Member Case
Lead case is: 4:21-bk-40002

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth D Katz
Case #: 4:21-bk-40005
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2021
Terminated:Sep 02, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Futures Behavior Therapy Center, LLC
200 Friberg Pkwy
Westborough, MA 01581-3991
Represented By
Michael J. Goldberg
Casner & Edwards, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Assistant U.S. Trustee
Richard King
Office of US. Trustee 446 Main Street 14th Floor
Worcester, MA 01608


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, September 02, 2021
court Close Bankruptcy Case (Ch.11 Only) Thu 09/02 10:15 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (pf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
14 14 notice Notice Tue 08/31 5:12 PM
Notice Plan Administrator's Notice of Case Closing with certificate of service filed by Other Party Getzler Henrich & Associates LLC, Plan Administrator (Whitesell, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
13 13 claims Assignment of Claims Wed 04/28 12:49 PM
Assignment of Claim Transferor: Benefit Street Partners, as Agent for itself and OFS Capital Mgmt Claim No. 2.1 to Transferee: Capital One, National Association, as Agent in the Amount of $43,700,000.00 with Waiver of Notice filed by Capital One, National Association, as Agent. [Transfer Fee Amount $26] (Feinsmith, Todd)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 04/28 12:51 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Assignment of Claim 21-40005 [claims,assign] ( 26.00). Receipt Number 19231680, amount $ 26.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#13
Monday, February 08, 2021
trustee Statement of Dial-In Information Mon 02/08 11:11 AM
Telephonic Meeting Information for Section 341 Meeting of Creditors: Dial-in Number: (877) 218-1075 Participant Code: 7371957#. For International Call Information Please Contact the Trustee. (Meunier, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
12 12 30+ pgs misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury - Form 202 Wed 01/27 9:33 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual , Schedules A/B, D, E/F, G and H. , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual filed by Debtor Futures Behavior Therapy Center, LLC (Goldberg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 14, 2021
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Fri 01/15 12:37 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] Notice Date 01/14/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Court's Notice of 341 sent - 11 Corporation
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
10 10 crt_gen Court's Notice of 341 Sent 11 Corporation Tue 01/12 7:27 AM
Court's Notice of 341 sent. (sas)
Related: [-]
court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Tue 01/12 7:27 AM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/9/2021 at 02:30 PM as Telephonic Meeting. (sas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2021
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Fri 01/08 12:42 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 01/07/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order to Update
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Fri 01/08 12:42 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 01/07/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order to Reassign or Transfer Case
7 7 court|misc Matrix|Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix Thu 01/07 11:45 AM
Verification of Creditor Matrix , Matrix Related [+] filed by Debtor Futures Behavior Therapy Center, LLC (Whitesell, A.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion For Joint Administration Tue 01/05 3:15 PM
Endorsed Order dated 1/5/2021 Related [+] GRANTED. DEBTOR'S COUNSEL IS ORDERED TO SUBMIT A PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER, IN WORD FORMAT TO EDK@MAB.USCOURTS.GOV, FORTHWITH. (ag)
Related: [-] 3 Motion filed by Debtor Futures Behavior Therapy Center, LLC for Joint Administration with Case # 21-40002 21-40003 21-40004 21-40005
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Reassign or Transfer Case Tue 01/05 2:32 PM
Order dated 1/5/2021 Re:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. PURSUANT TO MLBR 5001-1(D), I HEREBY REASSIGN THE CASE TO JUDGE ELIZABETH D. KATZ. (meh, Usbc)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order to Update Tue 01/05 1:23 PM
Order to Update Re:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Matrix Due 1/6/2021. Corporate Vote due by 1/12/2021. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Atty Disclosure Statement, Schedules A-H , Statement of Financial Affairs and Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 1/19/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 1/6/2021, 1/12/2021 and 1/19/2021. (meh, Usbc)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Joint Administration Tue 01/05 12:39 PM
Motion filed by Debtor Futures Behavior Therapy Center, LLC for Joint Administration with Case # 21-40002 21-40003 21-40004 21-40005 (Whitesell, A.)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Tue 01/05 11:51 AM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by Debtor Futures Behavior Therapy Center, LLC (Goldberg, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 01/05 11:51 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. with deficiencies. Filing Fee in the Amount of $1738 Filed by Futures Behavior Therapy Center, LLC. (Goldberg, Michael)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Tue 01/05 11:56 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 21-40005 [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt Number 19106851, amount $1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1