Todd Hoodenpyle - 00798265. ($20, receipt number 0539-12323485) (E-mail certificate(s) to tguillory@singerlevick.com.). (Hoodenpyle, Todd) Processed on 10/22/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 10/22 11:09 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Aaron Spolin - 24118984. ($20, receipt number 0539-12323599) (E-mail certificate(s) to clientmail@spolinlaw.com.). (Spolin, Aaron) Not Processed- Refund Instructions emailed on 10/22/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 10/22 5:41 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Parker Lee Graham - 24087612, Mike Birrer 00783662. ($40, receipt number 0539-12325601) (E-mail certificate(s) to plittrell@ccsb.com.). (Graham, Parker)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 10/22 6:11 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Austin Teng - 24093247. ($20, receipt number 0539-12325644). (Teng, Austin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/21 8:37 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Marc A Fuller - 24032210. ($20, receipt number 0539-12319219). (Fuller, Marc) Processed on 10/21/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/21 1:49 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Amanda Rodriguez - 24121368. ($20, receipt number 0539-12321110) (E-mail certificate(s) to cvarley@zelle.com.). (Rodriguez, Amanda)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/21 2:34 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for John R Wolffarth - 24051543. ($20, receipt number 0539-12321399) (E-mail certificate(s) to jwolffarth@gmail.com.). (Wolffarth, John) Processed on 10/21/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/21 3:04 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Chris A Davis - 24050483. ($20, receipt number 0539-12321537) (E-mail certificate(s) to ldeberg@grayreed.com.). (Davis, Chris) Processed on 10/21/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/21 6:33 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Chelsea Ann Till - 24115858. ($20, receipt number 0539-12322573) (E-mail certificate(s) to ctill@jonesday.com.). (Till, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/20 1:01 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Steven Scott Schulte - 24051306, Darren McDowell - 24025520. ($40, receipt number 0539-12316763) (E-mail certificate(s) to schulte@fnlawfirm.com; dmcdowell@fnlawfirm.com.). (Schulte, Steven)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/20 2:30 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Dixon Ji-shing Cheung - 24105594. ($20, receipt number 0539-12317363) (E-mail certificate(s) to dcheung@godwinbowman.com.). (Cheung, Dixon) Processed on 10/20/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/20 2:35 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Bryan D Pope - 00788213, 24071156. ($40, receipt number 0539-12317440) (E-mail certificate(s) to twickstrom@cochrantexas.com.). (Pope, Bryan) Processed on 10/20/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/20 3:40 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Carl E Bruce - 24036278, Aaron P. Pirouznia - 24098958, Matthew A. Colvin - 24087331. ($60, receipt number 0539-12317931) (E-mail certificate(s) to prim@fr.com.). (Bruce, Carl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/19 1:57 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Alicia Diane Butler - 00797823. ($20, receipt number 0539-12310720). (Butler, Alicia) Processed on 10/19/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/19 9:02 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for James O Hacking, III - 46728MO. ($20, receipt number 0539-12311024) (E-mail certificate(s) to tdelafuente@hackinglawpractice.com.). (Hacking, James) Processed on 10/19/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/19 11:57 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Steven L Hoard - 09736600. ($20, receipt number 0539-12312316) (E-mail certificate(s) to shoard@mhba.com.). (Hoard, Steven) Processed on 10/19/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/19 2:38 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Sarah Elizabeth Dill - 24115436. ($20, receipt number 0539-12313308). (Dill, Sarah) Processed on 10/19/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/19 4:04 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Daryl K Washington - 24013714. ($20, receipt number 0539-12313941). (Washington, Daryl) Processed on 10/19/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/19 5:23 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Matthew D Anderson - 24012216. ($20, receipt number 0539-12314380). (Anderson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/18 1:25 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for James Lucas Garritson - 24074256. ($20, receipt number 0539-12308685) (E-mail certificate(s) to Lucas@bgimmlaw.com.). (Garritson, James) Processed on 10/18/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/18 1:32 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jacqueline Hebe Burgos-Garritson - 22087. ($20, receipt number 0539-12308715) (E-mail certificate(s) to Jacquie@bgimmlaw.com.). (Burgos-Garritson, Jacqueline) Processed on 10/18/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/18 1:48 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Kathleen R Barrow - 24035656. ($20, receipt number 0539-12308789) (E-mail certificate(s) to tkuebler@foxrothschild.com.). (Barrow, Kathleen) Processed on 10/18/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/18 3:21 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Reagan Faith Ewing - 24101162. Emailed Certificate to reagan@ewingesquire.com. ($20, receipt number 0539-12309488). (Ewing, Reagan) Processed on 10/18/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/18 4:51 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Megan Elizabeth Zeller - 24082187. ($20, receipt number 0539-12310189). (Zeller, Megan) Processed on 10/18/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 10/15 5:10 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Adewale Shamusideen Odetunde, JR - 24088146. ($20, receipt number 0539-12306212). (Odetunde, Adewale)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/14 11:47 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Elizabeth Lee Thompson - 00788290, 09601500. ($40, receipt number 0539-12300535) (E-mail certificate(s) to jsullivan@thompsoncoe.com.). (Thompson, Elizabeth) Processed on 10/14/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/14 11:55 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Mel Bailey - 01532100. ($20, receipt number 0539-12300628) (E-mail certificate(s) to dcarberry@kslaw.com.). (Bailey, Mel) Processed on 10/14/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/14 2:28 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Justin Scott Cohen - 24078356. ($20, receipt number 0539-12301539) (E-mail certificate(s) to stacy.gunder@hklaw.com.). (Cohen, Justin) Processed on 10/14/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/13 8:45 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Stephen Brice Burris - 24092200. ($20, receipt number 0539-12295086) (E-mail certificate(s) to brice@fnlawfirm.com.). (Burris, Stephen) Processed on 10/13/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/13 10:42 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Russell C Brown - 03167510. ($20, receipt number 0539-12295751) (E-mail certificate(s) to misty@rcbrownlaw.com.). (Brown, Russell) Processed on 10/13/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/13 3:14 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Vivian Paige Eldridge - 24096747. ($20, receipt number 0539-12297313). (Eldridge, Vivian) Processed on 10/13/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/12 9:24 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for John Paul Murphy - 24056024. ($20, receipt number 0539-12291410) (E-mail certificate(s) to emma@nelbum.com.). (Murphy, John) Processed on 10/12/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/12 10:48 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Leslie Eugene Fourton - 24077856. ($20, receipt number 0539-12291763) (E-mail certificate(s) to lesliefourtonesq@gmail.com.). (Fourton, Leslie) Processed on 10/12/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/12 2:22 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Emily Buchanan - 24101568. ($20, receipt number 0539-12292960) (E-mail certificate(s) to emily.buchanan@haynesboone.com.). (Buchanan, Emily) Processed on 10/12/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/12 3:34 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Shane Eghbal - 24101723. ($20, receipt number 0539-12293613) (E-mail certificate(s) to kayladamron@mccathernlaw.com.). (Eghbal, Shane)Processed on 10/12/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 11, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/11 3:27 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Scott A Cummings - 00793573, 12728500. ($40, receipt number 0539-12290559) (E-mail certificate(s) to st@all-lawfirm.com.). (Cummings, Scott)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/11 4:11 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Arthur J Anderson - 01165957. ($20, receipt number 0539-12290609) (E-mail certificate(s) to acruise@winstead.com.). (Anderson, Arthur)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/11 4:38 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Gregory Getty Hesse - 09549419. ($20, receipt number 0539-12290639) (E-mail certificate(s) to creeves@Huntonak.com.). (Hesse, Gregory)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/11 5:28 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Garrett L Roberts - 24099027. ($20, receipt number 0539-12290733) (E-mail certificate(s) to Garrett.roberts@bakerlopez.com.). (Roberts, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 10/08 9:42 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for David Michel Patin, Jr - 24076611. ($20, receipt number 0539-12286903) (E-mail certificate(s) to davidmichelpatinjr@gmail.com.). (Patin, David) Processed on 10/8/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 10/08 11:44 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for John Paul Stanford - 19037350. ($20, receipt number 0539-12287504) (E-mail certificate(s) to jstanford@qslwm.com.). (Stanford, John) Processed on 10/8/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 10/08 3:27 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Chad Christopher Taylor - 24097172. ($20, receipt number 0539-12288892) (E-mail certificate(s) to chadtaylor@baronbudd.com.). (Taylor, Chad) Processed on 10/8/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 10/08 4:01 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Alexandria Renee Rahn - 24110246. ($20, receipt number 0539-12289071) (E-mail certificate(s) to arahn@dykema.com.). (Rahn, Alexandria) Processed on 10/8/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/07 9:20 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Samantha Peabody Estrello - 24056112, 11409100. ($40, receipt number 0539-12283126). (Estrello, Samantha) Processed both on 10/7/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/07 10:08 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for C Daniel DiLizia - 24099800. ($20, receipt number 0539-12283454) (E-mail certificate(s) to dan.dilizia@gmail.com.). (DiLizia, C) Processed on 10/7/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/07 2:01 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Katherine Isabel Serrano - 24110764. ($20, receipt number 0539-12284656) (E-mail certificate(s) to krollins@foresterhaynie.com.). (Serrano, Katherine) Processed on 10/7/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 10/07 5:57 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Kristina N Kastl - 24025467. ($20, receipt number 0539-12286123) (E-mail certificate(s) to msotelo@kastllaw.com.). (Kastl, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/06 10:15 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Patricia Morgan - 24087521. ($20, receipt number 0539-12279411) (E-mail certificate(s) to salas@kelleyfirm.com.). (Morgan, Patricia) Processed on 10/6/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/06 10:50 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Ryan Jonathan Meyer - 24088053. ($20, receipt number 0539-12279584) (E-mail certificate(s) to quinta.cochran@katten.com.). (Meyer, Ryan) Processed on 10/6/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/06 1:49 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Hardin Russell Ramey - 16496500. ($20, receipt number 0539-12280682) (E-mail certificate(s) to mjohnson@rameylawfirm.com.). (Ramey, Hardin) Processed on 10/6/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 10/06 3:40 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for McCall Kathryn Hoerz - 24116524. ($20, receipt number 0539-12281610) (E-mail certificate(s) to joncileedavis@polsinelli.com.). (Hoerz, McCall) Processed on 10/6/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/05 11:20 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Thomas W Arbon - 01284275. ($20, receipt number 0539-12276263) (E-mail certificate(s) to akatoramirez@martinbaughman.com.). (Arbon, Thomas) Processed on 10/5/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/05 11:32 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Angela Marie Oliver - 24102303. ($20, receipt number 0539-12276319) (E-mail certificate(s) to angela.oliver@haynesboone.com.). (Oliver, Angela) Processed on 10/5/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/05 1:55 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Sarah Mitchell Montgomery - 24045792. ($20, receipt number 0539-12277051) (E-mail certificate(s) to smmontgomery@jw.com.). (Montgomery, Sarah) Processed on 10/5/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/05 2:51 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Elizabeth Z Brabb - 24091351. ($20, receipt number 0539-12277309). (Brabb, Elizabeth) Processed on 10/5/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 10/05 3:01 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for John H Allen, III - 00788798. ($20, receipt number 0539-12277388) (E-mail certificate(s) to bwiginton@allennolte.com.). (Allen, John)Processed on 10/5/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/04 10:03 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Weldon Reed Allmand - 24027134. ($20, receipt number 0539-12271544) (E-mail certificate(s) to rallmand@allmandlaw.com.). (Allmand, Weldon) Processed on 10/4/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/04 12:33 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Weston M Davis - 24065126. ($20, receipt number 0539-12272469) (E-mail certificate(s) to weston.davis@akerman.com.). (Davis, Weston) Processed on 10/4/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 10/04 3:57 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jennifer Marie McCoy - 24089805, Kimberly F. Williams - 24050592. ($40, receipt number 0539-12274049) (E-mail certificate(s) to gberkshier@lockelord.com.). (McCoy, Jennifer) Processed on 10/4/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 03, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Sun 10/03 8:12 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Stephen Le Brocq - 24094791. ($20, receipt number 0539-12270621). (Le Brocq, Stephen)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Sun 10/03 12:04 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Tony L Schaffer - 17720880. ($20, receipt number 0539-12270638) (E-mail certificate(s) to tschaffer@slftexaslaw.com.). (Schaffer, Tony)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 10/01 11:23 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Patrick Wright - 22045800. ($20, receipt number 0539-12268417) (E-mail certificate(s) to patrick@wrightfirm.com.). (Wright, Patrick) Processed on 10/1/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 10/01 12:47 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Chanele N Reyes - 24120381. ($20, receipt number 0539-12268748). Related [+] Processed on 10/1/2021 (krr)
Related: [-] yes, Chanele
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 10/01 2:24 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Brittney Denise Johnson - 24080963. ($20, receipt number 0539-12269197) (E-mail certificate(s) to twhiteside@burnscharest.com.). (Johnson, Brittney) Processed on 10/1/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/30 8:40 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Caroline Elizabeth Allen - 24121320. ($20, receipt number 0539-12262969) (E-mail certificate(s) to gtaylor@sanderscollins.com.). (Allen, Caroline) Processed on 9/30/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/30 11:02 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Lanie Nichole Bennett - 24107299. Email to lanie.bennett@kellyhart.com ($20, receipt number 0539-12264012). (Bennett, Lanie) Processed on 9/30/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/29 10:29 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Joshua Vladimir Michaels - 24106305. ($20, receipt number 0539-12259682) (E-mail certificate(s) to akatoramirez@martinbaughman.com.). (Michaels, Joshua) Processed on 9/29/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/29 11:41 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Rachel L Wright - 24054255. ($20, receipt number 0539-12260249) (E-mail certificate(s) to lbell@martinbaughman.com.). (Wright, Rachel) Processed on 9/29/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 09/28 8:45 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Brandon K Bains - 24050126. ($20, receipt number 0539-12255193) (E-mail certificate(s) to bbains@l-llp.com.). (Bains, Brandon) Processed on 9/28/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 09/28 5:01 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Laurie Spindler - 24028720. ($20, receipt number 0539-12258247) (E-mail certificate(s) to laurie.spindler@lgbs.com.). (Spindler, Laurie)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 09/28 5:14 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Sherrel Kay Knighton - 00796900. ($20, receipt number 0539-12258269). (Knighton, Sherrel)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 09/27 9:37 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Steven G Gersten - 24087579. Emailed Certificate to sgersten@sheppardmullin.com. ($20, receipt number 0539-12251422). (Gersten, Steven) Processed on 9/27/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 09/27 3:18 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Niles S Illich - 24069969. ($20, receipt number 0539-12253680) (E-mail certificate(s) to niles@scottpalmerlaw.com.). (Illich, Niles) Processed on 9/27/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 09/27 3:18 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Tiffany Agatha Au - 24075842. ($20, receipt number 0539-12253695) (E-mail certificate(s) to Tau@thompsoncoe.com.). (Au, Tiffany) Processed on 9/27/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 24, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/24 11:43 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Ryan Bangert - 24045446. ($20, receipt number 0539-12248166). (Bangert, Ryan) Processed on 9/24/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/24 1:21 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Veronica Gomez Diaz-Arrastia - 24105804. ($20, receipt number 0539-12248621) (E-mail certificate(s) to akatoramirez@martinbaughman.com.). (Diaz-Arrastia, Veronica) Processed on 9/24/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/24 1:58 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jamie Rae Drillette - 24105820. ($20, receipt number 0539-12248819) (E-mail certificate(s) to nstallbohm@lynnllp.com.). (Drillette, Jamie) Processed on 9/24/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/24 5:01 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Madeline Joye Smart - 24105352. ($20, receipt number 0539-12250182) (E-mail certificate(s) to msmart@jonesday.com.). (Smart, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/23 8:44 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Alessandra Pia Allegretto - 24109575. ($20, receipt number 0539-12243219) (E-mail certificate(s) to kuh@brewerattorneys.com.). (Allegretto, Alessandra) Processed on 9/23/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/23 9:42 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jason K Fagelman - 00796525. ($20, receipt number 0539-12243596) (E-mail certificate(s) to shari.mcfadden@nortonrosefulbright.com.). (Fagelman, Jason) Processed on 9/23/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/23 10:43 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Bobby M Rubarts - 17360330. ($20, receipt number 0539-12244009) (E-mail certificate(s) to maria.razo@koningrubarts.com.). (Rubarts, Bobby) Processed on 9/23/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/23 11:31 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Stacey T Norstrud - 24025363. ($20, receipt number 0539-12244420). (Norstrud, Stacey)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/23 12:07 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jervonne Denise Newsome - 24094869. ($20, receipt number 0539-12244669) (E-mail certificate(s) to Csterling@lynnllp.com.). (Newsome, Jervonne) Processed on 9/23/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/23 1:52 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Preston E Hino - 24104701. ($20, receipt number 0539-12245309) (E-mail certificate(s) to phino@krcl.com.). (Hino, Preston) Processed on 9/23/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/23 2:19 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Marc Daniel Cabrera - 24069453, 24069001. ($40, receipt number 0539-12245512) (E-mail certificate(s) to krusselburg@polsinelli.com.). (Cabrera, Marc) Processed on 9/23/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/23 2:22 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Alissa Kirksey Christopher - 11531020. ($20, receipt number 0539-12245528) (E-mail certificate(s) to akchristopher@cozen.com.). (Christopher, Alissa) Processed on 9/23/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/23 3:21 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Philip Tarpley - 24098501. ($20, receipt number 0539-12245881). (Tarpley, Philip) Processed on 9/23/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/22 10:05 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Travis Denton Steele Cox - 24096279. ($20, receipt number 0539-12239720) (E-mail certificate(s) to tcox@mayerllp.com.). (Cox, Travis) Processed on 9/22/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/22 11:49 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Theanna Bezney - 24089243. ($20, receipt number 0539-12240396) (E-mail certificate(s) to jmcdanal@fisherphillips.com.). (Bezney, Theanna) Processed on 9/22/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/22 1:01 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Brandon Scott Kulwicki - 24043768. ($20, receipt number 0539-12240794) (E-mail certificate(s) to Bkulwicki@hallrender.com.). (Kulwicki, Brandon) Processed on 9/22/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/22 2:48 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Rachel Wade Robertson - 24098561. ($20, receipt number 0539-12241574) (E-mail certificate(s) to lwomack@gibsondunn.com.). (Robertson, Rachel) Processed on 9/22/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/22 3:07 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Julie Ann Farmer - 24059734. ($20, receipt number 0539-12241680) (E-mail certificate(s) to Vernida.howard@jacksonlewis.com.). (Farmer, Julie) Processed on 9/22/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 09/21 6:16 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Ian N Shaw - 24117041, 24121148. ($40, receipt number 0539-12234363) (E-mail certificate(s) to pbeesley@munsch.com.). (Shaw, Ian) Processed on 9/21/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 09/21 10:23 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Braulio Enrique Gonzalez-Mejia - 24111350. ($20, receipt number 0539-12235321) (E-mail certificate(s) to bgonzalez@messinalegal.com.). (Gonzalez-Mejia, Braulio)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 09/21 10:29 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Graigory Brooks Fancher - 24052016. ($20, receipt number 0539-12235361) (E-mail certificate(s) to gfancher@bwwlaw.com.). (Fancher, Graigory) Processed on 9/21/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 09/21 2:09 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Geoff J Henley - 00798253. ($20, receipt number 0539-12236886) (E-mail certificate(s) to chanson@henleylawpc.com.). (Henley, Geoff) Processed on 9/21/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 09/21 2:40 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Melanie E Uremovich - 24106538. ($20, receipt number 0539-12237136) (E-mail certificate(s) to kcalderon@polsinelli.com.). (Uremovich, Melanie) Processed 9/21/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 09/21 4:04 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Thad Bartholow - 24062602. Emailed Certificate to thad@kblawtx.com. ($20, receipt number 0539-12237808). (Bartholow, Thad) Processed on 9/21/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 09/20 10:53 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Ryan Casey Dean - 24109798. ($20, receipt number 0539-12230927) (E-mail certificate(s) to jstapleton@meadowscollier.com.). (Dean, Ryan) Processed on 9/20/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 09/20 3:11 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Brook Antonio-FPD, II - 1017719. ($40, receipt number 0539-12232858) (E-mail certificate(s) to info@ncble.org.). (Antonio-FPD, Brook) Processed on 9/20/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 09/20 3:55 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for James M Dore - IL ARDC 6296265. ($20, receipt number 0539-12233361) (E-mail certificate(s) to Jmdore70@sbcglobal.net.). (Dore, James) Processed on 9/20/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 09/20 5:04 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Thomas Plas Wynne - 24079610. ($20, receipt number 0539-12233952) (E-mail certificate(s) to kim@milnerfinn.com.). (Wynne, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 17, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/17 9:20 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Elizabeth Anne McDonnell - 24097418. ($20, receipt number 0539-12226874) (E-mail certificate(s) to libby@hedrickkring.com.). (McDonnell, Elizabeth) Processed on 9/17/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/17 9:53 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Robert Roy Luke - 0078463. ($20, receipt number 0539-12227061) (E-mail certificate(s) to legal@lukefirm.com.). (Luke, Robert) Processed on 9/17/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/17 12:23 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Laura Vecchio McCaskill - 24013123. ($20, receipt number 0539-12227851) (E-mail certificate(s) to vecchiolaw@verizon.net.). (McCaskill, Laura) Processed on 9/17/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/17 1:24 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for John Anthony Vessel - 24084019. ($20, receipt number 0539-12228120) (E-mail certificate(s) to anthony@marcwhitehead.com.). (Vessel, John) Processed on 9/17/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/17 1:38 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Alison R Ashmore - 24059400. ($20, receipt number 0539-12228197) (E-mail certificate(s) to pelliott@dykema.com.). (Ashmore, Alison) Processed on 9/17/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/16 11:41 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Todd Lipscomb - 00789836. ($20, receipt number 0539-12224057) (E-mail certificate(s) to daniel@lhllawfirm.com.). (Lipscomb, Todd) Processed on 9/16/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/16 12:17 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Tina J Wysk - 00794023. ($20, receipt number 0539-12224284) (E-mail certificate(s) to tina.wysk@griffithbarbee.com.). (Wysk, Tina) Processed on 9/16/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/16 2:16 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Scott M Garelick - 24029053. Emailed Certificate to sgarelick@uplawtx.com ($20, receipt number 0539-12225011). (Garelick, Scott) Processed on 9/16/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/16 2:31 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Allison Nicole Gerard - 24118748, 240117091. ($40, receipt number 0539-12225134) (E-mail certificate(s) to churmayne.kimbrough@crowedunlevy.com.). (Gerard, Allison) Processed on 9/16/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/16 4:07 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Amanda Leigh Cottrell - 24064972. ($20, receipt number 0539-12225858) (E-mail certificate(s) to dpuente@sheppardmullin.com.). (Cottrell, Amanda) Processed on 9/16/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/15 9:29 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for James Roberts - 24105721, 00797196 (Palmer). ($40, receipt number 0539-12219678) (E-mail certificate(s) to rachel@scottpalmerlaw.com.). (Roberts, James) Processed both certificates on 9/15/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/15 1:15 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Xakema L Henderson - 24107805. ($20, receipt number 0539-12220917) (E-mail certificate(s) to xakema.henderson@akerman.com.). (Henderson, Xakema) Processed on 9/15/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/15 3:08 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Taylor N Denton - 24116278. ($20, receipt number 0539-12221612) (E-mail certificate(s) to arobert@thompsoncoe.com.). (Denton, Taylor) Processed on 9/15/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 09/14 12:07 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for George Edward Shires - 24068016. ($20, receipt number 0539-12215954) (E-mail certificate(s) to georgeshires@gmail.com.). (Shires, George) Processed on 9/14/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 09/14 1:53 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for P Theodore Stoinoff - 00788478. ($20, receipt number 0539-12217721) (E-mail certificate(s) to tstoinoff@uplawtx.com.). (Stoinoff, P) Processed on 9/14/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 09/14 2:05 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Lauren Lanette Mitchell - 24071172. ($20, receipt number 0539-12217801) (E-mail certificate(s) to lmitchell@munckwilson.com.). (Mitchell, Lauren) Processed on 9/14/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 09/13 8:08 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for David L Wiley - 24029901. ($20, receipt number 0539-12210133) (E-mail certificate(s) to david@gwfirm.com.). (Wiley, David) Processed on 9/13/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 09/13 12:11 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Anisha Mary Mathew - 24102154. ($20, receipt number 0539-12213234) (E-mail certificate(s) to akatoramirez@martinbaughman.com.). (Mathew, Anisha) Processed on 9/13/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 09/13 3:27 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Alison R Ashmore - 24059400. ($20, receipt number 0539-12214856). (Ashmore, Alison)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 09/13 4:09 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jacqueline Hebe Burgos-Garritson - 22087. ($20, receipt number 0539-12215157) (E-mail certificate(s) to Jacquie@bgimmlaw.com.). (Burgos-Garritson, Jacqueline) Processed on 9/13/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 10, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/10 10:15 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for John Michael Gaddis - 24069747. ($20, receipt number 0539-12206801) (E-mail certificate(s) to dpaschal@winston.com.). (Gaddis, John) Processed on 9/10/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/10 10:56 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Zachary L Newland - 24088967. Emailed Certificate to zach@gordondefense.com. ($20, receipt number 0539-12207024). (Newland, Zachary) Processed on 9/10/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/10 2:24 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Matthew Kirk Joeckel - 24110052. ($20, receipt number 0539-12208072) (E-mail certificate(s) to mwhite@pcrfirm.com.). (Joeckel, Matthew) Processed on 9/10/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/10 3:59 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Darrell G Adkerson - 00909700. ($20, receipt number 0539-12208736) (E-mail certificate(s) to tiffany@ahblaw.net.). (Adkerson, Darrell) Processed on 9/10/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/09 12:59 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Randy Lee Brill, II - 24123216. ($20, receipt number 0539-12204278) (E-mail certificate(s) to kelsey.kraner@griffithbarbee.com.). (Brill, Randy) Processed on 9/9/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/08 9:00 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Garrett J McLearen - 24090258. ($20, receipt number 0539-12199041) (E-mail certificate(s) to zhasbini@butler.legal.). (McLearen, Garrett) Processed on 9/8/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/08 9:39 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Gracen Michelle Daniel - 24116248. ($20, receipt number 0539-12199210) (E-mail certificate(s) to gracen.daniel@griffithbarbee.com.). (Daniel, Gracen) Processed on 9/8/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/08 10:52 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Reed Neal Smith - 24067875. ($20, receipt number 0539-12199638). (Smith, Reed) Processed and emailed on 9/8/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/08 1:57 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Helen H. Emerson - 24092556. ($20, receipt number 0539-12200511) (E-mail certificate(s) to khenderson@cowlesthompson.com.). (Emerson, Helen) Processed on 9/8/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/08 2:40 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Sujohn Das - 24082896. Emailed Certificate to sujohn.das@morganlewis.com .($20, receipt number 0539-12200788). (Das, Sujohn) Processed on 9/8/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 09/07 8:55 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Kristin Alvarado - 24116024. ($20, receipt number 0539-12198599) (E-mail certificate(s) to kristin.alvarado@bakerbotts.com.). (Alvarado, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/03 9:10 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Julian L Rivera - 00797325. ($20, receipt number 0539-12191773) (E-mail certificate(s) to elizabeth.spivey@huschblackwell.com.). (Rivera, Julian) Processed on 9/3/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/03 2:24 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Michael J Golden - 24032234. ($20, receipt number 0539-12193279) (E-mail certificate(s) to adriana@boulettegolden.com.). (Golden, Michael) Processed on 9/3/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/03 2:48 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Vincent Moore Wagner - 24093314. ($20, receipt number 0539-12193384) (E-mail certificate(s) to vincent.wagner@arkansasag.gov.). (Wagner, Vincent) Processed on 9/3/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 09/03 3:53 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jonathan Alexander Heeps - 24074387. ($20, receipt number 0539-12193796). (Heeps, Jonathan) Processed on 9/3/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 02, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/02 3:44 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Aileen Marie Glaeser - 24106003. ($20, receipt number 0539-12190619) (E-mail certificate(s) to shellyl@mdjwlaw.com.). (Glaeser, Aileen) Processed on 9/2/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 09/02 4:21 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Dina McKenney - 24092809. ($20, receipt number 0539-12190880) (E-mail certificate(s) to wanda.sneed@hklaw.com.). (McKenney, Dina) Processed on 9/2/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/01 10:12 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Benjamin D Britt - 24040577. ($20, receipt number 0539-12185141) (E-mail certificate(s) to shellyl@mdjwlaw.com.). (Britt, Benjamin) Processed on 9/1/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/01 11:43 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Daniel John Gibson - 24118124. ($20, receipt number 0539-12185614) (E-mail certificate(s) to djgibson@up.com.). (Gibson, Daniel) Processed on 9/1/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/01 12:07 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Cary Joy Economou - 24082201. ($20, receipt number 0539-12185764) (E-mail certificate(s) to cary.economou@clydeco.us.). (Economou, Cary) Processed on 9/1/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/01 12:54 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Steven Michael Beauchamp - 24102924. ($20, receipt number 0539-12185955) (E-mail certificate(s) to khaley@krebsfarley.com.). (Beauchamp, Steven)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/01 1:28 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Cheryl L Mullin - 24037807. ($20, receipt number 0539-12186124) (E-mail certificate(s) to cheryl.mullin@mrkpc.com.). (Mullin, Cheryl) Processed on 9/1/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/01 1:46 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for John R Strawn, Jr - 19374100. ($20, receipt number 0539-12186222) (E-mail certificate(s) to jstrawn@strawnpickens.com.). (Strawn, John) Processed on 9/1/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/01 2:23 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Bryan D Pope - 00788213. ($20, receipt number 0539-12186441) (E-mail certificate(s) to twickstrom@cochrantexas.com.). (Pope, Bryan) Processed on 9/1/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 09/01 4:52 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Stephanie S Potter - 24065923. ($20, receipt number 0539-12187500) (E-mail certificate(s) to evoigt@namanhowell.com.). (Potter, Stephanie) Processed on 9/1/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/31 8:19 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Cody Andrew Martinez - 24102146. ($20, receipt number 0539-12180544). (Martinez, Cody) Processed and emailed on 8/31/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/31 10:26 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Carder Wright Brooks - 24105536. ($20, receipt number 0539-12181473) (E-mail certificate(s) to rylie@nelbum.com.). (Brooks, Carder) Processed on 8/31/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/31 10:45 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jon-William Nathaniel James - 24078730. ($20, receipt number 0539-12181587) (E-mail certificate(s) to Njames@hfblaw.com.). (James, Jon-William) Processed on 8/31/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/31 12:10 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Caroline Marie Cyrier - 24097558. ($20, receipt number 0539-12182095) (E-mail certificate(s) to lriley@hfblaw.com.). (Cyrier, Caroline) Processed on 8/31/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/31 1:21 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Andrew Albert Jones - 24077910. ($20, receipt number 0539-12182426) (E-mail certificate(s) to ajones@sawickilawfirm.com.). (Jones, Andrew) Processed on 8/31/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/31 2:55 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Faizan Ali (Frank) S Patel - 24116882. ($20, receipt number 0539-12183073) (E-mail certificate(s) to fpatel@qslwm.com.). (Patel, Faizan Ali (Frank)) Processed on 8/31/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/31 3:04 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Gary D Eisenstat - 06503200. ($20, receipt number 0539-12183089) (E-mail certificate(s) to jessica.sagui@ogletree.com.). (Eisenstat, Gary) Processed on 8/31/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/31 3:53 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Victoria L. Vish - 2408985. ($20, receipt number 0539-12183508) (E-mail certificate(s) to jessica.sagui@ogletree.com.). (Vish, Victoria) Processed on 8/31/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/31 6:27 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Blerim Elmazi - 24118375. ($20, receipt number 0539-12184208). (Elmazi, Blerim)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 30, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/30 9:59 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Alison R Ashmore - 24059400. ($20, receipt number 0539-12177173) (E-mail certificate(s) to pelliott@dykema.com.). (Ashmore, Alison) Processed on 8/30/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/30 11:17 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Frank J Wright - 22028800, Jeffery M. Veteto; Bar No. 24098548. ($40, receipt number 0539-12177633) (E-mail certificate(s) to imelda@fjwight.law.). (Wright, Frank) Processed on 8/30/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/30 1:31 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for William Greg Fox, Jr - 24101766. ($20, receipt number 0539-12178375). (Fox, William) Processed on 8/30/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/30 3:03 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Megan Elizabeth Cloud - 24116207. ($20, receipt number 0539-12179003) (E-mail certificate(s) to megan.cloud@weil.com.). (Cloud, Megan) Processed on 8/30/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/30 4:15 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jordyn Elizabeth Hendrix - 24120359. ($20, receipt number 0539-12179611) (E-mail certificate(s) to Courtney.timmons@harperbates.com.). (Hendrix, Jordyn) Processed on 8/30/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 27, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 08/27 11:28 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jonathan F Winocour - 24037730. ($20, receipt number 0539-12173808). (Winocour, Jonathan) Processed on 8/27/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 08/27 12:22 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Troy Hales, II - 24099011. Emailed Certificate to thales@bellnunnally.com. ($20, receipt number 0539-12174104). (Hales, Troy) Processed on 8/27/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 08/27 1:06 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Matthew Paul Gizzo - 24117188. ($20, receipt number 0539-12174280) (E-mail certificate(s) to amy.barbosa@ogletree.com.). (Gizzo, Matthew) Processed on 8/27/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 08/27 1:35 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Elliott Teale Cooper - 24069534. ($20, receipt number 0539-12174391) (E-mail certificate(s) to elliott.cooper@cooperscully.com.). (Cooper, Elliott) Processed on 8/27/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 26, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 08/26 8:43 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Garrsion Hunter Lipscomb - 24096965. ($20, receipt number 0539-12168604) (E-mail certificate(s) to Garrison.Lipscomb@gstexlaw.com.). (Lipscomb, Garrsion) Processed on 8/26/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 08/26 9:30 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Marion M Reilly - 1357491. ($20, receipt number 0539-12168950) (E-mail certificate(s) to caitlin@hmglawfirm.com.). Related [+] Processed on 8/26/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-] illy, Marion
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 08/26 11:24 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jason S Taylor - 24008126. ($20, receipt number 0539-12169820) (E-mail certificate(s) to cdcopeland@cwlaw.com.). (Taylor, Jason) Processed on 8/26/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 08/26 11:36 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Kathryn Bernadette Blakey - 24111394. ($20, receipt number 0539-12169917) (E-mail certificate(s) to smcneely@littler.com.). (Blakey, Kathryn) Processed on 8/26/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 08/26 2:19 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Katherine Mary Godinez - 24107781. ($20, receipt number 0539-12170843). (Godinez, Katherine) Processed and mailed paper copy to address on file on 8/26/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 25, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/25 9:09 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Russell G Thornton - 19982850. ($20, receipt number 0539-12164851) (E-mail certificate(s) to rthornton@trtblaw.com.). (Thornton, Russell) Processed on 8/25/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/25 9:34 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Michael D Anderson - 24031699. ($20, receipt number 0539-12165131) (E-mail certificate(s) to melissa.matej@kellyhart.com.). (Anderson, Michael) Processed on 8/25/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/25 10:18 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Matthew Brandon Buongiorno - 24097436. ($20, receipt number 0539-12165437) (E-mail certificate(s) to Matthew.Buongiorno@lockelord.com.). (Buongiorno, Matthew) Processed on 8/25/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/25 11:13 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Clint Cowan - 24109760. ($20, receipt number 0539-12165930) (E-mail certificate(s) to eburch@lynnllp.com.). (Cowan, Clint) Processed on 8/25/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/25 11:16 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Christopher J Schwegmann - 24051315. ($20, receipt number 0539-12165942) (E-mail certificate(s) to eburch@lynnllp.com.). (Schwegmann, Christopher) Processed on 8/25/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/25 1:13 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jody Leigh Rodenberg - 24073133. ($20, receipt number 0539-12166620) (E-mail certificate(s) to clong@textrial.com.). (Rodenberg, Jody) Processed on 8/25/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/25 1:27 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Eugene Xerxes Martin, IV - 24078928. ($20, receipt number 0539-12166675) (E-mail certificate(s) to vpike@mamlaw.com.). (Martin, Eugene) Processed on 8/25/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/25 3:14 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for J Richard Harmon - 09020700. ($20, receipt number 0539-12167397) (E-mail certificate(s) to vduhon@thompsoncoe.com.). (Harmon, J) Processed on 8/25/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/25 6:05 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Benjamin Laurence Stool - 19312500. ($20, receipt number 0539-12168209) (E-mail certificate(s) to ben.stool@dallascounty.org.). (Stool, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/24 4:15 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Sarah M Smith - 24115049. ($20, receipt number 0539-12163909) (E-mail certificate(s) to aortiz@fbtlaw.com.). (Smith, Sarah) Processed on 8/24/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 23, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/23 2:54 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Caitlin Anais Rowe - 24124334- Emailed Certificate to caitlin.rodriguez@kodemlaw.com , Sharadha Sankararaman - 24090370- Emailed Certificate to sharadha.kodem@kodemlaw.com. ($40, receipt number 0539-12159236). (Sankararaman, Sharadha) Processed on 8/23/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/23 5:25 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Stanley Wu - 24120674, Robert Leach 24103582. ($40, receipt number 0539-12160618). (Wu, Stanley)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/23 5:54 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Kolby Johnston Keller - 24119382. ($20, receipt number 0539-12160682) (E-mail certificate(s) to kkeller@thompsoncoe.com.). (Keller, Kolby)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 22, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Sun 08/22 1:42 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Billy Frey - 24054220. ($20, receipt number 0539-12156480). (Frey, Billy)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Sun 08/22 5:56 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Travis Lee Richins - 24061296. ($20, receipt number 0539-12156523) (E-mail certificate(s) to travis@etheridgelaw.com.). (Richins, Travis)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 20, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 08/20 9:55 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Ross Caughran Miracle - 24070283. Emailed Certificate to ross.miracle@sargentlawtx.com ($20, receipt number 0539-12153366). (Miracle, Ross) Processed on 8/20/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 08/20 10:42 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Susan Anne Allen - 01059350. ($20, receipt number 0539-12153711) (E-mail certificate(s) to stephanie@vwpwlaw.com.). (Allen, Susan) Processed on 8/20/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 19, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 08/19 10:32 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Eliot T Burriss - 24040611. ($20, receipt number 0539-12149819) (E-mail certificate(s) to frances.gonzalez@hklaw.com.). (Burriss, Eliot) Processed on 8/19/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/18 7:55 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Bryan Haynes - 09283520, Christian Cowart 24105748. ($40, receipt number 0539-12145371) (E-mail certificate(s) to gail.ashby@klemchuk.com.). (Haynes, Bryan) Processed on 8/18/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/18 10:16 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Scott Charles Krist - 11727900. ($20, receipt number 0539-12146187) (E-mail certificate(s) to skrist@kristlaw.com.). (Krist, Scott) Processed and emailed on 8/18/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/18 1:19 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Forrest Colby Roberts - 24102419. ($20, receipt number 0539-12146817) (E-mail certificate(s) to cselvy@condontobin.com.). (Roberts, Forrest) Processed on 8/18/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/17 8:12 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Susan J Travis - 20194750. Emailed Certificate to sjt@robbinstravis.com. ($20, receipt number 0539-12141305). (Travis, Susan) Processed on 8/17/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/17 1:42 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Yohana Susan Mantrana - 24090558. ($20, receipt number 0539-12143204) (E-mail certificate(s) to yohanamantrana@gmail.com.). (Mantrana, Yohana) Processed on 8/17/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/17 4:48 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Miranda K Roberts - 24121086. ($20, receipt number 0539-12144189). (Roberts, Miranda) Processed and emailed on 8/17/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 16, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/16 6:40 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Frank Alvarez - 24101268. ($20, receipt number 0539-12137640) (E-mail certificate(s) to spencer.young@qpwblaw.com.). (Alvarez, Frank) Processed on 8/16/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/16 9:17 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Kristen Lauren Monkhouse - 24092853. ($20, receipt number 0539-12137934) (E-mail certificate(s) to kristen.monkhouse@tbjbs.com.). (Monkhouse, Kristen) Processed on 8/16/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/16 9:45 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Christal Ann Delgado - 24054954. ($20, receipt number 0539-12138082) (E-mail certificate(s) to christal.delgado@yahoo.com.). (Delgado, Christal) Processed on 8/16/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/16 1:56 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Robert E Ammons - 01159820. ($20, receipt number 0539-12139418) (E-mail certificate(s) to joy@ammonslaw.com.). (Ammons, Robert) Processed on 8/16/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/16 2:17 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Adam A Milasincic. ($20, receipt number 0539-12139511) (E-mail certificate(s) to joy@ammonslaw.com.). (Milasincic, Adam) Processed on 8/16/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/16 3:19 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Zachary Kirk Ferguson, II - 24093431. Emailed Certificate to zfergusonlaw@yahoo.com ($20, receipt number 0539-12140035). (Ferguson, Zachary) Processed on 8/16/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/16 4:48 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for John Robert Loar - 24081007. Emailed Certificate to Rob.Loar@witheritelaw.com. ($20, receipt number 0539-12140726). (Loar, John) Processed on 8/16/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 13, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 08/13 2:42 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Scott Brown - 03127100. Emailed Certificate to sb@dfwdefenseattorney.com. ($20, receipt number 0539-12135676). (Brown, Scott) Processed on 8/13/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 08/13 4:11 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Phillip Norris Sanov - 17635950. Mailed raised seal certificate to Phillip Sanov. Email-PDF of certificate not requested. ($20, receipt number 0539-12136259). (Sanov, Phillip) Processed on 8/13/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 08/13 4:53 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Christopher Cody Cyrus - 24097110. ($20, receipt number 0539-12136961) (E-mail certificate(s) to jlanger@gdhm.com.). (Cyrus, Christopher) Processed on 8/13/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 12, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 08/12 9:55 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Martin Wayne Long - 12521960. ($20, receipt number 0539-12130632) (E-mail certificate(s) to mwlong01@msn.com.). (Long, Martin) Processed on 8/12/2021 (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/11 9:40 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Brandon James Leavitt - 24078841. ($20, receipt number 0539-12126948) (E-mail certificate(s) to brandon@uslawpros.com.). (Leavitt, Brandon) Processed on 8/11/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/11 10:01 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Shelby Taylor - 24110432. ($20, receipt number 0539-12127039). (Taylor, Shelby) Processed on 8/11/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/11 10:19 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Kevin Chiu - 24109723, James R. Prince - 00784791. ($40, receipt number 0539-12127086) (E-mail certificate(s) to rory.fontenla@bakerbotts.com.). (Chiu, Kevin) Processed on 8/11/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/11 11:39 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Richard Anderson Sessions - 24090378. ($20, receipt number 0539-12127599) (E-mail certificate(s) to rasessions@cokinoslaw.com.). (Sessions, Richard) Processed on 8/11/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/11 4:02 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Ryan Bangert - 24045446. ($20, receipt number 0539-12129189). (Bangert, Ryan) Processed and emailed on 8/11/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/10 12:04 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Spencer Morgan Lee Cox - 24097540. ($20, receipt number 0539-12123828) (E-mail certificate(s) to mkweik@burnscharest.com.). (Cox, Spencer) Processed on 8/10/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/10 2:12 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jason W Voelke - 24120295. ($20, receipt number 0539-12124938) (E-mail certificate(s) to akatoramirez@martinbaughman.com.). (Voelke, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 09, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/09 9:13 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Ryan Barrett Evans - 24065210. ($20, receipt number 0539-12118765) (E-mail certificate(s) to r.b.evans76@gmail.com.). (Evans, Ryan) Processed on 8/9/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/09 3:17 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Michael A McCabe - 24007628. ($20, receipt number 0539-12120641) (E-mail certificate(s) to ssmith@munckwilson.com.). (McCabe, Michael) Processed on 8/9/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/09 3:30 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Brittany K Barnett - 24078196. ($20, receipt number 0539-12120764) (E-mail certificate(s) to bkb@brittanykbarnett.com.). (Barnett, Brittany) Processed on 8/9/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 06, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 08/06 9:13 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for C Daniel DiLizia - 24099800. ($20, receipt number 0539-12115707). (DiLizia, C) Processed on 8/6/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 08/06 11:31 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Christina A Jump - 00795828. ($20, receipt number 0539-12116544) (E-mail certificate(s) to cjump@clcma.org.). (Jump, Christina) Processed on 8/6/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 05, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 08/05 8:39 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Morgan J Kleoppel - 24116625, Brian J. Goodrich - 24119720. ($40, receipt number 0539-12112393) (E-mail certificate(s) to mary.caswell@hklaw.com.). (Kleoppel, Morgan) Processed on 8/5/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 08/05 9:08 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Balon B Bradley - 02821700. ($20, receipt number 0539-12112577). (Bradley, Balon) Processed on 8/5/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 08/05 9:35 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Christopher M Blanton - 00796218. ($20, receipt number 0539-12112710) (E-mail certificate(s) to econtreras@peavlerbriscoe.com.). (Blanton, Christopher) Processed on 8/5/2021 (chmb)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 08/05 1:38 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Stephen Andrew Cumbie - 24056724. ($20, receipt number 0539-12113751) (E-mail certificate(s) to Stephen.Cumbie@fortworthtexas.com.). (Cumbie, Stephen) Processed on 8/5/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/04 10:41 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Ilyas Sayeg - 99140FL. ($20, receipt number 0539-12109306) (E-mail certificate(s) to mpowell@mctlaw.com.). (Sayeg, Ilyas) Processed on 8/4/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/04 12:13 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Paul Milton Bass, III - 00790277. ($20, receipt number 0539-12109812). (Bass, Paul) Processed and emailed on 8/4/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/04 12:14 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Chase J Potter - 24088245. ($20, receipt number 0539-12109820). (Potter, Chase) Processed and emailed on 8/4/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/04 2:12 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for John S Wilson - 24000142. ($20, receipt number 0539-12110421) (E-mail certificate(s) to legalassistant3300@gmail.com.). (Wilson, John) Processed on 8/4/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/04 4:05 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Rachel Hatten Adams - 24101883. ($20, receipt number 0539-12111267) (E-mail certificate(s) to katie.harvey@witheritelaw.com.). (Hatten Adams, Rachel) Processed on 8/4/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/04 4:10 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Rachel Hatten Adams - 24101883. ($20, receipt number 0539-12111363) (E-mail certificate(s) to katie.harvey@witheritelaw.com.). (Hatten Adams, Rachel) Refund information sent to email due to duplicate charge on 8/4/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 08/04 4:43 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Najmu Nisa Mohseen - 24116779. ($20, receipt number 0539-12111597) (E-mail certificate(s) to nmohseen@clcma.org.). (Mohseen, Najmu) Processed on 8/4/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/03 11:05 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Scott R Meyer - 24051046. ($20, receipt number 0539-12105042) (E-mail certificate(s) to orangeraider77@gmail.com.). (Meyer, Scott) Processed on 8/3/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 08/03 3:27 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Chase Cobern - 24101633. ($20, receipt number 0539-12106320) (E-mail certificate(s) to ccobern@munckwilson.com.). (Cobern, Chase) Processed on 8/3/2021 (lkw)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 02, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/02 9:42 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Michael J Golden - 24032234. ($20, receipt number 0539-12100436) (E-mail certificate(s) to adriana@boulettegolden.com.). (Golden, Michael) Processed on 8/2/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/02 10:28 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jarmonique Charell Smith - 24110374. ($20, receipt number 0539-12100682) (E-mail certificate(s) to jcsmith@jonesday.com.). (Smith, Jarmonique) Processed on 8/2/2021 (bmh)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/02 2:46 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Randy Leigh Tipton - 24039860. ($20, receipt number 0539-12102324). (Tipton, Randy) Processed on 8/2/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Mon 08/02 3:45 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Barry A Moscowitz - 24004830. ($20, receipt number 0539-12102710) (E-mail certificate(s) to everweij@thompsoncoe.com.). (Moscowitz, Barry) Processed on 8/2/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 01, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Sun 08/01 1:47 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Christopher Alan Buxton - 24116154. ($20, receipt number 0539-12099774) (E-mail certificate(s) to cbuxton@jonesday.com.). (Buxton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 31, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Sat 07/31 11:53 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Richard M Hunt - 10288700. ($20, receipt number 0539-12099631) (E-mail certificate(s) to rhunt@hunthuey.com.). (Hunt, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 07/30 10:49 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Adam A Milasincic - 24079001. ($20, receipt number 0539-12097655) (E-mail certificate(s) to melanie@ammonslaw.com.). (Milasincic, Adam) Processed on 7/30/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 07/30 1:37 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Abbey Ulsh Dreher - 24051459. ($20, receipt number 0539-12098315) (E-mail certificate(s) to abbeyu@bdfgroup.com.). (Dreher, Abbey) Processed on 7/30/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 07/30 1:54 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Michael C Wilson - 21704590. ($20, receipt number 0539-12098411) (E-mail certificate(s) to plucio@munckwilson.com.). (Wilson, Michael) Processed on 7/30/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 07/30 4:04 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jordan Christine Strauss - 24088480. ($20, receipt number 0539-12099077) (E-mail certificate(s) to jstrauss@munckwilson.com.). (Strauss, Jordan) Processed on 7/30/2021 (bdg)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 07/30 6:50 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Lacey Turley Most - 24093225, 20304000. ($40, receipt number 0539-12099472) (E-mail certificate(s) to davette@wturley.com.). (Most, Lacey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 29, 2021
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 07/29 9:43 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Cameron Earl Dean - 24082190. ($20, receipt number 0539-12094316) (E-mail certificate(s) to akatoramirez@martinbaughman.com.). (Dean, Cameron) Processed on 7/29/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 07/29 10:52 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Theresa M Dawson - 24065128. ($20, receipt number 0539-12094615). (Dawson, Theresa) Processed on 7/29/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 07/29 5:16 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Nicholas A Zugaro - 24070905. ($20, receipt number 0539-12096713) (E-mail certificate(s) to nzugaro@dykema.com.). (Zugaro, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
1 1 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/28 10:05 AM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Garcia, Graciela - 24093931 ($20, receipt number 0539-12065437) (E-mail certificate(s) to ggarcia@jw.com) (cea) Processed on 7/28/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 07/28 12:34 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Jesse Hamilton Forester - 24087532, David Haynie - 24087692, Meredith Black-Mathews - 24055180. ($60, receipt number 0539-12092256) (E-mail certificate(s) to kbroderick@foresterhaynie.com.). (Forester, Jesse) Processed on 7/28/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Certificate of Good Standing Wed 07/28 3:14 PM
Request for Certificate of Good Standing for Thomas J Zavala - 24116265. ($20, receipt number 0539-12092957) (E-mail certificate(s) to tom.zavala@haynesboone.com.). (Zavala, Thomas) Processed on 7/28/2021 (krr)
Related: [-]