Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02738

New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:21-cv-00011
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jul 03, 2021 4:44 AM EDT
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC
In Re
JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff
CONNIE O'CONNOR
Represented By
STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 03/14 3:55 PM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman and Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson no longer assigned to case. (mg, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 01/04 12:05 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/04 10:08 AM
COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11914141) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CONNIE O'CONNOR.(RADOS, STEPHANIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
mdl MDL Direct File Mon 01/04 12:06 PM
Member Case Direct File on 1/4/2021, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (jal, )
Related: [-]