New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Case #: 1:21-cv-00169
Nature of Suit625 Forfeiture/Penalty - Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881
Cause18:981 Civil Forfeiture
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2021
Terminated:Jan 13, 2021
Last checked: Friday Jan 08, 2021 3:12 PM EST
Defendant-in-Rem
$2,720.65 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 870781510, held in the name of Sefira Acquisitions, LLC
Defendant-in-Rem
$2.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 293919392, held in the name of Sefira Ivy Manager, LLC
Defendant-in-Rem
$23,686.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 293916521, held in the name of Sefira Ivy Owner, LP
Defendant-in-Rem
$320,823.20 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 932735991, held in the name of Sefira Tysons Owner, LP
Defendant-in-Rem
$380.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 932705036, held in the name of Sefira Tysons U.S. Holding, Inc.
Defendant-in-Rem
$5,009.48 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 912301871, held in the name of Sefira Ozarks Owner, LP
Defendant-in-Rem
$5,054.75 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 215815355, held in the name of Sefira Weston Owner, LP
Defendant-in-Rem
$5,475.43 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 133881729, held in the name of Sefira Courthouse Owner, LP
Defendant-in-Rem
$511,234.82 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 317505912, held in the name of Sefira Eagle Owner, LP
Defendant-in-Rem
$531,446.30 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 109716388, held in the name of Sefira Town Center Owner, LP
Defendant-in-Rem
$60.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 131768852, held in the name of Sefira Courthouse Manager, LLC
Defendant-in-Rem
$68.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 157793552, held in the name of Sefira Ozarks Manager, LLC
Defendant-in-Rem
$796,198.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 851553102, held in the name of Sefira Cypress U.S. Holding, Inc.
Defendant-in-Rem
$8,642,406.99 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 317399811, held in the name of Sefira Lofts Manager, LLC
Defendant-in-Rem
$8,692,483.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 362983907, held in the name of Sefira Renaissance Manager, LLC
Defendant-in-Rem
$8.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 215827350, held in the name of Sefira Weston Manager, LLC
Defendant-in-Rem
$823,965.83 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 828500202, held in the name of Sefira Cocoa Beach Owner, LP
Defendant-in-Rem
$97.18 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase bank account 932729168, held in the name of Sefira Tysons Manager, LLC
Defendant-in-Rem
all right title and interest of Sefira Eagle Owner, LP, held directly or indirectly, in the real property and appurtenances located at 100 Malaga Way (1200 Academic Parkway), Locust Grove, Georgia, kn
Defendant-in-Rem
all right title and interest of Sefira Ivy Owner, LP, held directly or indirectly, in the real property and appurtenances located at 625 Piedmont Avenue NE, Atlanta, Georgia, known as Ivy Hall Apartme
Defendant-in-Rem
all right, title and interest of Sefira Tysons Owner, LP, held directly or indirectly, in the real property and appurtenances located at 7801 Leesburg Pike, Falls Church, Virginia, known as Westin Tys
Defendant-in-Rem
$0.11 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 828529375, held in the name of Sefira Cocoa Beach U.S. Holding, Inc.
Defendant-in-Rem
$1,930,697.65 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 919596713, held in the name of Sefira Pepper Owner, LP
Defendant-in-Rem
$1.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 215832822, held in the name of Sefira Weston U.S. Holding, LLC
Defendant-in-Rem
$1.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 912295172, held in the name of Sefira Ozarks U.S. Holding, Inc.
Defendant-in-Rem
$1.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 928816565, held in the name of Sefira Stonewall U.S. Holding, Inc.
Defendant-in-Rem
$10,849.25 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 935585377, held in the name of Sefira Webb Bridge Owner, LP
Defendant-in-Rem
$13.01 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 317381827, held in the name of Sefira Eagle Manager, LLC
Defendant-in-Rem
$158,824.54 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 928818298, held in the name of Sefira Stonewall Owner, LP
Defendant-in-Rem
$18,966.72 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 851585039, held in the name of Sefira Cypress U.S., LLC
Defendant-in-Rem
$181.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 932699650, held in the name of Sefira Webb Bridge Manager, LLC
Plaintiff
United States of America
U.S. Attorney's Office 1 St. Andrew's Plaza
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Aline R Flodr
United States Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/15/2021 11:59 PM EST
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
5 5 order Stipulation and Order Wed 01/13 10:18 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, AGREED AND ORDERED, by and between the United States, by and through its attorneys, Audrey Strauss, Acting United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, and Assistant United States Attorneys Aline R. Flodr and Sheb Swett, on the one hand, and Sefira, by and through its attorney, Daniel L. Stein, on the other, that: Sefira hereby consents to the forfeiture to the United States of the Defendants in Rem Currency. In lieu of the forfeiture of the Defendants in Rem Real Property Interests, Seftra shall pay $6,519,345.09 to the United States (the "Payment") within 30 days of entry of this Stipulation and Order of Settlement ("Stipulation and Order") on the court docket, pursuant to wire transfer instructions provided by the United States. The Payment shall constitute a substitute res for the Defendants in Rem Real Property Interests, and Sefira hereby consents to the forfeiture to the United States of the Payment. All other provisions as further set forth in this order. Nothing in this Stipulation and Order shall prevent Sefira from distributing funds to its current investors. Sefira hereby agrees to waive all rights to appeal or otherwise challenge or contest the validity of this Stipulation and Order. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorney's fees. This Stipulation and Order may be executed in counterparts, each of which shall constitute an original as against the party whose signature appears on it. All executed counterparts shall be deemed to be one and the same instrument. This Stipulation and Order shall become binding when one or more counterparts, individually or taken together, bears the signature of all parties. A facsimile or electronic image of the original signature of any party executing this Stipulation and Order shall be deemed an original signature and shall constitute an original as against the party whose signature appears in the facsimile or electronic image. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/13/2021) (js)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
4 4 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Tue 01/12 10:05 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by United States of America..(Flodr, Aline)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2021
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/11 10:48 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sebastian Swett on behalf of United States of America..(Swett, Sebastian)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 01/11 12:46 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 01/11 12:47 PM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 01/11 12:47 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 08, 2021
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 01/08 3:10 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Flodr, Aline)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint for Forfeiture Fri 01/08 3:05 PM
COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against $0.11 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 828529375, held in the name of Sefira Cocoa Beach U.S. Holding, Inc., $1,930,697.65 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 919596713, held in the name of Sefira Pepper Owner, LP, $1.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 215832822, held in the name of Sefira Weston U.S. Holding, LLC, $1.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 912295172, held in the name of Sefira Ozarks U.S. Holding, Inc., $1.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 928816565, held in the name of Sefira Stonewall U.S. Holding, Inc., $10,849.25 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 935585377, held in the name of Sefira Webb Bridge Owner, LP, $13.01 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 317381827, held in the name of Sefira Eagle Manager, LLC, $158,824.54 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 928818298, held in the name of Sefira Stonewall Owner, LP, $18,966.72 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 851585039, held in the name of Sefira Cypress U.S., LLC, $181.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 932699650, held in the name of Sefira Webb Bridge Manager, LLC, $2,720.65 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 870781510, held in the name of Sefira Acquisitions, LLC, $2.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 293919392, held in the name of Sefira Ivy Manager, LLC, $23,686.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 293916521, held in the name of Sefira Ivy Owner, LP, $320,823.20 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 932735991, held in the name of Sefira Tysons Owner, LP, $380.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 932705036, held in the name of Sefira Tysons U.S. Holding, Inc., $5,009.48 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 912301871, held in the name of Sefira Ozarks Owner, LP, $5,054.75 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 215815355, held in the name of Sefira Weston Owner, LP, $5,475.43 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 133881729, held in the name of Sefira Courthouse Owner, LP, $511,234.82 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 317505912, held in the name of Sefira Eagle Owner, LP, $531,446.30 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 109716388, held in the name of Sefira Town Center Owner, LP, $60.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 131768852, held in the name of Sefira Courthouse Manager, LLC, $68.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 157793552, held in the name of Sefira Ozarks Manager, LLC, $796,198.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 851553102, held in the name of Sefira Cypress U.S. Holding, Inc., $8,642,406.99 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 317399811, held in the name of Sefira Lofts Manager, LLC, $8,692,483.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 362983907, held in the name of Sefira Renaissance Manager, LLC, $8.00 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 215827350, held in the name of Sefira Weston Manager, LLC, $823,965.83 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase Bank account 828500202, held in the name of Sefira Cocoa Beach Owner, LP, $97.18 in United States currency formerly contained in Chase bank account 932729168, held in the name of Sefira Tysons Manager, LLC, all right title and interest of Sefira Eagle Owner, LP, held directly or indirectly, in the real property and appurtenances located at 100 Malaga Way (1200 Academic Parkway), Locust Grove, Georgia, kn, all right title and interest of Sefira Ivy Owner, LP, held directly or indirectly, in the real property and appurtenances located at 625 Piedmont Avenue NE, Atlanta, Georgia, known as Ivy Hall Apartme, all right, title and interest of Sefira Tysons Owner, LP, held directly or indirectly, in the real property and appurtenances located at 7801 Leesburg Pike, Falls Church, Virginia, known as Westin Tys.Document filed by United States of America..(Flodr, Aline)
Related: [-]