Original Case: 1:19-cv-11569

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv-00046
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2021
Terminated:Apr 20, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 21, 2021 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Skandinaviska Enskilda Banken AB
Defendant - Appellee
Floksam Omsesidig Livforsakring
Represented By
Benjamin Gruenstein
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Timothy G. Cameron
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Skatteverket
Represented By
Susan Grace
White & Case LLP
contact info
Nicole E. Erb
White & Case LLP
contact info
Claire DeLelle
White & Case LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Finansinspektionen
Represented By
Susan Grace
White & Case LLP
contact info
Nicole E. Erb
White & Case LLP
contact info
Claire DeLelle
White & Case LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Jens Henriksson
Represented By
William Anthony Burck
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Christopher Daniel Kercher
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Alexander Hale Loomis
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Katrin Westling Palm
Represented By
Susan Grace
White & Case LLP
contact info
Nicole E. Erb
White & Case LLP
contact info
Claire DeLelle
White & Case LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Erik Thedeen
Represented By
Susan Grace
White & Case LLP
contact info
Nicole E. Erb
White & Case LLP
contact info
Claire DeLelle
White & Case LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Swedbank AB
Represented By
William Anthony Burck
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Christopher Daniel Kercher
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Alexander Hale Loomis
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Skandinaviska Enskilda Banken AB
Represented By
Brian S. Weinstein
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Victor Carlstrom
Represented By
Joshua L. Dratel
Joshua L. Dratel, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Stephen Brune
Represented By
Joshua L. Dratel
Joshua L. Dratel, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Vinacossa Enterprises AB
Represented By
Joshua L. Dratel
Joshua L. Dratel, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Vinacossa Enterprises Ltd
Represented By
Joshua L. Dratel
Joshua L. Dratel, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Boflexibilitet Sverige AB
Represented By
Joshua L. Dratel
Joshua L. Dratel, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
SBS Resurs Direkt AB
Represented By
Joshua L. Dratel
Joshua L. Dratel, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Sparflex AB
Represented By
Joshua L. Dratel
Joshua L. Dratel, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/21/2021 4:26 AM EDT
Friday, January 08, 2021
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Boflexibilitet Sverige AB, Stephen Brune, Victor Carlstrom, SBS Resurs Direkt AB, Sparflex AB, Vinacossa Enterprises AB and Vinacossa Enterprises Ltd, FILED. [3010586] [21-46] [Entered: 01/11/2021 01:27 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 15 pgs Case FILED
2 2 23 pgs DISTRICT COURT CORRECTED OPINION AND ORDER, dated 12/14/2020, RECEIVED.[3010593] [21-46] [Entered: 01/11/2021 01:29 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs DISTRICT COURT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 01/05/2021, RECEIVED.[3010595] [21-46] [Entered: 01/11/2021 01:30 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Boflexibilitet Sverige AB, Stephen Brune, Victor Carlstrom, SBS Resurs Direkt AB, Sparflex AB, Vinacossa Enterprises AB and Vinacossa Enterprises Ltd, district court receipt # ANYSDC-23419012, FILED.[3010600] [21-46] [Entered: 01/11/2021 01:32 PM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3010602] [21-46] [Entered: 01/11/2021 01:32 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 16 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED