Mockingbird 38, LLC v. Terezowens.com, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | John E Mcdermott |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-00043 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 05, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 14, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 04, 2021 1:53 AM PDT |
Defendant
Terez Owens
|
|
Defendant
Terezowens.com, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Mockingbird 38, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 15, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (mrgo) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 14, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court finds that Plaintiff has abandoned this action and failed to comply with the Court's Order. The Court therefore dismisses this action without prejudice for lack of prosecution and for failure to comply with a Court order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b); see also Yourish, 191 F.3d at 986-88; Ferdik, 963 F.2d at 1260. (See document for details). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) |
|
Tuesday, April 06, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Lack Of Prosecution by Judge Percy Anderson. (Show Cause Response due by 4/13/2021.) (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, January 07, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo) |
|
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Terezowens.com, LLC. (car) |
|
9 | 9
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Terez Owens. (car) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car) |
|
6 | 6
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mockingbird 38, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company, identifying Counsel for Plaintiff. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Mockingbird 38, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Mockingbird 38, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
3 | 3
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mockingbird 38, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
2 | 2
![]() REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Mockingbird 38, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29864107 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Mockingbird 38, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company. (Attorney Craig B Sanders added to party Mockingbird 38, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company(pty:pla))(Sanders, Craig) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |