Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Jean C Hamilton
Case #: 4:21-cv-00020
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2021
Terminated:Oct 12, 2021
Last checked: Monday Jul 05, 2021 4:46 AM CDT
Defendant
LTS Building Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff
Todd O'Donaghue
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kent Kiefner
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rocky Kloth
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Craig McPartlin
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Murphy
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dan Neiswander
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tod O'Donaghue
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mike Hart
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ron Padgett
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jim Sauer
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tim Schoolfield
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Trust Fund
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Keith Taylor
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tim Weis
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Greg Hesser
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Todd Hake
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Gavoli
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Gaal
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Deptula
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Calhoun
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott Byrne
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald Brussel, Jr.
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Albert Bond
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Boehms
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Behlman
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dan Barger
Represented By
Greg A. Campbell
Hammond And Shinners PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
11 11 order A Docket Text Order Tue 10/12 10:46 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:10 MOTION to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice by Plaintiffs Dan Barger, Robert Behlman, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Michael Gavoli, Michael Gavoli, Michael Gavoli, Michael Gavoli, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Mike Hart, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Kent Kiefner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Brian Murphy, Brian Murphy, Brian Murphy, Brian Murphy, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Todd O'Donaghue, Ron Padgett, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Trust Fund, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Tim Weis. (Campbell, Greg) ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 10/12/2021. (ANP)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
10 10 motion Dismiss Case Fri 10/08 12:29 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice by Plaintiffs Dan Barger, Robert Behlman, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Michael Gavoli, Michael Gavoli, Michael Gavoli, Michael Gavoli, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Mike Hart, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Kent Kiefner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Brian Murphy, Brian Murphy, Brian Murphy, Brian Murphy, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Todd O'Donaghue, Ron Padgett, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Trust Fund, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Tim Weis. (Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
9 9 order A Docket Text Order Mon 09/13 12:20 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ; Extension to file the following: Motion for Default or Dismissal; Proposed extension date October 15, 2021 by Plaintiffs Dan Barger, Robert Behlman, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Michael Gavoli, Michael Gavoli, Michael Gavoli, Michael Gavoli, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Mike Hart, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Kent Kiefner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Brian Murphy, Brian Murphy, Brian Murphy, Brian Murphy, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Todd O'Donaghue, Ron Padgett, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Trust Fund, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Tim Weis. (Campbell, Greg) filed by Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Donald Brussel, Jr., Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Tim Weis, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Todd O'Donaghue, Robert Behlman, Albert Bond, Keith Taylor, Tod O'Donaghue, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Jim Sauer, Albert Bond, Ron Padgett, Dan Barger, Mike Hart, Tim Schoolfield, Brian Murphy, Scott Byrne, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Greg Hesser, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Trust Fund, John Gaal, Todd Hake, Michael Gavoli, Kent Kiefner, Mark Boehms, Dan Neiswander, Kevin Deptula, Robert Calhoun; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 9/13/21. (KEK)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 09/13 10:52 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Motion for Default or Dismissal ;Proposed extension date October 15, 2021 by Plaintiffs Dan Barger, Robert Behlman, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Michael Gavoli, Michael Gavoli, Michael Gavoli, Michael Gavoli, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Mike Hart, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Kent Kiefner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Brian Murphy, Brian Murphy, Brian Murphy, Brian Murphy, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Todd O'Donaghue, Ron Padgett, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Trust Fund, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Tim Weis. (Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
7 7 1 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Tue 09/07 2:11 PM
ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, file appropriate motions for entry of default and for default judgment, supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation, as well as proposed orders for the Court's consideration. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal without prejudice.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 09/07/2021. (KRZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 06/02 12:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis), Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Rocky Kloth, Kevin Deptula, Scott Byrne, Ron Padgett, Tod O'Donaghue, Donald Brussel, Jr, Keith Taylor, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Dan Barger, Todd Hake, Todd O'Donaghue, Tim Schoolfield, Brian Murphy, Kent Kiefner, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Trust Fund, Jim Sauer, Michael Gavoli, Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis), Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis), Dan Neiswander, Robert Behlman, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Mike Hart, Craig McPartlin, Tim Weis, John Gaal, Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Trust Fund), Mark Boehms. All Defendants. (Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
service Summons Reissued (Alias/Pluries) Mon 05/24 9:31 AM
Alias Summons Issued as to defendant LTS Building Systems, Inc.. The summons was emailed to Cindy Stegmeyer. (KEK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/19 10:20 AM
NOTICE Memorandum for Clerk requeting Alias Summons: by Plaintiffs Dan Barger, Robert Behlman, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Michael Gavoli, Michael Gavoli, Michael Gavoli, Michael Gavoli, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Mike Hart, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Kent Kiefner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Brian Murphy, Brian Murphy, Brian Murphy, Brian Murphy, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Todd O'Donaghue, Ron Padgett, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Trust Fund, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Tim Weis(Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Alias
Monday, January 11, 2021
4 4 misc Disclosure of Organizational Interests Mon 01/11 9:58 AM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiffs Dan Barger, Robert Behlman, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Donald Brussel, Jr, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Michael Gavoli, Michael Gavoli, Michael Gavoli, Michael Gavoli, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Mike Hart, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Kent Kiefner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Brian Murphy, Brian Murphy, Brian Murphy, Brian Murphy, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Todd O'Donaghue, Ron Padgett, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Trust Fund, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Tim Weis.. (Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2021
3 3 notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Thu 01/07 8:11 AM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Plaintiffs Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Trust Fund, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 1/18/2021. (ANP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
2 2 service Notice of Process Server Wed 01/06 2:54 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Dan Barger, Robert Behlman, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Donald Jr. Brussel, Donald Jr. Brussel, Donald Jr. Brussel, Donald Jr. Brussel, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Michael Gavoli, Michael Gavoli, Michael Gavoli, Michael Gavoli, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Mike Hart, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Kent Kiefner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Brian Murphy, Brian Murphy, Brian Murphy, Brian Murphy, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Todd O'Donaghue, Ron Padgett, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Trust Fund, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Tim Weis Process Server: Frederick Investigations (Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/06 2:52 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8387092, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis), Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Rocky Kloth, Kevin Deptula, Scott Byrne, Ron Padgett, Tod O'Donaghue, Keith Taylor, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Todd Hake, Todd O'Donaghue, Tim Schoolfield, Brian Murphy, Kent Kiefner, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Trust Fund, Jim Sauer, Michael Gavoli, Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis), Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis), Dan Neiswander, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Mike Hart, Craig McPartlin, Tim Weis, John Gaal, Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Trust Fund).(Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Original Filing Form,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Case Opening Notification Wed 01/06 3:53 PM
Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Greg A. Campbell. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. (BAK)
Related: [-]