Member Case
Lead case is: 1:21-bk-10036

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:21-bk-10038
Case Filed:Jan 18, 2021
Terminated:Mar 24, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Eagle Hospitality Trust S2 Pte. Ltd.

,
Represented By
G. David Dean
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 71 minutes ago
Friday, March 24, 2023
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 03/24 8:54 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LBr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
8 8 order Final Decree Thu 03/23 4:29 PM
Final Decree and Order Closing Chapter 11 Cases. Order Signed on 3/23/2023 (Mml)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2022
7 7 court Case Reassigned Mon 03/21 8:45 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Karen B. Owens added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (SH)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 20, 2021
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Sat 03/20 12:12 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Eagle Hospitality Trust S2 Pte. Ltd.. (Dean, G.)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Sat 03/20 12:11 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Eagle Hospitality Trust S2 Pte. Ltd.. (Dean, G.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2021
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Fri 01/22 9:13 AM
An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: EHT US1, Inc. (6703); 5151 Wiley Post Way, Salt Lake City, LLC (1455); ASAP Cayman Atlanta Hotel LLC (2088); ASAP Cayman Denver Tech LLC (7531); ASAP Cayman Salt Lake City Hotel LLC (7546); ASAP Salt Lake City Hotel, LLC (7146); Atlanta Hotel Holdings, LLC (6450); CI Hospitality Investment, LLC (7641); Eagle Hospitality Trust S1 Pte Ltd. (7669); Eagle Hospitality Trust S2 Pte Ltd. (7657); EHT Cayman Corp. Ltd. (7656); Sky Harbor Atlanta Northeast, LLC (6450); Sky Harbor Denver Holdco, LLC (6650); Sky Harbor Denver Tech Center, LLC (8303); UCCONT1, LLC (0463); UCF 1, LLC (6406); UCRDH, LLC (2279); UCHIDH, LLC (6497); Urban Commons 4th Street A, LLC (1768); Urban Commons Anaheim HI, LLC (3292); Urban Commons Bayshore A, LLC (2422); Urban Commons Cordova A, LLC (4152); Urban Commons Danbury A, LLC (4388); Urban Commons Highway 111 A, LLC (4497); Urban Commons Queensway, LLC (6882); Urban Commons Riverside Blvd., A, LLC (4661); and USHIL Holdco Member, LLC (4796). The docket in the chapter 11 case of EHT US1, Inc., Case No. 21-10036 (CSS) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 1/21/2021 (DMC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
3 3 motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Tue 01/19 9:38 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by EHT US1, Inc.. (Dean, G.)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Tue 01/19 7:56 AM
Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case (LB)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 18, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 01/18 11:34 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 21-10038 [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number 10132037, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 01/18 9:22 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition of Eagle Hospitality Trust S2 Pte. Ltd. . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Eagle Hospitality Trust S2 Pte. Ltd.. (Dean, G.)
Related: [-]