Delaware District Court
Judge:Leonard P Stark
Case #: 1:12-cv-00712
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2012
Terminated:Jul 03, 2013
Last checked: Sunday Dec 11, 2016 9:16 PM EST
Defendant
RDM Corporation
Represented By
Gerard M. O'Rourke
O'Rourke Law Office, LLC
contact info
Defendant
RDM Payment Solutions Inc.
Represented By
Gerard M. O'Rourke
O'Rourke Law Office, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
PPS Data, LLC
Represented By
Brian H. Pandya
contact info
Anthony H. Son
contact info
Ryan M. Corbett
contact info
Richard L. Horwitz
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
David Ellis Moore
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 03, 2013
36 36 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,181,430 B1; US 7,440,924 B2; US 7,624,071 B2. (ntl)
Related: [-]
SO ORDERED, re35 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by PPS Data, LLC, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/3/13. (ntl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2013
35 35 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by PPS Data, LLC. (Moore, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2013
ORAL ORDER- Pursuant to the entry of34 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING CASE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the Mediation Conference set in this matter for 6/14/2013 before Judge Sherry R. Fallon is CANCELLED. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/10/2013.(lih)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2013
34 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING CASE by PPS Data, LLC. (Moore, David)
Related: [-]
SO ORDERED, re34 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/9/13. (ntl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2013
33 33 ORDER rescheduling Motion Hearing for 3/7/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/7/13. (ntl)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2013
SO ORDERED, re32 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/3/13. (ntl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2013
32 32 STIPULATION Protective Order by PPS Data, LLC. (Moore, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2013
31 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PPS Data, LLC's Third Set of Interrogatories to RDM Payment Solutions, Inc. by PPS Data, LLC.(Moore, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2013
30 30 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PPS Data, LLC's Supplemental Infringement Contentions by PPS Data, LLC.(Moore, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2013
29 29 Joint STATUS REPORT (Interim) by PPS Data, LLC. (Moore, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2013
28 28 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on March 12, 2013 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/24/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2013. (bpg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2013
27 27 REDACTED VERSION of25 Letter, to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore, Esquire, regarding Opposition to Motion to Compel Supplemental Infringement Contentions by PPS Data, LLC.(Moore, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-D,
Att: 2 Exhibit E
Friday, March 22, 2013
ORAL ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Mediation Conference is set for 6/14/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. The location of the mediation conference shall be determined at a later time. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/22/2013. (lih)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2013
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Discovery Teleconference held on 3/12/2013. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2013
26 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff PPS Data, LLC's Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant RDM Payment Solutions, Inc. by PPS Data, LLC.(Moore, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2013
25 25 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore, Esquire regarding opposition to Motion to Compel Supplemental Infringement Contentions - re23 Opening Brief in Support,.(Moore, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-C,
Att: 2 Exhibit D,
Att: 3 Exhibit E
Tuesday, March 05, 2013
24 24 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition to PPS Data, LLC's Motion To Compel filed by RDM Corporation, RDM Payment Solutions Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/15/2013. (O'Rourke, Gerard)
Related: [-]
23 23 [SEALED] SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support Motion To Compel filed by RDM Corporation, RDM Payment Solutions Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/22/2013.(O'Rourke, Gerard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A par 1A,
Att: 2 Exhibit A part 1B,
Att: 3 Exhibit A part 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit A part 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit A part 4A,
Att: 6 Exhibit A part 4B,
Att: 7 Exhibit B,
Att: 8 Exhibit C,
Att: 9 Exhibit D part 1,
Att: 10 Exhibit D part 2,
Att: 11 Exhibit E
Monday, March 04, 2013
22 22 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore regarding Opening Discovery Dispute.(Moore, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C, Part 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit C, Part 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G-H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I-K
Tuesday, February 26, 2013
21 21 ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Discovery Teleconference is set for 3/12/2013 at 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/26/13. (ntl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 19, 2013
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ryan M. Corbett for PPS Data, LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 07, 2013
20 20 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Objections and Responses to Defendants First Set of Interrogatories (Confidential Attorneys Eyes Only) and Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things by PPS Data, LLC.(Moore, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 20, 2012
SO ORDERED, re19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott A. Felder and Ryan M. Corbett of Wiley Rein LLP filed by PPS Data, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/20/12. (ntl)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 19, 2012
19 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott A. Felder and Ryan M. Corbett of Wiley Rein LLP - filed by PPS Data, LLC. (Moore, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 16, 2012
18 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff PPS Data, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant RDM Payment Solutions, Inc., PPS Data, LLC's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant RDM Payment Solutions, Inc., and Plaintiff PPS Data, LLC's Infringement Contentions by PPS Data, LLC by PPS Data, LLC.(Moore, David)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER- The Mediation conference set for 12/6/2012 shall take place in room #4102 located on the 4th floor of the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on on 11/16/2012. (lih)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 19, 2012
17 17 ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Mediation Conference is set for 12/6/2012 at 09:30 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/19/2012. (lih)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 05, 2012
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brian H. Pandya for PPS Data, LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 14, 2012
16 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PLAINTIFF PPS DATA, LLC'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26(A)(1) by PPS Data, LLC.(Moore, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 11, 2012
15 15 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gerard M. O'Rourke (O'Rourke, Gerard)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 10, 2012
14 14 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 10/9/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/10/2012. (lih)
Related: [-]
CASE REFERRED to Judge Fallon for Mediation. (lih)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 06, 2012
13 13 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PLAINTIFF PPS DATA, LLC'S DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO SECTION 4(a) OF THE DELAWARE DEFAULT STANDARD FOR DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION by PPS Data, LLC.(Moore, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 04, 2012
12 12 ADDENDUM to11 Scheduling Order re case dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/31/12. (ntl)
Related: [-]
11 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 3/21/2013. Amended Pleadings due by 3/21/2013. Discovery due by 9/13/2013. Status Report due by 4/9/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 12/20/2013. A Motion Hearing is set for 3/28/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 5/28/2013. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 6/21/2013. A Markman Hearing is set for 7/26/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/30/12. (ntl)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 13, 2012
10 10 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David E. Moore, Esquire regarding enclosure of the parties' proposed scheduling order - re9 Proposed Order. (Moore, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 PROPOSED ORDER Rule 16 Scheduling Order by PPS Data, LLC. (Moore, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 30, 2012
8 8 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposal to the Court no later than August 13, 2012. The parties are to review the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Stark, Forms). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/30/12. (ntl)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 13, 2012
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Anthony Son for PPS Data, LLC added for electronic noticing. (maw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 20, 2012
SO ORDERED, re7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anthony H. Son and Brian H. Pandya of Wiley Rein LLP filed by PPS Data, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/20/12. (ntl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 19, 2012
7 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anthony H. Son and Brian H. Pandya of Wiley Rein LLP - filed by PPS Data, LLC. (Moore, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2012
Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 12, 2012
6 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by RDM Corporation, RDM Payment Solutions Inc.. (O'Rourke, Gerard)
Related: [-]
5 5 ANSWER to1 Complaint, by RDM Corporation, RDM Payment Solutions Inc..(O'Rourke, Gerard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 05, 2012
4 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by PPS Data, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Zions Bancorporation for PPS Data, LLC. (dmp, )
Related: [-]
3 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,181,430 B1; US 7,440,924 B2; US 7,624,071 B2;. (dmp, )
Related: [-]
2 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dmp, )
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against RDM Corporation, RDM Payment Solutions Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 311-1085663.) - filed by PPS Data, LLC.(dmp, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - C,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
No Summons Issued (dmp, )
Related: [-]