New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Sandra J Feuerstein
Referred: Steven Tiscione
Case #: 2:21-cv-00094
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2021
Terminated:Apr 16, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 06, 2021 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
AAA Auto Sales
Represented By
Charles Alfred Weil
contact info
Defendant
Abdul B. Karimzada
Represented By
Charles Alfred Weil
contact info
Plaintiff
The American Automobile Association, Inc.
Represented By
Neil Kenneth Roman
Covington & Burling, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, April 16, 2021
10 10 order Judgment - Consent Fri 04/16 2:27 PM
CONSENT ORDER OF JUDGMENT in favor of The American Automobile Association, Inc. against AAA Auto Sales, Abdul B. Karimzada: NOW THEREFORE, Defendants consent and agree that this Court enter a judgment permanently enjoining them from any unauthorized use of AAA's trademarks or of marks confusingly similar to any of them. The Court does hereby, upon consent of the parties, declare that a permanent injunction issue herein as follows: SEE ATTACHED ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 4/16/2021. (Cubano, Jazmin)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Judgment Based on Settlement Fri 04/16 2:21 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Judgment Based on Settlement. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 4/16/2021. (Cubano, Jazmin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 12, 2021
notice Notice(Other) Mon 04/12 8:32 AM
NOTICE: The conference scheduled to be held before Judge Feuerstein on 4/13/2021 is adjourned without date. (Disbrow, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 09, 2021
9 9 motion Judgment Based on Settlement Fri 04/09 3:28 PM
Joint MOTION for Judgment Based on Settlement by The American Automobile Association, Inc.. (Roman, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Proposed Consent Order of Judgment
Thursday, February 04, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/04 9:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Alfred Weil on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Weil, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 28, 2021
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/28 10:27 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by The American Automobile Association, Inc.. Abdul B. Karimzada served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. (Roman, Neil)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/28 10:26 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by The American Automobile Association, Inc.. AAA Auto Sales served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. (Roman, Neil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
order Scheduling Order Thu 01/21 2:49 PM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/13/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein. At that time, the parties are directed to call the teleconferencing number (877) 336-1280 and follow the automated instructions; the access code is 7215690. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court.Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 1/21/2021. (Schiraldi, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 08, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Report Patent or Trademark AO120 Fri 01/08 9:24 AM
Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Trademark. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 01/08 9:16 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons #2
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 01/08 9:07 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 01/08 9:02 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/08 9:06 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2021
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/07 4:51 PM
COMPLAINT against AAA Auto Sales, Abdul B. Karimzada filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13954497 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by The American Automobile Association, Inc.. (Roman, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons