California Central District Court
Judge:Virginia A Phillips
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 8:21-cv-00018
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2021
Terminated:May 03, 2023
Case in other court:Orange County Superior Court, 30-02020-01166659-CU-
Last checked: Monday Jul 05, 2021 2:30 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Western Refining Retail, LLC
Represented By
Matt Light
Shook Hardy And Bacon LLP
contact info
Kristen A. Page
Shook Hardy And Bacon LLP
contact info
William C. Martucci
Shook Hardy And Bacon LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alejandro Caballero
Represented By
Walter L Haines
United Employees Law Group
contact info
David G Spivak
The Spivak Law Firm
contact info
Caroline Tahmassian Zarneh
The Spivak Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Alex Caballero
Represented By
Walter L Haines
United Employees Law Group
contact info
David G Spivak
The Spivak Law Firm
contact info
Caroline Tahmassian Zarneh
The Spivak Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Noura Major
Represented By
Walter L Haines
United Employees Law Group
contact info
David G Spivak
The Spivak Law Firm
contact info
Caroline Tahmassian Zarneh
The Spivak Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
58 58 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 05/03 3:57 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE57 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips : The Court, having reviewed the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), and good cause appearing, hereby GRANTS the stipulation and ORDERS as follows: This entire action is dismissed with prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys fees other than those awarded by the court in the global settlement approved in Maynor, et al. v. Western Refining Retail, LLC, Case No. CIV SB 2209052 (San Bernardino Superior Court). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
57 57 stip Dismiss Case Mon 05/01 10:07 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant Western Refining Retail, LLC.(Light, Matt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order