Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:14-bk-11477
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Aug 15, 2014
Claims Deadline:Nov 17, 2014
Terminated:Feb 07, 2018
Plan Confirmed:Jan 12, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
PSL - North America LLC
13092 Seaplane Rd
Bay St Louis, MS 39520-9089
Represented By
William A. Romanowicz
contact info
Amanda R. Steele
Richards, Layton And Finger
contact info
Joseph Charles Barsalona II
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
John Henry Knight
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Paul Noble Heath
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Tyler D. Semmelman
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC
www.epiqsystems.com 757 Third Ave Third Floor
New York, NY 10017
Liquidating Trustee
Liquidating Trustee
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Jane M. Leamy
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Jane M. Leamy
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info


1. PSL Units File for Bankruptcy With Plan to Sell Assets (bloomberg.com)
Submitted Mon 06/16/2014
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 23, 2018
645 645 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Wed 05/23 9:55 AM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Cynthia S. McMenamin Regarding Post-Confirmation Report for the Reporting Period Ending 2/6/18 Related [+] Filed by PSL - North America LLC. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-] 644