New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lorna G Schofield
Case #: 1:21-cv-00047
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2021
Terminated:Mar 03, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jul 03, 2021 4:54 AM EDT
Defendant
Michael Gottlieb
Defendant
Susan Miller
Defendant
NTN Buzztime, Inc.
Defendant
Richard Simtob
Defendant
Allen Wolff
Plaintiff
Douglas Carlson
Represented By
Sebastiano Tornatore
Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
20 20 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 03/03 5:32 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Michael Gottlieb, Susan Miller, NTN Buzztime, Inc., Richard Simtob, Allen Wolff. Document filed by Douglas Carlson. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Tornatore, Sebastiano)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
19 19 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 01/21 11:31 AM
ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held at March 11, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. The conference will be telephonic. Initial Conference set for 3/11/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/21/2021) (cf)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2021
18 18 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/15 5:09 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Allen Wolff waiver sent on 1/14/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. Document filed by Douglas Carlson..(Tornatore, Sebastiano)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/15 5:09 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Richard Simtob waiver sent on 1/14/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. Document filed by Douglas Carlson..(Tornatore, Sebastiano)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/15 5:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. NTN Buzztime, Inc. waiver sent on 1/14/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. Document filed by Douglas Carlson..(Tornatore, Sebastiano)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/15 5:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Susan Miller waiver sent on 1/14/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. Document filed by Douglas Carlson..(Tornatore, Sebastiano)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/15 5:06 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Michael Gottlieb waiver sent on 1/14/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. Document filed by Douglas Carlson..(Tornatore, Sebastiano)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2021
utility Case Accepted as Related Thu 01/07 3:27 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-08663-LGS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Thu 01/07 3:28 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 01/07 3:29 PM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (laq)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
13 13 service Summons Issued Tue 01/05 11:38 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allen Wolff..(dnh)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued Tue 01/05 11:35 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard Simtob..(dnh)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Tue 01/05 11:26 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NTN Buzztime, Inc...(dnh)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Tue 01/05 11:22 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Susan Miller..(dnh)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Tue 01/05 11:13 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Gottlieb..(dnh)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 01/05 11:04 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(dnh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 01/05 11:05 AM
Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar Tue 01/05 11:06 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lorna G. Schofield as possibly related to 1:20-cv-08663-LGS. (dnh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 01/04 6:24 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allen Wolff, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Douglas Carlson..(Tornatore, Sebastiano)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 01/04 6:23 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Richard Simtob, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Douglas Carlson..(Tornatore, Sebastiano)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 01/04 6:20 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NTN Buzztime, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Douglas Carlson..(Tornatore, Sebastiano)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 01/04 6:19 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Susan Miller, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Douglas Carlson..(Tornatore, Sebastiano)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 01/04 6:18 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Gottlieb, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Douglas Carlson..(Tornatore, Sebastiano)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Relatedness Mon 01/04 6:15 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-08663. Document filed by Douglas Carlson..(Tornatore, Sebastiano)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 01/04 6:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tornatore, Sebastiano)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/04 6:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Michael Gottlieb, Susan Miller, NTN Buzztime, Inc., Richard Simtob, Allen Wolff. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23340634)Document filed by Douglas Carlson..(Tornatore, Sebastiano)
Related: [-]