BOERGER v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-00119 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 20, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 15, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:20-cv-02677 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 19, 2021 4:21 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
KEITH BOERGER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 15, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by KEITH BOERGER. (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER - Despite the Court's warnings, the 609 plaintiffs identified in Exhibits A and B have more than one case filed on the active docket. The law firms representing these plaintiffs are directed to confer with one another and move to dismiss the case that is deemed to be the duplicate case within 21 days of the date of this Order. To the extent the law firms fail to dismiss the duplicate case by the deadline, the Court will dismiss the later filed case. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/1/2023. (djb) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, February 09, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
![]() SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by KEITH BOERGER. (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by VINCE C REUTER on behalf of KEITH BOERGER (REUTER, VINCE) |
|
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by JARED M REAMS on behalf of KEITH BOERGER (REAMS, JARED) |
|
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by JEFF H ECKLAND on behalf of KEITH BOERGER (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
Wednesday, January 20, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 2/9/2021 .) (djb) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-02677. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Monday, January 11, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Wednesday, December 30, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL Direct Assign list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-CV-2677 JRT/KMM. (KDS) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/20/2021.] | |
Tuesday, December 29, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |