California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:21-cv-00049
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2021
Terminated:Feb 22, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Jul 04, 2021 2:33 AM PDT
Defendant
Shelley Iniguez
Represented By
James B Abeltin
Abeltin And Migoya LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By
Kelley K Beck
Lindahl Beck LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 19, 2021
14 14 stip Dismiss Case Fri 02/19 1:37 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company.(Beck, Kelley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2021
13 13 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 02/16 11:17 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant All Defendants, identifying Shelley Iniguez. (Abeltin, James)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 02/16 9:52 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 02/16 9:19 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Dismiss10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Compliance with Local Rule 7.1-1 is required no later than February 18, 2021. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 12, 2021
10 10 motion Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 02/12 4:08 PM
First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or alternatively to stay action filed by defendant Shelley Iniguez. Motion set for hearing on 3/18/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attorney James B Abeltin added to party Shelley Iniguez(pty:dft)) (Abeltin, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of James Abeltin,
Att: 3 Declaration Certification of Interested Parties,
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
9 9 service Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed Tue 01/26 3:45 PM
NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company, upon Defendant Shelley Iniguez acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 1/25/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by James Abeltin, Attorney. (Beck, Kelley)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2021
8 8 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 01/15 1:23 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 01/06 10:21 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Shelley Iniguez. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 01/06 10:17 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 01/06 10:16 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 01/05 1:27 PM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company, identifying Ohio Casualty Insurance Company; Ohio Casualty Corporation; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company; Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company; Peerless Insurance Company; Employers Insurance Company of Wausau; Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc.; Liberty Mutual Group Inc.; LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc.; and Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc.. (Beck, Kelley)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Miscellaneous Document Tue 01/05 12:10 PM
Summons filed by Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (Beck, Kelley)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 01/05 12:06 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Beck, Kelley)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 01/05 12:03 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29870326 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Attorney Kelley K Beck added to party Ohio Security Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Beck, Kelley)
Related: [-]