BURTON v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-00040 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:20-cv-02638 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 05, 2021 5:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
BRIAN BURTON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 26, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 01/26 3:36 PM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by BRIAN BURTON. (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
Friday, January 22, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/22 7:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by VINCE C REUTER on behalf of BRIAN BURTON (REUTER, VINCE) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/22 7:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JARED M REAMS on behalf of BRIAN BURTON (REAMS, JARED) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/22 7:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEFF H ECKLAND on behalf of BRIAN BURTON (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
Wednesday, January 06, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 01/06 10:12 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Short Form (Amended) Complaint due by 1/26/2021 .) (djb) |
|
11 | 11
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY)
Wed 01/06 9:54 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-02638. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
10 | 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-88) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers.(kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/6/2021.] | |
Thursday, December 31, 2020 | ||
9 | 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Aearo Holding LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/6/2021.] | |
8 | 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Aearo Intermediate LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/6/2021.] | |
7 | 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Aearo LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/6/2021.] | |
6 | 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/6/2021.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE by Aearo Holding LLC, Aearo Intermediate LLC, Aearo LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC re1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/6/2021.] | |
Tuesday, December 22, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-2638 (JRT/KMM). (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/6/2021.] | |
3 | 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/6/2021.] | |
2 | 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/6/2021.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8332780) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/6/2021.] | |
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |