National Rifle Association of America
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Harlin Dewayne Hale |
Case #: | 3:21-bk-30085 |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2021 |
Dismissed: | May 11, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 07, 2021 |
Debtor
National Rifle Association of America, Debtor
11250 Waples Mill Rd
Fairfax, VA 22030-7550 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
National Rifle Association of America
11250 Waples Mill Rd
Fairfax, VA 22030-7550 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Sea Girt, LLC
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 24, 2021 12:03 PM CST |
Creditor
InfoCision Management Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Under Wild Skies
Dycio & Biggs, PC 10533 Main Street
Fairfax, VA 22030 |
|
Creditor
The Bancorp Bank
30 North LaSalle Street, Suite 2320
Chicago, IL 60602 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rickey Schroeder
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Quad/Graphics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mercury Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Member Marketing Partners LLC
Attn: Judith W. Ross 700 N. Pearl Street Suite 1610
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Phillip Journey
420 Throckmorton St, Ste 1000
Fort Worth, TX 76102 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Global New Beginnings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
District of Columbia Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia
400 6th Street, N.W., 9th Floor
Washington, DC 20001 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Denton County
P. O. Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Laurie A. Spindler 2777 N. Stemmons Frwy Suite 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Christopher Cox
1901 L Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Communications Corp of America
13129 Airpark Drive, Suite 120
Elkwood, VA 22718 |
|
Creditor
Ackerman McQueen, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Attorney General of the State of New York
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Severson & Werson, A Professional Corporation
One Embarcadero Center Suite 2600
San Francisco, CA 94111 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202 |
Represented By
|
1. | NRA bankruptcy dismissed: National Rifle Association's Chapter 11 case rejected as not 'in good faith' (chicagotribune.com) |
Submitted Wed 05/12/2021 | |
Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago |