Washington Western District Court
Judge:Benjamin H Settle
Case #: 3:21-cv-05054
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2021
Terminated:Jun 10, 2022
Case in other court:Clark County Superior Court, 20-00002-02464-06
Last checked: Sunday Jul 18, 2021 1:53 AM PDT
Defendant
Shin-Etsu Handotai America Inc
Represented By
Michael T Garone
Schwabe Williamson & Wyatt (or)
contact info
Plaintiff
Chrystal Reed
Represented By
Leslie Erin Baze
Schuck Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago
Friday, June 10, 2022
27 27 3 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Terminate Case Fri 06/10 9:13 AM
ORDER granting26 Stipulated MOTION. It is ORDERED that this case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorney fees to either party; signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(AMD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
26 26 motion Stipulated Motion Thu 06/09 3:00 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Dismissal with Prejudice , filed by Defendant Shin-Etsu Handotai America Inc. Noting Date 6/9/2022, (Garone, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
utility Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 05/04 10:33 AM
The Court has been notified this case has settled. All pending deadlines and hearings are terminated. Dismissal/Settlement papers are due by 6/17/2022. (DK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
25 25 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 05/03 1:32 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Zoom Final Settlement Conference held on 5/3/2022 before Judge Theresa L Fricke- for Plaintiff: Leslie Baze and Chrystal Reed; for Defendant: Michael Garone and Amy Ellings-Villemyer. HEARING SEALED until 1:09pm; Hearing Unsealed beginning at 1:09pm- parties enter terms of settlement on the record. (GMR)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
24 24 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 05/02 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Final Settlement Conference set for 5/3/2022 at 1:00 PM via Zoom before Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
23 23 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 04/28 12:32 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Zoom Settlement Conference held on 4/27/2022 before Judge Theresa L Fricke- for Plaintiff: Leslie Baze, David Schuck and Chrystal Reed; for Defendant: Michael Garone, Defendant representatives and Lana Zarelsky Blair of Travelers Insurance; day 2 of settlement conference held; conference in recess at 3:00 PM. (GMR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2022
22 22 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 04/26 11:45 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for Zoom Settlement Conference held on 4/21/2022 before Judge Theresa L Fricke- For Plaintiff: Leslie Baze, David Schuck and Chrystal Reed; for Defendant: Michael Garone, Defendant representatives and Lana Zarelsky Blair of Travelers Insurance; Parties agree to continue settlement discussions. Settlement Conference to continue 4/27/2022 at 9:00 AM via Zoom before Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
21 21 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Thu 03/31 12:04 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Amanda Gamblin for Defendant Shin-Etsu Handotai America Inc. (Gamblin, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
20 20 order 1 - Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/22 2:34 PM
ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Settlement Conference set for 4/21/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Theresa L Fricke via Zoom. Settlement memoranda due no later than 1:30 PM on 4/12/2022. Signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (AMD)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2022
19 19 4 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion Mon 03/21 10:57 AM
ORDER granting18 Stipulated MOTION for Judicial Settlement Conference. This matter is referred to the Honorable Theresa L. Fricke, United States Magistrate Judge, for settlement purposes only. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(AMD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Mon 03/21 11:25 AM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke for settlement purposes only, per19 Order. (AMD)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2022
18 18 motion Stipulated Motion Fri 03/18 4:18 PM
Stipulated MOTION and Order for Judicial Settlement Conference , filed by Defendant Shin-Etsu Handotai America Inc. Noting Date 3/18/2022, (Garone, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/28 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Amanda Gamblin on behalf of Defendant Shin-Etsu Handotai America Inc. (Gamblin, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
16 16 order Protective Order Tue 08/31 9:18 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER re15 Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 30, 2021
15 15 misc Proposed Order (Unsigned) Mon 08/30 1:57 PM
PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) (Garone, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 22, 2021
14 14 order BHS Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates (FORM) Thu 07/22 1:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES - *SEVEN DAY* Jury Trial is set for 1/17/2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Joinder of Parties due by 8/23/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/11/2022, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 8/10/2022, Motions due by 8/22/2022, Discovery completed by 9/19/2022, Dispositive motions due by 10/19/2022, Motions in Limine due by 12/12/2022, Pretrial Order due by 12/27/2022, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 12/27/2022, Agreed Neutral Statement of the Case due by 12/27/2022, Deposition Designations due by 12/27/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom E. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
13 13 misc Status Report Tue 07/06 3:16 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT and Stipulated Discovery Plan by Plaintiff Chrystal Reed (Baze, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 06/30 10:27 AM
Deadline reset pursuant to agreement of the parties: Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/19/2021. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 17, 2021
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 05/17 11:27 AM
Deadlines reset pursuant to the agreement of the parties: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/21/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/28/2021, Joint Status Report due by 7/6/2021. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 12, 2021
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 04/12 2:43 PM
Deadlines reset pursuant to the request and agreement of the parties to allow time for mediation. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/20/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/27/2021, Joint Status Report due by 6/3/2021. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Tue 02/09 10:44 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re:1 Notice of Removal, . by Shin-Etsu Handotai America Inc.(Garone, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
11 11 order BHS - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM) Wed 02/03 4:34 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 5/4/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/20/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/27/2021. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 02/01 1:29 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Shin-Etsu Handotai America Inc answer due 2/9/2021. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
9 9 misc Jury Demand Fri 01/29 1:58 PM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Chrystal Reed (Baze, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Related Case Tue 01/26 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) 3:21-cv-05055, by Defendant Shin-Etsu Handotai America Inc. (Garone, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2021
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 01/25 12:51 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant Shin-Etsu Handotai America Inc. Noting Date 1/25/2021, (Garone, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 22, 2021
6 6 notice Notice-Other Fri 01/22 11:17 AM
NOTICE verifying state court filings ; filed by Defendant Shin-Etsu Handotai America Inc.(Garone, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
5 5 utility Notice to Filer Fri 01/22 10:53 AM
NOTICE TO FILER: re1 Notice of Removal - Jury Demand. Notice of Filing Deficiency ** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GMR)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Fri 01/22 10:52 AM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Clark County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GMR)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 01/22 10:51 AM
Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (GMR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
3 3 notice Notice-Other Wed 01/20 12:39 PM
NOTICE to Adverse Party of Removal re1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant Shin-Etsu Handotai America Inc..(Garone, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
2 2 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/19 4:09 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Shin Etsu Handotai Co., LTD for Shin-Etsu Handotai America Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Shin-Etsu Handotai America Inc. (Garone, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 01/19 3:23 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark County Superior Court, case number 20 2-02464 06; Related [+] Attorney Michael T Garone added to party Shin-Etsu Handotai America Inc.(pty:dft), filed by Shin-Etsu Handotai America Inc..(Garone, Michael)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-6883326
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet