Iowa Southern District Court
Case #: 4:20-cr-00212
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 13, 2021 1:26 AM CST
Defendant
Abraham Christopher Smith (1)
Represented By
Nicholas A. Sarcone
Stowers & Sarcone PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Adam J. Kerndt
United States Attorney'S Office - Dsm
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/14/2021 8:32 PM CDT
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
Judge update in case as to Abraham Christopher Smith. Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer added. (mel) [4:20-mj-00784-CFB]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Abraham Christopher Smith. (pll) [4:20-mj-00784-CFB]
Related: [-]
1 1 1 pgs COMPLAINT by USA, signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer as to Abraham Christopher Smith (1). (mel) [4:20-mj-00784-CFB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 8 pgs Affidavit
4 4 TEXT ORDER as to Abraham Christopher Smith. Initial Appearance set for 12/10/2020 02:30 PM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South via Video Proceeding with Polk County Jail before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 12/9/2020. (pll) [4:20-mj-00784-CFB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 10, 2020
5 5 Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed on 12/9/2020 in case as to Abraham Christopher Smith. (pll) [4:20-mj-00784-CFB]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer: Initial Appearance as to Defendant Abraham Christopher Smith held on 12/10/2020. Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing set for 12/15/2020 at 03:30 PM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South - Video Proceeding before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (kmp) [4:20-mj-00784-CFB]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to Abraham Christopher Smith. (kmp) [4:20-mj-00784-CFB]
Related: [-]
8 8 RULE 5 ORDER as to Abraham Christopher Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 12/10/2020. (kmp) [4:20-mj-00784-CFB]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF TEMPRORARY DETENTION AND SCHEDULING A DETENTION/PRELIMINARY HEARING as to Abraham Christopher Smith. Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing set for 12/15/2020 at 03:30 PM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South - Video Proceeding before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 12/10/2020. (kmp) [4:20-mj-00784-CFB]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Retained Counsel Nicholas A. Sarcone appearing for Abraham Christopher Smith (Sarcone, Nicholas) [4:20-mj-00784-CFB]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2020
11 11 Bail/Bond Report (Sealed) as to Abraham Christopher Smith. (Davidson, Priscilla) [4:20-mj-00784-CFB]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2020
Judge update in case as to Abraham Christopher Smith. Judge Stephanie M. Rose and Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer added. (mel)
Related: [-]