Patricia Barreras v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Labson Freeman |
Referred: | Virginia K Demarchi |
Case #: | 5:21-cv-00071 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2021 |
Re-opened: | Jun 02, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 05, 2021 3:16 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank N.A
101 N. Phillips Avenue
Sioux Falls, SD 57104 |
Represented By
|
Objector
Kirk E Fyson
Gray & Associates, P.C. 11500 West Olympic Blvd Suite 400
Los Angeles, CA 90064 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Barreras
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacqueline F. Ibarra
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, November 03, 2022 | ||
141 | 141
![]() MANDATE of USCA as to136 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Kirk E. Fyson. The judgment of this Court, entered October 12, 2022, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (bw, COURT STAFF) |