Arizona District Court
Judge:Scott H Rash
Case #: 4:21-cv-00003
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2021
Terminated:May 09, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jul 03, 2021 3:09 AM MST
Defendant
Neurological Associates of Tucson PC
Represented By
Jana Lynn Sutton
Mesch Clark & Rothschild PC
contact info
Barney Myer Holtzman
Mesch Clark & Rothschild PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shelly Minish
Represented By
Shannon Lori Giles
Awerkamp Bonilla & Giles PLC
contact info
Ivelisse Bonilla-Torrado
Awerkamp Bonilla & Giles PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, May 09, 2022
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 05/09 10:53 AM
ORDER pursuant to36 Stipulation of Dismissal: IT IS ORDERED the above-captioned matter is dismissed with prejudice, with each side to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Clerk of Court shall docket accordingly and close this action. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 5/6/22. (BAC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
36 36 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 05/04 1:38 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Shelly Minish.(Giles, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
35 35 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 05/03 4:04 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall file a notice with the Court demonstrating good cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute under LRCiv 41.1 on or before Friday, May 13, 2022 and explaining why the parties have failed to adhere to the above deadlines, which were jointly proposed in the parties' Rule 26(f) report. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 5/3/22. (JAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
34 34 notice Notice of Deposition Fri 10/08 9:36 AM
AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Jan Haskell, filed by Shelly Minish. (Giles, Shannon)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Deposition Fri 10/08 9:35 AM
AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Sergio Rivero, filed by Shelly Minish. (Giles, Shannon)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Deposition Fri 10/08 9:34 AM
AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Barbara Sasselli, filed by Shelly Minish. (Giles, Shannon)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Deposition Fri 10/08 9:33 AM
AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Susan Watson, filed by Shelly Minish. (Giles, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
30 30 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Mon 10/04 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Shelly Minish. (Giles, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
29 29 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/01 3:22 PM
NOTICE re: Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum by Neurological Associates of Tucson PC on Tierra Antigua, Select Trio & Coldwell Banker . (Holtzman, Barney)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
28 28 notice Notice of Deposition Thu 09/30 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Jan Haskell, filed by Shelly Minish. (Giles, Shannon)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Deposition Thu 09/30 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Sergio Rivero, filed by Shelly Minish. (Giles, Shannon)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Deposition Thu 09/30 3:19 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Barbra Sasselli, filed by Shelly Minish. (Giles, Shannon)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Deposition Thu 09/30 3:19 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Susan Watson, filed by Shelly Minish. (Giles, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
24 24 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 09/15 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Shelly Minish. (Giles, Shannon)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 09/15 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Shelly Minish. (Giles, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
22 22 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 09/14 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Neurological Associates of Tucson PC. (Holtzman, Barney)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 09/08 3:01 PM
ORDER pursuant to20 Stipulation: IT IS ORDERED the parties shall disclose all lay witnesses on or before 9/14/21. All other deadlines and terms of the Court's10 Scheduling Order remain in full effect. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 9/8/21.(BAC)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Stipulation Wed 09/08 10:13 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Disclose Lay Witnesses by Neurological Associates of Tucson PC.(Holtzman, Barney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
19 19 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 09/07 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Shelly Minish. (Giles, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 30, 2021
18 18 minutes Settlement Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Mon 08/30 2:34 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich: Settlement Conference held on 8/30/2021. The Parties have not reached a settlement at this time. APPEARANCES: Attorneys Ivelisse Bonilla- Torrado and Shannon Giles for Plaintiff Shelly Minish. Attorney Barney Holtzman for Defendant Neurological Associates of Tucson PC. Hearing held 9:00 AM to 12:30 PM.(SCA)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 19, 2021
17 17 misc Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions Mon 07/19 11:40 AM
REPORT of Settlement Talks/Discussions by Shelly Minish. (Giles, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 01, 2021
16 16 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 07/01 9:41 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this matter is set for a SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE on 8/30/21 at 9:00 am before Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich. Trial counsel and a representative of each party with complete settlement authority to attend the settlement conference. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 6/30/21. (BAC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
15 15 1 pgs order Order Tue 06/15 10:56 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED this matter is set for a settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich. The parties are directed to contact Judge Markovich's chambers for further instructions regarding scheduling the settlement conference. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 6/14/21.(BAC)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 07, 2021
14 14 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 05/07 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Shelly Minish. (Giles, Shannon)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 05/07 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Neurological Associates of Tucson PC. (Holtzman, Barney)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 27, 2021
12 12 10 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Hearings Tue 04/27 3:23 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED Discovery is due 10/22/2021; Dispositive motions due 12/17/2021; Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due 1/26/2022; Joint Settlement Status Report due by 7/23/2021 and every 90 days thereafter. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 4/23/21.(BAC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
11 11 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Thu 04/08 2:01 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Shelly Minish. (Giles, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
10 10 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 02/24 11:54 AM
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference: IT IS ORDERED setting a telephonic Pretrial Case Management Conference for 4/23/21 at 10:00 am, before law clerk to Judge Scott H Rash. The conference shall be initiated by Plaintiff, with all appropriate parties on the line. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 2/23/21.(BAC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/23 4:01 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Neurological Associates of Tucson PC. (Holtzman, Barney)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 22, 2021
8 8 misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Tue 02/23 3:44 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Neurological Associates of Tucson PC. Corporate Disclosure. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected Corporate Disclosure, to include the correct party name, in place of Minnesota Life Insurance Company. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/22 3:34 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Neurological Associates of Tucson PC. (Holtzman, Barney)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/22 3:29 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Neurological Associates of Tucson PC.(Holtzman, Barney)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
5 5 service Service Executed Tue 01/19 2:50 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shelly Minish: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on January 14, 2021 to Neurological Associates of Tucson, PC dba Center for Neurological Sciences . (Giles, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 01/04 4:17 PM
Summons Issued as to Neurological Associates of Tucson PC. (MYE)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc New Case Opened Mon 01/04 4:14 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19024621. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott H Rash. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-3-TUC-SHR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Mon 01/04 4:12 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Shelly Minish. (Giles, Shannon) (MYE)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/04 4:12 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19024621 filed by Shelly Minish. (Giles, Shannon)(MYE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet