North Carolina Middle District Court
Judge:Loretta C Biggs
Referred: L Patrick Auld
Case #: 1:21-cv-00033
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2021
Terminated:Jan 12, 2023
Case in other court:Illinois Northern, 1:20-cv-02985
Last checked: Sunday Jul 11, 2021 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
XPO LOGISTICS, INC.
Represented By
John Casey Leech
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
DAVID C. WRIGHT, III
Robinson Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A.
contact info
DOUGLAS MARSHALL JARRELL
Robinson Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A.
contact info
Jody Wilner Moran
Jackson Lewis P.C. (chicago)
contact info
Plaintiff
BRUNO SANZI
Represented By
JAMIE S. FRANKLIN
Law Offices Of Chicago-Kent
contact info
Jamie S. Franklin
Law Offices Of Chicago-Kent
contact info
ANGELA NEWELL GRAY
Gray Newell Thomas, LLP
contact info

GPO Dec 18 2020
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: The Court grants Defendant's motion to transfer (Dkt. 11). The Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this action to the Middle District of North Carolina. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 12/18/2020. (See attached Order for further detail.)Mailed notice. (dm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/12/2021.]
GPO Mar 02 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 3/2/2022; that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Title VII Discrimination Claim in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6), (ECF No. 36), is DENIED. (Sheets, Jamie)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, January 12, 2023
97 97 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 01/12 10:48 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by BRUNO SANZI. (GRAY, ANGELA)
Related: [-]