Original Case: 2:18-cv-00726

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv-04002
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2021
Terminated:Jun 15, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 16, 2021 2:27 AM MDT
Defendant - Appellee
MEGAN J. BRENNAN
Represented By
Jennifer Paisner Williams
Office of the United States Attorney
contact info
Tiffany Romney
Office of the United States Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
NGOC RON MENDELL
Represented By
David J. Holdsworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/16/2021 2:27 AM MDT
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
[10797314] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/05/2020 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 01/19/2021 for Ngoc Ron Mendell. Notice of appearance due on 01/19/2021 for Megan J. Brennan. 21-4002
Related: [-]
Att: 1 28 pgs Preliminary Record
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil