California Central District Court
Judge:Cormac J Carney
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:21-cv-00019
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2021
Terminated:Apr 26, 2022
Case in other court:Orange County Superior Court, 30-02020-01131276
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 06, 2021 2:07 AM PDT
Defendant
Chapman University
Represented By
Aaron J Schu
Paul Plevin Sullivan And Connaughton LLP
contact info
Fred M Plevin
Paul Plevin Sullivan And Connaughton
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Chelsea Johnson
Represented By
Andrea M Tytell
Andrea Tytell Law Offices
contact info
Gillian Marie Ramos
Law Offices Of Andrea M Tytell
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Board of Trustees of Chapman University
Terminated: 04/13/2021
Defendant
Jason McAlexander
Terminated: 04/13/2021
Defendant
Jerry Price, Ph.D.
Terminated: 04/13/2021
Defendant
Daniele C. Struppa, Ph.D.
Terminated: 04/13/2021


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
31 31 order Dismissing Case Wed 04/27 11:11 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL [FRCP 41(a)] by Judge Cormac J. Carney, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case30 . IT IS ORDERED THAT THIS ACTION BE, AND HEREBY IS, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to all claims, causes of action, and parties, with each party bearing that partys own attorneys fees and costs. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
30 30 stip Dismiss Case Mon 04/25 4:11 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)] filed by Defendant Chapman University.(Schu, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
29 29 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) Tue 11/09 1:08 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Amy Semmel has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 17, 2021
28 28 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Assigned) - (ADR-2) Fri 09/17 11:56 AM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties request that the ADR Program assign a Panel Mediator from the following area of law: Accommodations and Higher Education. Filed by Plaintiff Chelsea Johnson(Tytell, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
27 27 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held Wed 07/28 3:21 PM
ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (rrp)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Wed 07/28 3:21 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Discovery cut-off 5/12/2022. LAST DATE TO HEAR MOTIONS is 7/11/2022. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 5/26/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2022 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial set for 9/20/2022 at 8:30 a.m. (rrp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
25 25 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 07/20 1:39 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendant Chapman University.. (Schu, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 16, 2021
24 24 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Fri 07/16 3:12 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,13 Answer to Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Chapman University.(Schu, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
23 23 order Strike Dismiss Wed 06/23 2:15 PM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Denying Defendant's MOTION to Strike and Granting in Part Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss (Dkt.18 ). It is DISMISSED WITH FOURTEEN DAYS LEAVE TO AMEND. Defendant shall file an answer to the Second Amended Complaint by 7/16/21. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
22 22 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 06/14 4:21 PM
REPLY In support of a motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Second Amended Complaint Amended Complaint/Petition,,13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint 18 filed by Defendant Chapman University.(Schu, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Aaron J. Schu in Support of Reply
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
21 21 misc Errata Wed 06/02 5:31 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Chelsea Johnson. correcting MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,,20 PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS FROM SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF ANDREA M. TYTELL IN SUPPORT THEREOF (Tytell, Andrea)
Related: [-]
20 20 17 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Wed 06/02 4:16 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS FROM SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF ANDREW M. TYTELL IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Plaintiff Chelsea Johnson.(Tytell, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF ANDREA M. TYTELL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS FROM SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Friday, May 21, 2021
19 19 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 05/21 9:21 AM
NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on July 29, 2021. (rrp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 20, 2021
18 18 motion Strike Dismiss (cause or other) Thu 05/20 1:45 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Second Amended Complaint Amended Complaint/Petition,,13 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Chapman University. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Schu, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration of Aaron Schu,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, April 26, 2021
17 17 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Tue 04/27 4:59 PM
ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT15 by Judge Cormac J. Carney: 1. Defendant Chapman University's deadline to respond to Plaintiff Chelsea Johnson's Second Amended Complaint is extended from April 27, 2021 to May 27, 2021; and2. Plaintiff Chelsea Johnson is granted leave to file a Third Amended Complainton or before May 27, 2021, to reflect any agreements made in the parties'meet and confer discussions. (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 23, 2021
textonly Generic Text Only Entry Fri 04/23 2:42 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE AND ORDER TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES RE STIPULATION (DKT.15 ) by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4 et seq. and/or the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the following deficiency has been found with your electronically-filed document. Proposed orders requiring the judge's signature must be emailed to the chambers email along with the PDF version of the UNDERLYING document (i.e., the Stipulation) that includes the NEF header; see L.R. 5-4.4.2. Counsel shall comply by no later than April 26, 2021, or the document may be stricken for failure to comply with the Local Rules. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 22, 2021
15 15 stip Reschedule Thu 04/22 5:50 PM
STIPULATION to Reschedule Deadline to respond to Second Amended Complaint and for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Chelsea Johnson.(Tytell, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 13, 2021
13 13 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Tue 04/13 3:09 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Plaintiff Chapman University, Does amending Amended Complaint/Petition8 , Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Chelsea Johnson(Tytell, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Email from CHAPMAN Vice President for Student Affairs and Dean of Students, dated August 31, 2018,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Accommodations Letter, dated July 9, 2015,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Email from Gloria Rogers of Disability Services, dates August 17, 2015,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Accommodations Letter, dated August 31, 2018
textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 04/13 5:02 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT13 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. A Second Amended Complaint having been filed by Plaintiff on 4/13/2021, absent further order of the Court and in accordance with FRCP 15(a)(3), a response is due no later than 4/27/2021. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 01, 2021
12 12 order Dismiss Fri 04/02 9:33 AM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT CHAPMAN UNIVERSITY'S MOTION TO DISMISS (Dkt.9 ) by Judge Cormac J. Carney. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff's ADA claim and breach of contract, negligence, and IIED claims to the extent they challenge the quality of Plaintiff's education are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's breach of contract claim, with regards to Panther Village and the shuttle service, and IIED claim are DISMISSED WITH FOURTEEN DAYS LEAVE TO AMEND. If Plaintiff elects not to amend her complaint, Defendant shall file an answer to the First Amended Complaint by April 29, 2021. (lom) Modified on 4/2/2021 (lom). Modified on 4/2/2021 (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
11 11 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 03/19 4:44 PM
REPLY In support of a motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 9 filed by Defendant Chapman University. (Schu, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
10 10 20 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/12 10:03 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Chelsea Johnson. (Tytell, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2021
9 9 motion Dismiss (cause or other) Fri 02/26 2:28 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Chapman University. Motion set for hearing on 4/5/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Schu, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration of Aaron Schu,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, February 12, 2021
8 8 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Fri 02/12 10:11 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by CHELSEA JOHNSON Chelsea Johnson(Tytell, Andrea)
Related: [-]
7 7 stip Amend/Correct Fri 02/12 10:08 AM
First STIPULATION to AMEND filed by CHELSEA JOHNSON Chelsea Johnson.(Tytell, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Friday, January 08, 2021
6 6 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 01/08 2:53 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Chapman University answer now due 2/12/2021, filed by Defendant Chapman University.(Schu, Aaron)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 01/08 9:18 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 01/08 9:17 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 01/06 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Chapman University, identifying Chelsea Johnson, Chapman University, Board of Trustees of Chapman University, Daniele C. Struppa, Jerry Price, Jason McAlexander. (Plevin, Fred)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 01/06 3:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Chapman University. (Plevin, Fred)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 01/06 3:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County, case number 30-2020 01131276 Receipt No: ACACDC-29899776 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Chapman University. (Attorney Fred M Plevin added to party Chapman University(pty:dft))(Plevin, Fred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 01/08 9:24 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Board of Trustees of Chapman University, Chapman University, Does, Jason McAlexander, Jerry Price, Ph.D., Daniele C. Struppa, Ph.D. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Chelsea Johnson. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/11/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]