South Carolina District Court
Judge:J Michelle Childs
Referred: Thomas E Rogers, III
Case #: 4:20-cv-04494
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2020
Terminated:Nov 01, 2021

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, November 01, 2021
34 34 misc Judgment Mon 11/01 4:31 PM
JUDGMENT by the Clerk. This case is dismissed with prejudice. (dsto, )
Related: [-]
33 33 4 pgs order Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation Mon 11/01 3:58 PM
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The court ACCEPTS the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 26 ) and DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE Hassan Dones Mose's claims. (ECF No. 21 ).IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/01/2021. (dsto, )
Related: [-]
misc Document Mailed Mon 11/01 4:33 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED:34 Judgment w/NEF,33 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Hassan Dones Mose, #01040, 1037 Lexington Ave., Apt. B, Kingstree, SC, 29556 (dsto, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 16, 2021
27 27 misc Document Mailed Fri 04/16 1:17 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED: 25 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,24 Order - 1983 - No Service w/NEF,26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Hassan Dones Mose, #01040, 1037 Lexington Ave., Apt. B, Kinstree, SC, 29556 (dsto, )
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Report and Recommendation Fri 04/16 1:15 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the District Court dismiss the Complaint in this case with prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 4/30/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 04/16/2021.(dsto, )
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 04/16 1:06 PM
ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per 24 No Serve Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 04/16/2021.(dsto, )
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order 1983 - No Service - Inmate Fri 04/16 1:05 PM
ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 04/16/2021. (dsto, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
22 22 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/15 10:35 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Related [+] by Hassan Dones Mose. Response to Motion due by 4/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, )
Related: [-] stricted Access
Att: 1 Envelope
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 04/15 10:34 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kershaw County Detention Center, filed by Hassan Dones Mose. Service due by 7/14/2021.(dsto, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, April 01, 2021
19 19 misc Document Mailed Thu 04/01 11:02 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED18 Proper Form Order with nef, AO240 form and prisoner complaint form placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Hassan Dones Mose #01040 1037 Lexington Ave. Apt. B Kingstree, SC 29556 (swel, )
Related: [-]
18 18 order Proper Form Order Thu 04/01 10:58 AM
PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 4/22/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 4/1/2021.(swel, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 25, 2021
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/25 4:39 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kershaw County Detention Center, filed by Hassan Dones Mose. Service due by 6/23/2021(swel, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
13 13 order Order Thu 03/25 4:38 PM
TEXT ORDER : On February 11, 2021, a Rule 41 dismissal without prejudice was recommended. Plaintiff did not respond to the recommendation within the objection deadline. On March 19, 2021, Plaintiff submitted a near identical complaint form as ECF No. 1 without referencing this action. It appears Plaintiff is attempting to continue prosecution of this case and the Report and Recommendation is rescinded and the March 2021 complaint form filed as an Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 3/25/21. (swel, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
10 10 misc Document Mailed Thu 02/11 4:43 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Hassan Dones Mose, #01040, 1037 Lexington Ave., Apt. B, Kingstree, SC, 29556 (dsto, )
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Report and Recommendation Thu 02/11 2:28 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this case is dismissed without prejudice and that the Clerk of Court close the file. Objections to R&R due by 2/25/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 02/11/2021. (dsto, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
6 6 misc Document Mailed Tue 01/12 5:02 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED:5 Proper Form Order w/NEF, AO240 and Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Hassan Dones Mose, #01040, 1037 Lexington Ave., Apt. B, Kinstrett, SC, 29556 (dsto, )
Related: [-]
5 5 order Proper Form Order Tue 01/12 4:59 PM
PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 2/2/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 01/12/2021. (dsto, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
2 2 misc True Division for Trial Tue 01/05 5:30 PM
TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (dsto, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/05 5:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Kershaw County Detention Center, filed by Hassan Dones Mose. Service due by 3/30/2021.(dsto, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope