New Jersey District Court
Case #: 1:20-cr-01058
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Jan 10, 2021 2:26 AM EST
Defendant
ERICK BELL (1)
Represented By
LORI M. KOCH
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
GABRIEL JOHN VIDONI
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info
SARA FRANCES MERIN
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/10/2021 2:40 AM EST
Monday, March 09, 2020
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to ERICK BELL (1). (nar) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
3 3 Order to Seal Case as to ERICK BELL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/9/20. (nar) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
Arrest of ERICK BELL (nar) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
4 4 Order to Unseal Case as to ERICK BELL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/10/20. (nar) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to ERICK BELL. LORI M. KOCH for ERICK BELL appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 3/10/20. (nar) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by ERICK BELL (nar) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to ERICK BELL (1) 50000 Unsecured (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 3/10/20. (nar) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
9 9 Unsecured Appearance Bond Entered as to ERICK BELL in amount of $50,000, (nar) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams:Initial Appearance as to ERICK BELL held on 3/10/2020. Hearing on application by defendant for appointment of counsel. Financial Affidavit executed and filed. Ordered Lori Koch, AFPD appointed for defendant. Defendant waives preliminary hearing. Order for Continuance executed on the record excluding time under the Speedy Trial Act from 3/10/20 through 5/6/20. Hearing on application for bail. Ordered application granted, bail set in amount of $50,000 unsecured with cosigner. Orders to be entered. Ordered defendant released after processing. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (nar, ) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ERICK BELL Time excluded from 3/10/20 until 5/6/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 3/10/20. (nar) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 12, 2020
12 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct8 Order Setting Conditions of Release to delete home incarceration and location monitoring by ERICK BELL.(KOCH, LORI) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in support of bail amendment,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order amending bail
Friday, March 13, 2020
13 13 An In-Person Hearing to address Defendant's12 Motion to Amend Order Setting Conditions of Release will be held on 4/2/2020 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3C. The Defendant must be present for this hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/13/2020. (se, ) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2020
16 16 STANDING ORDER 20-3 (CORVID 19) re: SO 20-2, excluding Speedy Trial time, under 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A), from March 16, 2020 through April 30, 2020 in all criminal proceedings in this District under the Speedy Trial Act, including those proceedings commenced by complaint and time limits established by the Interstate Agreement of Detainers, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/16/2020. (se, ) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
Set/Reset Deadlines in case as to ERICK BELL12 MOTION to Amend/Correct8 Order Setting Conditions of Release to delete home incarceration and location monitoring. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2020 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. All parties shall dial 1-888-684-8852, Access Code: 1488577# to be connected to the call. (nar) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ERICK BELL. Time excluded from 3/16/2020 until 4/30/2020. Per STANDING ORDER 20-02. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/16/2020. (se, ) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
15 15 ORDER For the reasons set forth on the record during the March 18, 2020 On the Record Telephone Motion Hearing re12 Defendant's Motion to Amend/Correct Conditions of Bail as to ERICK BELL, the Motion is hereby DENIED. Conditions of bail previously set by Order dated March 10, 2020 shall continue. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 3/18/20. (nar) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2020
17 17 STANDING ORDER #2020-06 In Re: Video Conferencing and Teleconferencing for Criminal Proceedings under the CARE ACT. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/30/2020. (se, ) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2020
18 18 STANDING ORDER #2020-09 In Re: Court Operations under the exigent circumstances created by COVID-19, Modifications of Standing Orders 2020-02, 2020-03 & 2020-04 extending deadlines, excluding certain periods under the Speedy Trial Act, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/17/2020. (se, ) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 05, 2020
19 19 MOTION for Return of Property/PreTrial and Amend Release Conditions by ERICK BELL.(KOCH, LORI) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
20 20 ORDER Amending Conditions of Release as to ERICK BELL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/13/20. (nar) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
21 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams:Motion Hearing as to ERICK BELL held on 5/13/2020 by Videoconference re19 MOTION to Amend Release Conditions filed by ERICK BELL. Order Amending Conditions of Release to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR) (nar) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2020
23 23 STANDING ORDER 2020-12 In Re: Court operations under the exigent circumstances created by COVID-19, supersession of Standing Orders 2020-02, 2020-03, 2020-04, and 2020-09. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/22/2020. (se, ) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
22 22 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER as to ERICK BELL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 5/26/2020. (se, ) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
24 24 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ERICK BELL. Time excluded from 6/9/2020 until 8/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/9/2020. (se, ) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
25 25 EXTENSION OF STANDING ORDER 2020-12: In Re: Court Operations under the exigent circumstances created by COVID-19. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/17/2020. (se, ) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
26 26 SECOND EXTENSION OF STANDING ORDER 2020-12 IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID 19. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/23/2020. (se, ) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
27 27 SECOND EXTENSION OF AMENDED STANDING ORDER 2020-06 IN RE: VIDEO CONFERENCING & TELECONFERENCING FOR CRIMINAL PROCEEDINGS UNDER THE CARES ACT. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/23/2020. (se, ) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2020
28 28 Letter from defendant requesting curfew amendment (KOCH, LORI) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
29 29 ORDER Modifying Conditions of Release as to ERICK BELL (1) 50000 Unsecured (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/16/20. (nar) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 10, 2020
30 30 Letter from defendant submitting proposed bail amendment (KOCH, LORI) [1:20-mj-02030-JS]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2020
Counts added: ERICK BELL (1) count(s) 2 (Modified on 12/14/2020 - Count 2 in Information filed on 12/11/2020 was not added when case opened) (bf).
Related: [-]
31 31 INFORMATION as to ERICK BELL (1) count(s) 1. (mb, )
Related: [-]
32 32 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by ERICK BELL (mb, )
Related: [-]
33 33 ORDER REGARDING USE OF VIDEO CONFERENCING/TELECONFERENCINGFOR FELONY PLEAS AND/OR SENTENCINGS as to ERICK BELL. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 12/11/20. (mb, )
Related: [-]
34 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Renee Marie Bumb: Deft. consents to proceed with plea hearing via video conference; Order enteredInitial Appearance, Plea Agreement Hearing as to ERICK BELL held on 12/11/2020, Plea entered by ERICK BELL (1) Guilty Count 1,2., ( Sentencing set for 4/12/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Renee Marie Bumb.) Order bail continued (Court Reporter/Recorder Karen Friedlander.) (mb, )
Related: [-]
35 35 APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to ERICK BELL. (mb, )
Related: [-]
36 36 PLEA AGREEMENT as to ERICK BELL (mb, )
Related: [-]