North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Kenneth D Bell
Referred: David S Cayer
Case #: 5:21-cv-00002
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000ra Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2021
Terminated:Apr 16, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jul 03, 2021 5:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Renwood Mills, LLC
Represented By
Jennifer Staples
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Jerry Howard Walters, Jr.
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Lyndon Martin
9522 Saddle Run Trail
Charlotte, NC 28269


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 06/23 8:56 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Marshal as to Renwood Mills, LLC. (tmg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 16, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/16 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lyndon Martin. Civil case terminated . (nvc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
7 7 motion Extension of Time Wed 03/24 4:27 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint by Renwood Mills, LLC. (Walters, Jerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/24 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Staples on behalf of Renwood Mills, LLC (Staples, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/24 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry Howard Walters, Jr on behalf of Renwood Mills, LLC (Walters, Jerry)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 03/24 4:53 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Renwood Mills, LLC's answer due 4/29/2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/24/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(DLG)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 03/01 10:30 AM
Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Renwood Mills, LLC. (tmg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM 285 Form
Friday, February 19, 2021
3 3 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 02/19 10:41 AM
ORDER (Sealed - Participants) granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk is instructed to mail blank summons to Plaintiff to fill out and identify Defendant for service of process, upon return of completed summons Clerk shall direct US Marshal to effectuate service. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 2/19/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail) (tmg)
Related: [-]
utility Summons Sent Fri 02/19 10:44 AM
Blank summons mailed to plaintiff with instructions to complete and return to the Court for process by the Marshal Service. Summons due by 3/5/2021. (tmg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
notice ECF - Wrong Division Error Tue 01/05 4:09 PM
NOTICE: Case was filed in wrong division. Case has been copied from 3:21-cv-00002-FDW to 5:21-cv-00002-KDB. Please use 5:21-cv-00002-KDB for all future pleadings. (tmg)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/05 4:12 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assignment Packet Link Tue 01/05 4:12 PM
Clerk's Entry and Service of[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . The document was served conventionally by US Mail (tmg)
Related: [-]
utility Judge Bell Civil Standing Order Requiring ISC Tue 01/05 4:13 PM
Clerk's Entry and Service of[LINK:Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases] assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The order was served conventionally. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (tmg)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 01/05 11:00 AM
MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lyndon Martin. (eef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/05 10:59 AM
Pro Se COMPLAINT against Renwood Mills, LLC, filed by Lyndon Martin.(eef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope