Shidelerosa, LLLP et al v. Ursa Operating Company, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12065
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12065
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:21-ap-50049 |
Nature of Suit | 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Ursa Operating Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shidelerosa, LLLP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shideler Energy Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 06, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Queroli, David) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Motion to Intervene (Administrative Agent's Motion to Intervene) Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Knight, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
26 | 26
![]() Notice of Appearance. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Knight, John) |
|
misc
Add Attorney
Tue 11/05 11:28 PM
Attorney Amanda R. Steele and John Henry Knight for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, David T Queroli and John Henry Knight for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Ana Alfonso and John Henry Knight for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Peter Friedman and John Henry Knight for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Craig McAllister and John Henry Knight for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association added to case Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Knight, John) |
||
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by Shideler Energy Company, LLC, Shidelerosa, LLLP (Sawczuk, Maria) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by Ursa Operating Company, LLC Mediation due date: 10/15/2024. (Lambe, Christopher) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Order Approving Joint Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline. Order Signed on 6/10/2024. (JMW) |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Certification of Counsel Submitting Joint Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline Filed by Ursa Operating Company, LLC. (Enos, Kenneth) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Certification of Counsel Submitting Joint Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline Filed by Ursa Operating Company, LLC. (Enos, Kenneth) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Certificate of Service Regarding Initial Disclosures Filed by Ursa Operating Company, LLC. (Lambe, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Notice of Service of Discovery (initial disclosures) Filed by Shideler Energy Company, LLC, Shidelerosa, LLLP (Sawczuk, Maria) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Scheduling Order The case judge is Brendan Linehan Shannon. Signed on 5/20/2024. (REB) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, May 14, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Ursa Operating Company LLC. (Enos, Kenneth) |
|
Monday, May 13, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Airport Land Partners, Ltd., John Anderson, Fernando Jose Arroyo, Barrett D. Baker, Bar Seven L, LLC, Allen Byerley, Carol Bennett Family Trust, Richard N. Casey, Alice Colton, Don Colton, Gregg Colton, Daniels Petroleum Company, Mary Ruth Dedisse, Vernon P. Dedisse, Jr., Divide Creek Enterprises LLC, Energy Investments, Inc., Hunter Family Limited Partnership, Christine Jones, Jerry D. Jones, Juhan Fordham Minerals, LLC, Juhan, LP, Juhan-Ray, LLC, Peter Langegger, Laramide Geosciences, LLC, Thomas D. Lawson, Fred Limbach, Nanci Limbach, Paul Limbach, MAP2003-NET, MAP2004-OK, MAP99A-NET, Stacie Anderson Malone, Kristine M. Peterson, Michael Pinnell, Pioneer Oil and Gas, Kelly Anderson Rinehart, Roy Royalty, Inc., Sharon Salgado, Jason Alan Scott, Joseph Edward Scott, Rebecca P. Scott, Shideler Energy Company, LLC, Shidelerosa, LLLP, Patrick L. Shuster, Toni M. Shuster, The City of Rifle Colorado, Titan Energy Resources Corporation, Brett James Watson, Diana K. Watson, EvaDean Watson, James L. Watson, Lee Watson, Velma Weinreis. (Sawczuk, Maria) |
|
Monday, June 06, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Status Report dated June 6, 2022 Filed by Airport Land Partners, Ltd., John Anderson, Fernando Jose Arroyo, Barrett D. Baker, Bar Seven L, LLC, Allen Byerley, Carol Bennett Family Trust, Richard N. Casey, Alice Colton, Don Colton, Gregg Colton, Daniels Petroleum Company, Mary Ruth Dedisse, Vernon P. Dedisse, Jr., Divide Creek Enterprises LLC, Energy Investments, Inc., Hunter Family Limited Partnership, Christine Jones, Jerry D. Jones, Juhan Fordham Minerals, LLC, Juhan, LP, Juhan-Ray, LLC, Peter Langegger, Laramide Geosciences, LLC, Thomas D. Lawson, Fred Limbach, Nanci Limbach, Paul Limbach, MAP2003-NET, MAP2004-OK, MAP99A-NET, Stacie Anderson Malone, Kristine M. Peterson, Michael Pinnell, Pioneer Oil and Gas, Kelly Anderson Rinehart, Roy Royalty, Inc., Sharon Salgado, Jason Alan Scott, Joseph Edward Scott, Rebecca P. Scott, Shideler Energy Company, LLC, Shidelerosa, LLLP, Patrick L. Shuster, Toni M. Shuster, The City of Rifle Colorado, Titan Energy Resources Corporation, Brett James Watson, Diana K. Watson, EvaDean Watson, James L. Watson, Lee Watson, Velma Weinreis. (Sawczuk, Maria) |
|
Monday, May 16, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Notice and Order of Request for Status Report with Certificate of Service. Status Report due by 6/6/2022. Signed on 5/16/2022. (LCN) |
|
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Ursa Operating Company LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/16/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mulvihill, Joseph) |
|
Monday, May 17, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Ursa Operating Company LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mulvihill, Joseph) |
|
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Shunte Jones Regarding Order Sustaining Debtors Second (2nd) Omnibus (Substantive) Objection to Claims, and (Hearing Cancelled) Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Remote Hearing on April 21, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. (ET) . Filed by Prime Clerk LLC. (Malo, David) |
|
Tuesday, April 20, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Ursa Operating Company LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/21/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mulvihill, Joseph) |
|
Monday, April 19, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Ursa Operating Company LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/21/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mulvihill, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, April 15, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Order (I) Denying the Royalty Claimants' Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal; and (II) Entering 21 Day Courtesy Stay. Signed on 4/14/2021 (LCN) |
|
Wednesday, April 07, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Shunte Jones Regarding Order Regarding Certain Royalty Claimants and Sustaining the Debtors First Omnibus Objection to Certain Proofs of Claim [Docket No. 18, Case No. 20-12067 . Filed by Prime Clerk LLC. (Malo, David) |
|
Tuesday, March 30, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order Regarding Certain Royalty Claimants and Sustaining the Debtors' First Omnibus Objection to Certain Proofs of Claim Order Signed on 3/30/2021. (JMW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Proposed Orders Regarding Certain Royalty Claimants and Sustaining the Debtors' First Omnibus Objection to Certain Proofs of Claim Filed by Ursa Operating Company LLC. (Mulvihill, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Hearing Originally Scheduled for 2/17/21 has been rescheduled. Filed by Ursa Piceance Holdings LLC. Hearing scheduled for 3/8/2021 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mulvihill, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, January 14, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Ursa Operating Company, LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 3/15/2021. (Sawczuk, Maria) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 13, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/13 8:50 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 21-50049 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10127605, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-50049 Complaint by Shidelerosa, LLLP, Shideler Energy Company, LLC against Ursa Operating Company, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)). (Sawczuk, Maria) |