New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert D Drain
Case #: 7:11-bk-22866
Case Filed:May 02, 2011
Creditor Meeting:May 04, 2011
Claims Deadline:Jul 08, 2014
Dismissed:Dec 26, 2018
Terminated:Feb 27, 2019

Debtor
Metropark USA, Inc.
5750 Grace Pl
Los Angeles, CA 90022-4121
Represented By
Courtney A Schael
Ashford - Schael LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims and Noticing Agent
Rust Consulting/Omni Claims Agent
Rust Consulting/Omni Bankruptcy 5955 DeSoto Avenue, Suite 100
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Creditor Committee
The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
2 Park Plaza Suite 400
Irvine, CA 92614
Represented By
Ronald A. Clifford
Blakeley & Blakeley, LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Metropark USA, Inc.
2 Park Plaza Suite 400
Irvine, CA 92614
Represented By
Johnny White
Blakeley & Blakeley LLP
contact info
Scott E. Blakeley
Blakeley & Blakeley LLP
contact info
Ronald A. Clifford
Blakeley & Blakeley, LLP
contact info
Matthew W. Grimshaw
Blakeley & Blakeley LLP
contact info
Bradley D. Blakeley
Blakeley & Blakeley LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
33 Whitehall Street 21st Floor
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Susan D. Golden
Office Of United States Trustee Sdny
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 02/27 1:07 PM
Case Closed. (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
misc Terminate Party Tue 02/26 9:54 AM
Party Rust Consulting/Omni Claims Agent terminated from case. (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
841 841 order Motion, Terminate Claims and Noticing Agent Wed 02/20 10:58 AM
Order signed on 2/19/2019 Granting Motion Terminating Rust/Omni as Claims and Noticing Agent. Related [+] (McCaffrey, Dawn)
Related: [-] 838