California Northern District Court
Judge:Beth Labson Freeman
Referred: Virginia K Demarchi
Case #: 5:21-cv-00071
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2021
Re-opened:Jun 02, 2020
Terminated:Apr 18, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jul 05, 2021 3:16 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank N.A
101 N. Phillips Avenue
Sioux Falls, SD 57104
Represented By
Paul Berkowitz
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter Hampton LLP
contact info
Thomas Roy Kaufman
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Jason Patrick Brown
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Objector
Kirk E Fyson
Gray & Associates, P.C. 11500 West Olympic Blvd Suite 400
Los Angeles, CA 90064
Represented By
Marc Alan Silverman
Frank Weinberg Black, P.L.
contact info
Robert David Soloff
Robert D. Soloff, P.A.
contact info
Justin Swidler
Swartz Swidler, LLC
contact info
Nancy E Gray
Gray And Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Patricia Barreras
Represented By
Joshua H. Haffner
Haffner Law PC
contact info
Graham Gordon Lambert
Haffner Law PC
contact info
Paul Daniel Stevens
Stevens Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacqueline F. Ibarra
Represented By
Joshua H. Haffner
Haffner Law PC
contact info
Eileen B. Goldsmith
Alshuler Berzon LLP
contact info
Graham Gordon Lambert
Haffner Law PC
contact info
Paul Daniel Stevens
Stevens Lc
contact info
Michael Rubin
Altshuler Berzon LLP
contact info

GPO Jul 19 2017
PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Judge Percy Anderson. (mrgo)
GPO May 08 2018
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW signed by Judge Percy Anderson. (See document for details) (mrgo)
GPO May 08 2018
JUDGMENT by Judge Percy Anderson, in favor of Jacqueline F. Ibarra against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Related to: Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law 50. The Certified Class is awarded $97,284,817.91 in damages; and Plaintiff is entitled to recover her costs of suit. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mrgo)
GPO Apr 01 2021
ied on 4/1/2021 (blflc1S, COURT STAFF). ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/1/2021. Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-06220-BLF, 5:21-cv-00071-BLF(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2021) Modif
GPO Sep 14 2021
ORDER DENYING 125 MOTION TO INTERVENE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/14/2021. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2021) Modified on 9/14/2021 (blflc1S, COURT STAFF).
GPO Dec 08 2021
ed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/8/2021. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2021)ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES; AND ADDRESSING OBJECTION OF CLASS MEMBER KIRK E. FYSON. Sign

Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, November 03, 2022
141 141 1 pgs appeal USCA Mandate Thu 11/03 7:45 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to136 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Kirk E. Fyson. The judgment of this Court, entered October 12, 2022, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]