California Central District Court
Judge:Mark C Scarsi
Referred: John E Mcdermott
Case #: 2:21-cv-00097
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2021
Terminated:Mar 14, 2022
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 20LBCV00527
Last checked: Monday Jul 05, 2021 1:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Bankers Life and Casualty Company
Represented By
Anthony T Case
Farmer Case And Fedor
contact info
Tiffany Lee Steward
Farmer Case And Fedor
contact info
Defendant
Bankers Life
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Moshen Babaeian
Represented By
Shane Jacob Bernard
Bernard And Bernard
contact info
Plaintiff
Roya Mohammadi
Represented By
Shane Jacob Bernard
Bernard And Bernard
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 26, 2022
90 90 misc Writ of Execution - Issued Thu 05/26 11:12 AM
Writ of Execution issued against Moshen Babaeian, Roya Mohammadi re: Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution RE COSTS89 . (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
89 89 misc Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution Wed 05/25 1:55 PM
Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Defendant Bankers Life and Casualty Company.(Case, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Writ of Execution
88 88 notice Deficiency - Writ of Execution (CV-52c) - optional html form Wed 05/25 1:04 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY WRIT OF EXECUTION. The document is being returned to you for correction of: The amount(s) listed in writ/abstract do(es) not coincide with the amount(s) in the judgment/order. If there are no amounts for principal, attorney fees, costs or interest, please enter a zero (0) on each line. CLARIFICATION OF THE ABOVE: Filer was only awarded COSTS as Taxed by the Clerk. No interest accrues on taxed costs by clerk. Please remove interest amounts on both forms accordingly and resulting in editing of page 2 of writ as well. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
87 87 misc Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution Tue 05/24 11:48 AM
Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Defendant Bankers Life and Casualty Company.(Case, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Writ of Execution