New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:James L Garrity Jr
Case #: 1:21-bk-10004
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2021
Creditor Meeting:Mar 09, 2021
Claims Deadline:Apr 15, 2021

Debtor
Academic Study Associates, Inc.
1392 Madison Ave
PO Box 191
New York, NY 10029-6914
Represented By
Barry J Roy
Rabinowitz, Lubetkin & Tully, L.L.C.
contact info
Jonathan I. Rabinowitz
Rabinowitz, Lubetkin & Tully, L.L.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Deborah Piazza
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP 1350 Broadway 11th Floor
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Deborah Piazza
contact info
Robert A. Wolf
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 02/23/2021 7:55 PM EST
Monday, January 04, 2021
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 01/04 12:27 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 21-10004 ) [misc,969] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A14799354. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
misc Add Trustee Mon 01/04 3:08 PM
Trustee Deborah Piazza added to the case. (Cappiello, Karen)
Related: [-]
1 1 67 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 01/04 12:27 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Jonathan I. Rabinowitz of Rabinowitz, Lubetkin & Tully, L.L.C. on behalf of Academic Study Associates, Inc.. (Rabinowitz, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Resolution Pursuant to LR 1074-1 Mon 01/04 12:29 PM
Corporate Resolution Pursuant to LR 1074-1 Filed by Jonathan I. Rabinowitz on behalf of Academic Study Associates, Inc.. (Rabinowitz, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc 341(a) Notice (Chapter 7 Corporation or Partnership) (BNC) Mon 01/04 3:10 PM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/9/2021 at 09:30 AM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY). (Cappiello, Karen)
Related: [-]