Colorado District Court
Judge:Christine M Arguello
Case #: 1:21-cv-00060
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2021
Terminated:Jun 10, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 07, 2021 2:59 AM MDT
Counter Claimant
Douglas Watson
Represented By
Steven Jon Paul
Harris Karstaedt Jamison & Powers Pc-Englewood
contact info
Joseph Paul LoRusso
Lorusso & Lorusso, Ltd.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Karen Keys
Represented By
Steven Jon Paul
Harris Karstaedt Jamison & Powers Pc-Englewood
contact info
Counter Defendant
Susan L. Rhiel
633 17th Street Ste 2200
Denver, CO 80202
Represented By
Kathleen Jo Johnson
Treece Alfrey Musat, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Overland Charters, Inc.
Represented By
Steven Jon Paul
Harris Karstaedt Jamison & Powers Pc-Englewood
contact info
Defendant
Douglas Watson
Represented By
Steven Jon Paul
Harris Karstaedt Jamison & Powers Pc-Englewood
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan L. Rhiel
Represented By
Lance M. Sears
Sears & Associates P.C.
contact info
Daniel R. Volkema
Volkema Thomas, LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Karen Keys
Terminated: 03/11/2021
Represented By
Lance M. Sears
Sears & Associates P.C.
contact info
Daniel R. Volkema
Volkema Thomas, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, June 10, 2022
48 48 misc Stipulation Fri 06/10 2:17 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Counterclaimant Douglas Watson's Counter Claims by Counter Claimant Douglas Watson. (LoRusso, Joseph)
Related: [-]
order Order Dismissing Case Fri 06/10 2:47 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice pursuant to48 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/10/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
47 47 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Wed 04/13 10:52 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on April 13, 2022. Finding good cause, it is hereby ORDERED that the Second Unopposed Motion to Modify the Current Deadlines in the Minute Scheduling Order Dated January 7, 2022 (Dkt. #45 ) is GRANTED. The Scheduling Order is AMENDED as follows: Expert Disclosures: June 17, 2022, Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: July 29, 2022, Dispositive Motions: August 29, 2022, F.R.E. 702 Motions: September 5, 2022, Discovery Cutoff: September 27, 2022(csarr, )
Related: [-]
order Memorandum Wed 04/13 6:40 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding45 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify36 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, the Current Deadlines in the Minute Scheduling Order dated January 7, 2022 filed by Overland Charters, Inc., Douglas Watson. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/13/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
45 45 motion Amend/Correct/Modify Tue 04/12 4:18 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify36 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, the Current Deadlines in the Minute Scheduling Order dated January 7, 2022 by Defendants Overland Charters, Inc., Douglas Watson, Counter Claimant Douglas Watson. (Paul, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
44 44 order Protective Order Tue 03/15 10:27 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 15 March 2022. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
43 43 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 03/15 10:26 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 15 March 2022. It is hereby ORDERED that the Stipulated Motion for Entry of Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information (Dkt. #41 ) is GRANTED. The proposed Protective Order (Dkt. #41-1) is APPROVED with the changes at paragraph 10 and made an Order of Court. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
order Memorandum Tue 03/15 6:42 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding41 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information filed by Overland Charters, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/15/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2022
41 41 motion Protective Order Mon 03/14 9:29 AM
Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information by Defendant Overland Charters, Inc..(Paul, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Stipulated Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information
Monday, February 28, 2022
40 40 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 02/28 4:27 PM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 28 February 2022. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Request for Production Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR. 6.1(a) (Dkt. #38 ), which was docketed as a motion rather than a stipulation, is GRANTED. Defendant's responses and objections to Plaintiff's requests for production are due on or before March 14, 2022. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Extension of Time Mon 02/28 12:18 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Request for Production Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR. 6.1(a) by Defendant Overland Charters, Inc.. (Paul, Steven)
Related: [-]
order Memorandum Mon 02/28 3:51 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding38 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Request for Production Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR. 6.1(a) filed by Overland Charters, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/28/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
37 37 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 01/12 3:46 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/12/2022. Joint Status Report due by 6/10/2022. FTR: Courtroom C203. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
36 36 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Fri 01/07 3:35 PM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 7 January 2022. Finding good cause, it is hereby ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion to Modify the Modify the Current Deadlines in the Scheduling Order Dated June 17, 2021 (Dkt. #34 ) is GRANTED. The deadlines in the Scheduling Order are amended as follows: Discovery due by 7/29/2022. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER.(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 06, 2022
34 34 motion Amend/Correct/Modify Thu 01/06 3:07 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify33 Scheduling Order by Defendants Overland Charters, Inc., Douglas Watson, Counter Claimant Douglas Watson. (Paul, Steven)
Related: [-]
order Memorandum Thu 01/06 3:45 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding34 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify33 Scheduling Order filed by Overland Charters, Inc., Douglas Watson. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/6/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 17, 2021
33 33 order Scheduling Order Thu 06/17 2:30 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 6/17/2021. (slibi, )
Related: [-]
32 32 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 06/17 2:30 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/17/2021. Discovery due by 4/30/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2022. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/12/2022 02:00 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. FTR: Courtroom C203. (slibi, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 10, 2021
31 31 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 06/10 3:26 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Susan L. Rhiel. (Sears, Lance)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 04, 2021
30 30 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Fri 06/04 8:42 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Susan L. Rhiel All parties do not consent.. (Sears, Lance)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
29 29 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Mon 05/24 9:10 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel R. Volkema on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Daniel R. Volkema added to party Karen Keys(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel R. Volkema added to party Susan L. Rhiel(pty:pla) (Volkema, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 14, 2021
28 28 answer Answer/Reply to Counterclaim Fri 05/14 11:25 AM
Counterclaim Defendant's ANSWER/REPLY to21 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Attorney Kathleen Jo Johnson added to party Susan L. Rhiel(pty:cd) by Susan L. Rhiel.(Johnson, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
27 27 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/13 10:48 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 13 May 2021. At the request of the parties, it is HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling/Planning Conference set for June 1, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET for June 17, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. The proposed Scheduling Order shall be filed on or before June 10, 2021. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 07, 2021
26 26 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/07 1:33 PM
Defendant Overland Charters, Inc.'s ANSWER to1 Complaint by Overland Charters, Inc..(Paul, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 04/26 9:22 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 26 April 2021. It is HEREBY ORDERED that the Unopposed Stipulated Motion to Continue theScheduling/Planning Conference Set for April 28, 2021 at 2:30 p.m., Dkt. #23 , is GRANTED. The Scheduling/Planning Conference set on April 28, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. is VACATED and RESET on June 1, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
24 24 order Memorandum Mon 04/26 6:57 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding23 Unopposed MOTION to Continue the Scheduling/Planning Conference set for April 28, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. filed by Overland Charters, Inc., Douglas Watson. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/26/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 22, 2021
23 23 motion Continue Thu 04/22 5:07 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue the Scheduling/Planning Conference set for April 28, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. by Defendants Overland Charters, Inc., Douglas Watson, Counter Claimant Douglas Watson. (Paul, Steven)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 04/22 7:53 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Limited for Cross Claims by Joseph Paul LoRusso on behalf of Douglas WatsonAttorney Joseph Paul LoRusso added to party Douglas Watson(pty:cc) (LoRusso, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Tue 04/20 4:58 PM
Defendant Douglas Watson's ANSWER to1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand Attorney Steven Jon Paul added to party Douglas Watson(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Douglas Watson by Douglas Watson.(Paul, Steven)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Minute Order Tue 04/20 10:31 AM
MINUTE ORDER The Scheduling Conference set on April 28, 2021 at 2:30 PM shall be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/20/2021. Text Only Entry. (slibi, )
Related: [-]
19 19 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Tue 04/20 8:49 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Susan L. Rhiel. Overland Charters, Inc. waiver sent on 4/8/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Sears, Lance)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 04/08 10:14 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 8 April 2021.It is HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Overland Charters, Inc, Dkt. #16 , is GRANTED, finding good cause shown.The deadline for Plaintiff to serve Defendant Overland Charters, Inc. is extended to May 7, 2021. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
17 17 order Memorandum Thu 04/08 6:36 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding16 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Overland Charters, Inc. filed by Susan L. Rhiel. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/8/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
16 16 motion Extension of Time Wed 04/07 4:07 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Overland Charters, Inc. by Plaintiff Susan L. Rhiel.(Sears, Lance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Monday, April 05, 2021
15 15 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Mon 04/05 12:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Keys. Douglas Watson served on 3/16/2021, answer due 4/20/2021.(Sears, Lance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Mon 04/05 8:57 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 5 April 2021. It is HEREBY ORDERED that Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to the Complaint, Dkt. #12 , is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant Douglas Watson to file a response to the Complaint is extended to April 20, 2021. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
13 13 order Memorandum Mon 04/05 6:52 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding12 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint filed by Overland Charters, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/5/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 02, 2021
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Fri 04/02 4:28 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint by Defendant Overland Charters, Inc.. (Paul, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Thu 03/11 4:38 PM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11 March 2021. It is HEREBY ORDERED that Motion to Reschedule Scheduling/Planning Conference, Dkt. #8 , is GRANTED. The Scheduling/Planning Conference set on March 18, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET on April 28, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Thu 03/11 4:34 PM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11 March 2021. It is HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Susan L. Rhiel, Trustee in Bankruptcy, as the Party Plaintiff Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 25(C) and Motion to Amend Caption, Dkt. #7 , is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Susan L. Rhiel, Trustee in Bankruptcy, is substituted as the party Plaintiff in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the caption be amended to reflect Susan L. Rhiel, Trustee in Bankruptcy, as the party Plaintiff. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
9 9 order Memorandum Thu 03/11 11:24 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding7 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Karen Keys,8 MOTION to Continue Scheduling/Planning Conference filed by Karen Keys. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/11/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Continue Thu 03/11 11:06 AM
MOTION to Continue Scheduling/Planning Conference by Plaintiff Karen Keys.(Sears, Lance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) proposed Order
7 7 motion Substitute Party Thu 03/11 10:51 AM
MOTION to Substitute Party by Plaintiff Karen Keys.(Sears, Lance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) proposed Order
6 6 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 03/11 7:25 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Magistrate Judge Neureiter is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/11/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
5 5 misc Letter Reassigning Case Wed 03/10 2:55 PM
CASE REASSIGNED. The deadline to file the Magistrate Consent form has elapsed. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-00060-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2021
4 4 3 pgs order Order Mon 01/11 8:59 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11 January 2021. Consent Form due by 3/4/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/11/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) Modified to correct entry on 1/11/2021 (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 08, 2021
3 3 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Fri 01/08 2:47 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jtorr, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 01/08 2:46 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/08 2:12 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7663290)Attorney Lance M. Sears added to party Karen Keys(pty:pla), filed by Karen Keys.(Sears, Lance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet