California Central District Court
Judge:Percy Anderson
Referred: John E Mcdermott
Case #: 2:21-cv-00043
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2021
Terminated:Apr 14, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Jul 04, 2021 1:53 AM PDT
Defendant
Terez Owens
Defendant
Terezowens.com, LLC
Plaintiff
Mockingbird 38, LLC
Represented By
Craig B Sanders
Barshay Sanders PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, April 15, 2021
14 14 misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Thu 04/15 11:52 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Dismissal
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 04/15 11:48 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court finds that Plaintiff has abandoned this action and failed to comply with the Court's Order. The Court therefore dismisses this action without prejudice for lack of prosecution and for failure to comply with a Court order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b); see also Yourish, 191 F.3d at 986-88; Ferdik, 963 F.2d at 1260. (See document for details). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/06 2:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Lack Of Prosecution by Judge Percy Anderson. (Show Cause Response due by 4/13/2021.) (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2021
11 11 10 pgs order Order Thu 01/07 4:19 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
10 10 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 01/05 4:35 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Terezowens.com, LLC. (car)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 01/05 4:34 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Terez Owens. (car)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 01/05 4:11 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 01/05 4:10 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 01/05 8:05 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mockingbird 38, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company, identifying Counsel for Plaintiff. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Summons Request Tue 01/05 8:04 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Mockingbird 38, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 01/05 8:03 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Mockingbird 38, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 01/05 8:01 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mockingbird 38, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Tue 01/05 8:00 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Mockingbird 38, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 01/05 7:59 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29864107 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Mockingbird 38, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company. (Attorney Craig B Sanders added to party Mockingbird 38, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company(pty:pla))(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit