Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-20305

Georgia Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michele J Kim
Case #: 2:21-ap-02001
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2021
Terminated:Apr 05, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
BRE IMC ADAC, LLC
800 Kennesaw Ave., Suite 400
Marietta, GA 30060
Represented By
BRE IMC ADAC, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Michael Souther, Trustee
P O Box 978
Brunswick, GA 31521
Represented By
R. Michael Souther
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Monday, January 10, 2022
court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC Auto) Mon 01/10 7:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by RC. Receipt Number 537064. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 05, 2021
7 7 court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/05 10:58 AM
Adversary Case 2:21-ap-2001 Closed (RAF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 02/04 12:57 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5
Monday, February 01, 2021
5 5 order Judgment/Default Judgment Mon 02/01 4:37 PM
Consent Judgment Filed on 2/1/2021. (RAF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
4 4 trustee Request to Defer Payment of Filing Fee in AP by Trustee Tue 01/12 1:28 PM
Trustee's Notice of Deferral of Filing Fee in Adversary Case 21-02001 MJK . Filed by R. Michael Souther, Trustee on behalf of R. Michael Souther, Trustee (Souther, Trustee, R.)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.1 Tue 01/12 1:26 PM
Local Rule 7.1.1 Disclosure Statement Filed by R. Michael Souther, Trustee on behalf of R. Michael Souther, Trustee Related [+] (Souther, Trustee, R.)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet (B1040) Tue 01/12 1:22 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by R. Michael Souther, Trustee on behalf of R. Michael Souther, Trustee Related [+] (Souther, Trustee, R.)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/12 1:20 PM
Adversary case 21-02001 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by R. Michael Souther, Trustee against BRE IMC ADAC, LLC. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount $350 (Souther, Trustee, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Consent Judgment