New Jersey District Court
Judge:Robert B Kugler
Referred: Ann Marie Donio
Case #: 1:21-cv-00770
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2021
Terminated:Dec 03, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 13, 2021 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
DEAN WIMER
Represented By
MARY F. PLATT
Fineman Krekstein & Harris PC
contact info
LEE APPLEBAUM
Fineman Krekstein & Harris
contact info
Defendant
INNOVAIRRE HOLDING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By
MARY F. PLATT
Fineman Krekstein & Harris PC
contact info
LEE APPLEBAUM
Fineman Krekstein & Harris
contact info
Notice Only
PHV Melissa B. Carrasco
Plaintiff
MICHAEL KULPINSKY
Represented By
CRAIG M. BONNIST
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
KATERINA ROSE MANTELL
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 24 2021
OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/24/2021. (rtm, )

Docket last updated: 64 minutes ago
Friday, December 03, 2021
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 12/03 12:02 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (dd, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 26, 2021
47 47 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Fri 11/26 8:51 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by MICHAEL KULPINSKY. (MANTELL, KATERINA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 11/10 9:40 AM
Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams no longer assigned to case. (dd, )
Related: [-]
order Order Wed 11/10 2:24 PM
TEXT ORDER: The telephonic initial scheduling conference on 1/6/2022 shall be, and is hereby, RESCHEDULED to 1/14/2022 at 10:30 A.M. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall either be filed on the docket, or alternatively, emailed to njdnef_donio@njd.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/10/2021. (slc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
45 45 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Document Wed 10/27 8:38 AM
ORDER Granting22 Motion to Seal Document; Directing the Clerk to replace exhibit 4 from Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint20 , with exhibit 1 attached to the Motion22 . Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 10/26/2021. (rtm, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
43 43 1 pgs order Order Thu 10/07 3:29 PM
LETTER ORDER Granting42 request for an extension of deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/7/2021. (rtm, )
Related: [-]
order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 10/07 3:59 PM
TEXT ORDER The Court hereby resets the telephone Initial Conference previously set for October 28, 2021 to January 6, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. Until further notice and unless specifically ordered otherwise, all scheduled telephone status conferences and Initial Conferences before the Hon. Karen M. Williams shall occur via teleconference using the Court's conference line. All participants shall dial 1-888-684-8852, Access Code 1488577# to connect to the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/7/21. (nar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
42 42 misc Letter Wed 10/06 2:31 PM
Letter from Mary Platt, Esquire. (PLATT, MARY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
41 41 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 09/22 10:13 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint) against INNOVAIRRE HOLDING COMPANY, LLC, filed by MICHAEL KULPINSKY.(BONNIST, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
40 40 2 pgs order Order Wed 09/15 11:35 AM
ORDER Permitting Plaintiff to file a Second Amended Complaint; ORDERED Plaintiff shall file and serve his Second Amended Complaint within 14 days from the date which Plaintiff's counsel receives this order. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 9/14/2021. (rtm, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
39 39 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Wed 09/08 10:04 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 10/28/2021 03:00 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/8/2021. (rtm, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Wed 09/08 10:06 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (rtm, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
38 38 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 09/07 12:26 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by INNOVAIRRE HOLDING COMPANY, LLC.(PLATT, MARY)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
37 37 misc Stipulation Fri 09/03 10:05 AM
STIPULATION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 15(a)(2) by MICHAEL KULPINSKY.(BONNIST, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
36 36 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 08/24 11:42 AM
ORDER Granting17 Defendant Wimers Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction; Denying18 Defendant Dean Wimer and Defendant Innovairre Holding Companys Motion to Dismiss under the first to file rule and/or stay or transfer. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/24/2021. (rtm, )
Related: [-]
35 35 15 pgs order Opinion Tue 08/24 11:23 AM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/24/2021. (rtm, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 02, 2021
34 34 misc Statement 7.1.1 Third Party Funding Mon 08/02 3:00 PM
Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by INNOVAIRRE HOLDING COMPANY, LLC, DEAN WIMER.(PLATT, MARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, July 09, 2021
33 33 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 07/09 9:16 AM
TEXT ORDER: It appearing that Plaintiff has filed a16 Amended Complaint, the13 and14 Motions to Dismiss are hereby dismissed as moot. SO ORDERED by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 7/9/2021. (lm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 01, 2021
32 32 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/01 6:20 PM
NOTICE by MICHAEL KULPINSKY /Plaintiff's Local Rule 7.1.1 Disclosure (MANTELL, KATERINA)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 28, 2021
31 31 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 06/28 10:42 AM
TEXT ORDER Pursuant to L. CIV. R. 7.1.1 (eff. June 21, 2021), the parties, including intervening parties, are required to file a statement (separate from any pleading) containing specific information regarding third-party litigation funding. See L. Civ. R. 7.1.1(a)(1-3). This statement shall be filed within 45 days of the effective date of this Rule, or no later than August 5, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 6/28/21. (nar)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
30 30 misc Stipulation Mon 06/14 6:27 PM
STIPULATION FOR LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF MICHAEL KULPINSKY TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 15(a)(2) by MICHAEL KULPINSKY.(MANTELL, KATERINA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, May 27, 2021
29 29 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Thu 05/27 9:40 AM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Melissa B. Carrasco, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12499477.) (PLATT, MARY)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Thu 05/27 11:02 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, Melissa B. Carrasco, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Wed 05/26 11:18 AM
Pro Hac Vice fee as to MELISSA B. CARRASCO: $ 150, receipt number CAM012801 (rss, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
28 28 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/19 4:39 PM
ORDER Granting11 Motion for Melissa B. Carrasco, Esquire, Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/19/2021. (rtm, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 01, 2021
27 27 misc Certification Thu 04/01 1:29 PM
Certification of Melissa B. Carrasco, Esquire on behalf of All Defendants Re 26 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear,,,11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. (PLATT, MARY)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
26 26 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/26 5:39 PM
TEXT ORDER Within ten (10) days of the date of this Text Order, the party filing its pro hac vice motion11 shall file an amended certified statement of the applicant "disclosing each bar in which the applicant is a member in good standing including the year of admission and the name and address of the official or office maintaining the roll of such members of its bar " as set forth in the amendment to L. Civ. R. 101.1(c) (1) (eff. March 1, 2010); or in lieu thereof, may attach a certificate of good standing. See www.njd.uscourts.gov/court-info/local-rules-and-orders. Furthermore, the amended certified statement of the applicant shall certify that no disciplinary proceedings are pending against the attorney in any jurisdiction and no discipline has previously been imposed on the attorney in any jurisdiction . See L. Civ. R. 101.1(c) (1). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 3/26/2021. (Kaplan, C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
25 25 misc Letter Tue 03/09 1:58 PM
Letter from Craig Bonnist re Diversity Jurisdiction. (BONNIST, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 08, 2021
24 24 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/08 3:34 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re17 First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ,18 First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (PLATT, MARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/03 2:23 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by MICHAEL KULPINSKY re17 First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ,18 First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint [Corrected D.E. 20](MANTELL, KATERINA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11
22 22 motion Seal Document Wed 03/03 2:07 PM
Consent MOTION to Seal Document20 Response in Opposition to Motion, by MICHAEL KULPINSKY.(MANTELL, KATERINA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Consolidated Motion to Seal,
Att: 2 Declaration of Katerina R. Mantell,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/03 2:48 PM
Set Deadlines as to22 Consent MOTION to Seal Document20 Response in Opposition to Motion, . Motion set for 4/5/2021 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
21 21 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/01 9:51 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by MICHAEL KULPINSKY re17 First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ,18 First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint - Affidavit of Michael Kulpinsky(BONNIST, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B to Kulpinsky Affidavit
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/01 9:50 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by MICHAEL KULPINSKY re17 First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ,18 First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint - Declaration of Craig Bonnist(BONNIST, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 to 11 to Bonnist Declaration
19 19 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/01 9:43 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by MICHAEL KULPINSKY re17 First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ,18 First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (BONNIST, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
18 18 motion Dismiss Tue 02/09 1:11 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by INNOVAIRRE HOLDING COMPANY, LLC. Responses due by 3/1/2021(PLATT, MARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
17 17 motion Dismiss Tue 02/09 1:00 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by DEAN WIMER. Responses due by 3/1/2021(PLATT, MARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/09 1:14 PM
Set Deadlines as to18 First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint . Motion set for 3/15/2021 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/09 2:33 PM
Set Deadlines as to18 First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint . Motion set for 3/15/2021 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 08, 2021
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/08 3:40 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against INNOVAIRRE HOLDING COMPANY, LLC, DEAN WIMER, filed by MICHAEL KULPINSKY.(BONNIST, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
15 15 2 pgs order Order Mon 02/08 1:31 PM
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 2/5/2021. (rss, )
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss Mon 02/08 1:16 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Innovaire Holding Company, LLC by All Defendants. Responses due by 3/1/2021(PLATT, MARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
13 13 motion Dismiss Mon 02/08 12:51 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Dean Wimer by All Defendants. Responses due by 3/1/2021(PLATT, MARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 02/08 1:35 PM
Set Deadlines as to14 First MOTION to Dismiss Innovaire Holding Company, LLC ,13 First MOTION to Dismiss Dean Wimer . Motion set for 3/15/2021 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 05, 2021
12 12 misc Exhibit (to Document) Fri 02/05 2:30 PM
Exhibit to11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Corrected Proposed Form of Order by All Defendants. (PLATT, MARY)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/05 2:00 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Melissa B. Carrasco, Esquire by All Defendants.(PLATT, MARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Notice of Motion,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certification Certification of Counsel in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/05 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LEE APPLEBAUM on behalf of All Defendants (APPLEBAUM, LEE) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/05 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARY F. PLATT on behalf of All Defendants (PLATT, MARY) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/05 2:50 PM
Set Deadlines as to11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Melissa B. Carrasco, Esquire . Motion set for 3/1/2021 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2021
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Fri 01/22 1:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Dean Wimer on January 19, 2021, filed by MICHAEL KULPINSKY. (BONNIST, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Fri 01/22 1:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Registered Agent for Defendant Innovairre Holding Company, LLC on January 21, 2021, filed by MICHAEL KULPINSKY. (BONNIST, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/15 5:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CRAIG M. BONNIST on behalf of MICHAEL KULPINSKY (BONNIST, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 01/15 11:08 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to INNOVAIRRE HOLDING COMPANY, LLC, DEAN WIMER. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pr, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Fri 01/15 11:09 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (pr, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 14, 2021
4 4 service Summons - Request for Issue Thu 01/14 9:58 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by MICHAEL KULPINSKY as to DEAN WIMER. (MANTELL, KATERINA)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons - Request for Issue Thu 01/14 9:56 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by MICHAEL KULPINSKY as to INNOVAIRRE HOLDING COMPANY, LLC a/k/a INNOVAIRRE GLOBAL, LLC. (MANTELL, KATERINA)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/14 9:55 PM
NOTICE by MICHAEL KULPINSKY (CIVIL COVER SHEET) (MANTELL, KATERINA)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/14 9:43 PM
COMPLAINT against INNOVAIRRE HOLDING COMPANY, LLC a/k/a INNOVAIRRE GLOBAL, LLC, DEAN WIMER (Filing and Admin fee $ 402) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MICHAEL KULPINSKY.(MANTELL, KATERINA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 01/15 8:53 AM
Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
Related: [-]