Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Claire V Eagan
Referred: Susan E Huntsman
Case #: 4:21-cv-00009
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2021
Terminated:Nov 23, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 06, 2021 3:18 AM CDT
Defendant
B&B Heat & Air, Inc.
Represented By
Marcus Glen Mullins
Durbin Larimore & Bialick
contact info
Katherine Ann Taylor Loy
Durbin Larimore & Bialick
contact info
Defendant
Ann Kinser
Represented By
Daniel E Smolen
Smolen And Roytman
contact info
Plaintiff
Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, The
Represented By
Robert P Fitz-Patrick
Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (tulsa)
contact info
Margo Elizabeth Shipley
Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (tulsa)
contact info
William Walker O'Connor
Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (tulsa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By
Robert P Fitz-Patrick
Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (tulsa)
contact info
Margo Elizabeth Shipley
Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (tulsa)
contact info
William Walker O'Connor
Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (tulsa)
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
85 85 order 01 - Order Documents - Strike/Withdraw Document(s) Documents - Vacate/Set Aside Order(s) Ruling on Motion to Withdraw Document(s) Wed 02/15 10:33 AM
ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Their Motion for Attorney Fees (Dkt. # 84) is granted. Plaintiffs' bill of costs (Dkt. # 65) and motion for attorney fees (Dkt. # 66) are WITHDRAWN, and the award of costs in favor of plaintiffs (Dkt. # 73) is VACATED ; striking/withdrawing document(s); vacating/setting aside order(s); granting84 Motion to Withdraw Documents(s) Related [+] (Documents Terminated:65 Bill of Costs,66 MOTION for Attorney Fees ) (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 65 Bill of Costs,66 MOTION for Attorney Fees ,73 Order, Taxing Costs,84 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document(s)
Monday, February 13, 2023
84 84 motion Withdraw Document(s) Mon 02/13 3:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document(s) Related [+] by Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, The, Ohio Security Insurance Company (Fitz-Patrick, Robert)
Related: [-] 66 MOTION for Attorney Fees
83 83 order 01 - Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Mon 02/13 2:01 PM
ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan parties are advised that the stipulation of dismissal has no effect on the judgment (Dkt. # 64) or the motion for attorney fees (Dkt. # 66). If the parties intend for the stipulation of dismissal to constitute the final resolution of the case, the parties will be required to file a motion to vacate the judgment and withdraw the motion for attorney fees Related [+] (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 68 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court,82 Stipulation of Dismissal,66 MOTION for Attorney Fees
Friday, February 10, 2023
82 82 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 02/10 3:37 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, The, Ohio Security Insurance Company (Fitz-Patrick, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
order 02 - Minute Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Wed 02/08 12:35 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Judgment already entered [64[; appeal dismissed [79, 80]; parties are directed to file withdrawal of [65, 66] no later than 2/10/2023. , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 2/10/2023) Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 80 Mandate from Circuit Court,65 Bill of Costs,79 Decision from Circuit Court,64 Judgment, Entering Judgment,66 MOTION for Attorney Fees