Flitways Technology Inc.
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Erik P Kimball |
Case #: | 9:21-bk-10317 |
Case Filed: | Jan 14, 2021 |
Claims Deadline: | Mar 25, 2021 |
Dismissed: | Jul 15, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 17, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Flitways Technology Inc.
15711 Cedar Grove Ln
Wellington, FL 33414-6312 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 17, 2021 | ||
90 | 90
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 08/17 1:00 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Fleurimond, Lucie) |