Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Sheryl H Lipman
Referred: Annie T Christoff
Case #: 2:21-cv-02035
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2021
Terminated:Oct 19, 2022

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
90 90 order Judgment Wed 10/19 4:41 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/19/2022. (shl)
Related: [-]
89 89 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/19 3:02 PM
NOTICE by Tevin Odom, Cameron Willingham, Fiona Willingham, Marquee Willingham, Richard Willingham, III Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Timmons, Brice)
Related: [-]
notice Setting Letter Wed 10/19 2:51 PM
SETTING LETTER: A STATUS CONFERENCE has been SET before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman for MONDAY, OCTOBER 24, 2022 at 9:00 A.M. in Courtroom No. 1, 11th floor of the Federal Building, Memphis, Tennessee. (jpw)
Related: [-]