New York Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:20-cr-00580
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2020
Terminated:Jun 27, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 17, 2021 2:26 AM EST
Defendant
Peter Khaim (1)
Represented By
James R. Froccaro
contact info
Defendant
Arkadiy Khaimov (2)
Represented By
Isabelle A. Kirshner
Clayman & Rosenberg
contact info
Wayne Ervin Gosnell, Jr.
Clayman And Rosenberg LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Andrew Estes
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/29/2024 6:21 PM EDT
Friday, December 18, 2020
1 1 23 pgs SEALED INDICTMENT as to Peter Khaim (1) count(s) 1, 2, 7, Arkadiy Khaimov (2) count(s) 1, 2. (Marziliano, August)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Information Sheet,
Att: 2 Sealing Form,
Att: 3 Sealing Cover Sheet