Neenah, Inc. v. Valve Corporation
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Steven D Grimberg |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-00254 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2021 |
Re-opened: | Apr 23, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 09, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 14, 2021 4:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
Valve Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Neenah, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 09, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 07/09 10:52 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Neenah, Inc.. (Caplan, Michael) |
|
misc
Clerks Entry of Dismissal
Fri 07/09 2:37 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING24 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) with prejudice. The parties shall each bear their own costs. (bdb) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 07/09 2:39 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (bdb) |
||
Tuesday, June 08, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Tue 06/08 10:23 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Stay. All deadlines in the case are extended for thirty (30) days. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 06/08/2021. (jkb) |
|
Friday, June 04, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Stay
Fri 06/04 12:47 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay Case Pending Settlement by Neenah, Inc..(Caplan, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 18, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 05/18 4:16 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to the Motion to Dismiss is June 11, 2021. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 05/18/2021. (jkb) |
|
Monday, May 17, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 05/17 5:42 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re:19 MOTION to Dismiss by Neenah, Inc..(Caplan, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 14, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Fri 05/14 5:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Valve Corporation.(Curvin, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Index to Exhibits, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A (Quackenbush Decl.), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B (Lietzke Decl.) | ||
Friday, April 23, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 04/23 3:07 PM
ORDER granting17 Joint Motion to Reopen Case; granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Valve Corporation Answer due May 14, 2021. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 04/23/2021. (bdb) |
|
Monday, April 19, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Reopen Case
Mon 04/19 6:00 PM
Joint MOTION to Reopen Case and Set Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Valve Corporation.(Ledbetter, Tracey) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 26, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline
Fri 02/26 10:55 AM
ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. The parties are ORDERED to file documents to dispose of the case within 60 days of the date of this Order. Absent an extension of that deadline or further order of the Court, if no request to reopen the case is made within 60 days, the case will be considered DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE at that time. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 2/25/2021. (jpk) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 02/26 11:00 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (jpk) |
||
Wednesday, February 24, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
3
pgs
motion
Stay
Wed 02/24 3:50 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay Case Pending Settlement by Valve Corporation.(Curvin, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 12, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 02/12 10:31 AM
ORDER granting13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal. Valve Corporation Answer due 3/1/2021. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 02/12/2021. (bdb) |
|
Wednesday, February 10, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 02/10 5:04 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Valve Corporation.(Curvin, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 28, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 01/28 12:47 PM
TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI) |
|
Wednesday, January 27, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Certificate of Compliance
Wed 01/27 1:28 PM
CERTIFICATE of Compliance of Jarred A. Klorfein (Klorfein, Jarred) |
|
10 | 10
4
pgs
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons
Wed 01/27 1:27 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Neenah, Inc.. (Caplan, Michael) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Certificate of Compliance
Wed 01/27 1:26 PM
CERTIFICATE of Compliance of Michael A. Caplan (Caplan, Michael) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Certificate of Compliance
Thu 01/21 4:04 PM
CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Ledbetter, Tracey) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Certificate of Compliance
Thu 01/21 3:32 PM
CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Curvin, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, January 20, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 01/20 12:58 PM
ORDER GRANTING4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal, Valve Corporation Answer due 2/15/2021. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 1/20/2021. (tcc) |
|
5 | 5
30+
pgs
order
Order
Wed 01/20 11:28 AM
STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on January 20, 2021. (ash) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 01/19 5:10 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Valve Corporation.(Curvin, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3
5
pgs
order
Order
Tue 01/19 11:07 AM
NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop) Modified text on 1/19/2021 (eop) |
|
Friday, January 15, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons
Tue 01/19 11:06 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Valve Corporation. (eop) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 01/19 11:00 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Valve Corporation. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-10609708)(eop) |
|
Att: 1 14 pgs Exhibit -A -Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |