Maryland District Court
Judge:Deborah L Boardman
Case #: 8:21-cv-00040
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporti
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2021
Terminated:Sep 11, 2023
Case in other court:Circuit Court for Prince Georges County, Maryland, CAL20-18898
Last checked: Monday Jul 05, 2021 5:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Navy Federal Credit Union
Represented By
Syed Mohsin Reza
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Defendant
Department Stores National Bank
Represented By
Michael Benjamin Brown
Miles & Stockbridge, PC
contact info
Defendant
Citibank N.A.
Represented By
Michael Benjamin Brown
Miles & Stockbridge, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan Alston
10006 Cedarhallow Ln
Largo, MD 20774
Represented By
Jeffrey W Styles
Washington Legal Group, Llc (usa/fpd)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
FDS Thrift Holding Co.
Terminated: 01/27/2021
Represented By
Michael Benjamin Brown
Miles & Stockbridge, PC
contact info
Edward Hutchinson Robbins, Jr
Miles And Stockbridge PC
contact info
Defendant
Macy's Inc.
Terminated: 01/27/2021
Represented By
Michael Benjamin Brown
Miles & Stockbridge, PC
contact info
Edward Hutchinson Robbins, Jr
Miles And Stockbridge PC
contact info

GPO Sep 30 2021
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 9/30/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, September 11, 2023
order Order Mon 09/11 11:47 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER approving65 stipulation of dismissal with prejudice of all claims against the defendant Navy Federal Credit Union and directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 9/11/2023. (lmys, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
65 65 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 09/08 9:38 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Defendant Navy Federal Credit Union by Jonathan Alston(Styles, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]