Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Susan Paradise Baxter
Case #: 1:21-cv-00019
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2021
Terminated:May 06, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 06, 2021 4:53 AM EDT
Defendant
HARD EIGHT NUTRITION, LLC
Represented By
Joel Max Eads
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY
Represented By
Lawrence H. Fisher
One Oxford Center
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, April 08, 2022
11 11 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/08 2:48 PM
ORDER granting10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 4/8/2022. (esa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 10, 2021
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Atty) Thu 06/10 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY (Fisher, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 06, 2021
9 9 order Order Thu 05/06 8:34 AM
ORDER. The Parties have notified the Court that a settlement has been reached in this matter. See ECF No. 8. In light of the settlement agreement, the Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED as of today's date. Nothing contained in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this matter and the Court will retain jurisdiction should further proceedings regarding settlement become necessary. Plaintiff is hereby ordered to file a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal on or before Friday, June 4, 2021. Should said Notice not be filed by that date, the Parties are to file a joint written status report updating the Court on their progress toward a resolution of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on May 6, 2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 05, 2021
8 8 notice Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents Wed 05/05 8:59 PM
NOTICE of Intent to File Voluntary Dismissal by ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY (Fisher, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
7 7 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 03/31 5:45 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY Answer due from HARD EIGHT NUTRITION, LLC on 5/6/2021. (Fisher, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 05, 2021
6 6 misc Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option Fri 02/05 11:45 AM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY. (Fisher, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option Fri 02/05 8:18 AM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by HARD EIGHT NUTRITION, LLC. (Eads, Joel)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 02/05 1:56 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Susan Paradise Baxter, presiding and Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo, referral. (dm)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
4 4 order Order for Consent/DJO form Fri 01/29 3:35 PM
TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 2/5/2021 , the parties shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form can be found on this Court's website at: http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Consent to Jurisdiction by Mag. Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned due by 2/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 1/29/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/21 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Max Eads on behalf of HARD EIGHT NUTRITION, LLC. (Eads, Joel)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/21 3:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HARD EIGHT NUTRITION, LLC. HARD EIGHT NUTRITION, LLC waiver sent on 1/21/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Eads, Joel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Thu 01/07 2:29 PM
COMPLAINT against HARD EIGHT NUTRITION, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6223903), filed by ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY. (jd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet