California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Stephen L Johnson
Case #: 5:14-bk-52564
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Jul 17, 2014
Claims Deadline:Aug 14, 2015
Terminated:Apr 08, 2020

Debtor
San Jose Repertory Theatre
101 Paseo de San Antonio
San Jose, CA 95113-2603
Represented By
Charles B. Greene
Law Offices Of Charles B. Greene
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Mohamed Poonja
P.O. Box 1510
Los Altos, CA 94023
Represented By
Gregg S. Kleiner
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Diana D. Herman
Mckenna Long And Aldridge LLP
contact info
Mohamed Poonja
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ
U.S. Federal Bldg. 280 S 1st St. #268
San Jose, CA 95113

Docket last updated: 06/16/2014 11:39 AM PDT
Friday, June 13, 2014
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 14-52564 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt number 22722539, amount $ 335.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 07/17/2014 at 11:00 AM at San Jose Room 130. (Greene, Charles)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $335. Filed by San Jose Repertory Theatre. Incomplete Filings due by 06/27/2014. Section 521 Filings due by 07/28/2014. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 06/27/2014. (Greene, Charles)
Related: [-]