LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY v. HALL et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Carl J Nichols |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-00130 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1335 Interpleader Action |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 14, 2021 5:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
A.V.M. TRUCKING, INC.
|
|
Defendant
ADVANCED COMMERCIAL CAPITAL, INC. ASSIGNEE OF EL MARRO TRANSPORT
|
|
Defendant
ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF AA BROTHERS TRUCKING LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF CRAZY HORSE TRANSPORT LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF DSK TRANSIT LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF FLIGHT LOGISTICS INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF MGS LOGISTICS INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. ASSIGNEE OF WTWM TRANSPORT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. ASSIGNEE OF ACEM TRUCKING GROUP LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. ASSIGNEE OF BMM TRUCKING INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. ASSIGNEE OF E UNITED EXPRESS INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. ASSIGNEE OF J C SPECIALIZED LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ALL FRIGHT CARRIERS INC.
|
|
Defendant
AMERICARS TRANSPORTATION, INC.
|
|
Defendant
AMERITUR, LLC
|
|
Defendant
ANCHOR TRANSPORTATION, LLC
|
|
Defendant
APEX CAPITAL CORP ASSIGNEE OF ALL N TRANSPORT
|
|
Defendant
APEX CAPITAL CORP ASSIGNEE OF USA FREIGHT SERVICE, INC.
|
|
Defendant
ARELLANO TRUCKING INC.
|
|
Defendant
ASA CLAIMS ADMINISTRATION ASSIGNEE OF DNA STATE WIDE, INC.
|
|
Defendant
ASTERIA CORPORATION ASSIGNEE OF V N BROTHERS TRUCKING
|
|
Defendant
BABAK KHAMOUSHIAN
|
|
Defendant
BAHA TRUCKING, LLC
|
|
Defendant
BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF 3 BROTHERS EXPRESS INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF AD FREIGHT INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF AFC TRANSPORT, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF ANGULO TRANSPORTATION SERVICE LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF BPV TRANSPORTS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF EAGLE EXPRESS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF JADA TRANSPORTS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF JUAN P VARGAS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF KANECA INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF LPD TRANSPORTER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF M&G TRUCK LINES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF MITOK EXPRESS INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF NUFY TRANSPORTATION LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF TRANSPORT XKE REGALDO, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF TRUELOVE FAMILY TRUCKING, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF USA EAGLE TRUCKING
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BEHNE INC.
|
|
Defendant
BRIAN E. SMITH
|
|
Defendant
CATALYST LOGISTICS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
COLBY SKILES
|
|
Defendant
COMPASS FUNDING SOLUTIONS LLC ASSIGNEE OF MD PROGROUP INC.
|
|
Defendant
DAM LOGISTICS INC.
|
|
Defendant
DAVIS AND JONES, LLC ASSIGNEE OF KBM ENTERPRISES
|
|
Defendant
DOUBLE C SERVICES LLC
|
|
Defendant
DOUG DAVIDSON TRUCKING LLC
|
|
Defendant
ECAPITAL FACTORING ASSIGNEE OF BEST CHOICE LOGISTICS
|
|
Defendant
ELITE ONE TRANSPORTATION
|
|
Defendant
EXPRESS FREIGHT FINANCE ASSIGNEE OF DERRICO TRUCKING
|
|
Defendant
FAST WAY LLC
|
|
Defendant
FELIX & SONS TRUCKING, LLC
|
|
Defendant
FIRST LINE FUNDING GROUP ASSIGNEE OF NAIVIX TRANSPORT INC.
|
|
Defendant
FIRST LINE FUNDING GROUP ASSIGNEE OF POWER BY LOGISTICS INC.
|
|
Defendant
GENERAL FREIGHT SYSTEM INC.
|
|
Defendant
GOS TRANS, LLC
|
|
Defendant
GUSTAVO SALAZAR LOPEZ
|
|
Defendant
J D FACTORS, LLC ASSIGNEE OF VEKA, INC.
|
|
Defendant
JSP TRANSPORTATION LLC
|
|
Defendant
JUDGE FARM LLC
|
|
Defendant
KOEHN CONTRACTING SERVICE, INC.
|
|
Defendant
LEAD DRIVER LLC
|
|
Defendant
LION TRANS INC.
|
|
Defendant
MARK SPILLMAN
|
|
Defendant
MCENROE LOGISTICS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
MIDWEST ELITE CARRIERS CORP
|
|
Defendant
MOEX LLC
|
|
Defendant
ON MY WAY EXPRESS INC.
|
|
Defendant
OUTSOURCE FINANCIAL ASSIGNEE OF HUENERPRISES LLC
|
|
Defendant
OZZY LOGISTICS, LLC
|
|
Defendant
PHOENIX CAPITAL GROUP, LLC ASSIGNEE OF JBB LOGISTICS LLC
|
|
Defendant
PRO FUNDING INC. ASSIGNEE OF CHAIN HAND LOGISTICS, LLC
|
|
Defendant
QUICK PAY FUNDING ASSIGNEE OF ASL TRANSPORT AND SERVICES, LLC
|
|
Defendant
RLMJ TRANSPORT, LLC
|
|
Defendant
ROBIN LOGISTICS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
RTS FINANCIAL SERVICE ASSIGNEE OF ECLECTIC LOGISTICS
|
|
Defendant
RTS FINANCIAL SERVICE ASSIGNEE OF GT EXPRESS INC.
|
|
Defendant
RTS FINANCIAL SERVICE ASSIGNEE OF STRATAN INC.
|
|
Defendant
RTS FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSIGNEE OF ALL FREIGHT CARRIERS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
RTS FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSIGNEE OF RAFA TRANS INC.
|
|
Defendant
SEVENOAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LLC ASSIGNEE OF JEF XPRESS
|
|
Defendant
SEVENOAKS CAPITAL ASSOCIATES, LLC ASSIGNEE OF ROBLES TRANSPORTATION
|
|
Defendant
SILVER FROG FREIGHT LOGISTICS, LLC
|
|
Defendant
SILVER TRUCKING, LLC
|
|
Defendant
SKY TRANSPORT LLC
|
|
Defendant
STE EXPRESS INC.
|
|
Defendant
SUNBELT FINANCE ASSIGNEE OF DIAMOND STAR TRUCKING INC.
|
|
Defendant
SUNBELT FINANCE ASSIGNEE OF MX6 TRUCKING LLC
|
|
Defendant
SWAT LOGISTICS LLC
|
|
Defendant
TAB BANK ASSIGNEE OF STEIN & SON
|
|
Defendant
TBS FACTORING ASSIGNEE OF ADAM TRUCK LINE
|
|
Defendant
TBS FACTORING ASSIGNEE OF SR TRANSPORTATION
|
|
Defendant
THROUGH TRUCKING LLC
|
|
Defendant
TRANS RECOVERY SOLUTIONS, LLC ASSIGNEE OF RUN DIRECT INC.
|
|
Defendant
TRIUMPH TRANSPORT INC.
|
|
Defendant
TRK GROUP INC.
|
|
Defendant
WARREN C. SAUERS CO., INC.
|
|
Defendant
WEBER TRANSPORT, LLC
|
|
Defendant
WENDELL KEVIN LIN
|
|
Defendant
WEST MOTOR FREIGHT OF PA
|
|
Movant
ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. AN ASSIGNEE OF UA CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
TAYLOR E HALL
Terminated: 06/23/2021
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 12, 2022 | ||
192 | 192
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Motion for Declaratory Judgment
Tue 07/12 9:31 AM
ORDER re Motions186 ,188 , and191 . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 12, 2022. (lccjn1) |